Carranza v. Unnamed Defendants
Plaintiff: Selvin O. Carranza
Defendant: Unnamed Defendants
Case Number: 3:2014cv00773
Filed: March 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application 203 for Reimbursement of Expert Fees. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/20/19.(dlg)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER Following Status Conference and Setting Pre-Trial Conference Date. Pretrial Disclosures shall be prepared, served and lodged with the assigned district judge by January 10, 2020. A final Pretrial Conference is scheduled on the calendar of the Honorable Gonzalo P. Curiel on January 17, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/7/19.(dlg)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel Pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(1). Attorney Charis A.M. Redmond appointed for Selvin O. Carranza. Pro Bono Counsel shall file, within fourteen (14) days of this Order, a formal written Notice of Substitution of Attorn ey signed by both Plaintiff and his newly appointed counsel. The Court further directs the Clerk of the Court to serve Ms. Redmond with a copy of this Order at the address listed. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/20/19.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(Order sent via U.S. Mail to Ms. Redmond) (dlg)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER Granting 147 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Fourteenth Amendment due process claims alleged in Counts Three and Four of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/23/18. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER: 1) denying Defendants' 92 Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a) and 2) Dismissing Unserved Defendants Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Defendants are to file and answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/26/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (fth)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's 90 Motion for Extension of Time and Service Assistance. The Court GRANTS Carranza's motion for a 90-day extension to effect service and for service assistance. The Court Clerk shal l provide a copy of this Order, the Second Amended Complaint, a summons, and a blank U.S. Marshal Form 285 to defense counsel for purposes of re-attempting service. Carranza's request that the Court order Deputy Attorney General Tiffany Johns on to accept service on behalf of the 12 unserved defendants is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 5/11/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (documents mailed to defense counsel and NEFs re-generated)(dlg)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting 33 Motion to Exceed Page Limits; Dismissing Selected Defendants; Denying Motion for Urgent Preliminary Injunction; and Directing U.S. Marshal to Effective Service upon Remaining Defendants. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to issue a summons as to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint; ORDERS the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/24/17. (certified copy All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)285 form & packet for plaintiff prepared (dlg)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause ( 15 ); Granting Motions for Extension of Time ( 18 , 20 , 24 ); and Denying Motions to Stop Retaliation and for Preliminary Injunction ( 16 , 20 , 24 ). The Court grants Plaintiff forty- five (45) days fro m the date of this Order in which to file his Second Amended Complaint. The Court also directs the Clerk of Court to provide Plaintiff with another copy of its form Civil Rights Complaint. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/17/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(Blank 1983 complaint sent to Plaintiff. dlg)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 12 Plaintiff's Motion For Amend. The Court Grants Plaintiff forty-five (45) days to file a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/26/2015. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(Plaintiff provided blank form Civil Rights Complaint pursuant to 42 U.S.C. §1983) (srm)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a) and Granting Extension of Time to Amend. The Secretary CDCR, or his designee, is ordered to collect from prison trust account the $350 balanc e of the filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the trust account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month income credited to the account and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in th e account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b)(2). Plaintiff granted forty-five (45) additional days in which to file a Complaint that conforms with Rule 8. (Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/14/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carranza v. Unnamed Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selvin O. Carranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unnamed Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?