Crossfit, Inc. v. National Strength and Conditioning Association
Plaintiff: Crossfit, Inc.
Defendant: National Strength and Conditioning Association
Case Number: 3:2014cv01191
Filed: May 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Karen S. Crawford
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER granting 415 Joint Motion for an Order approving the payment plan for National Strength and Conditioning Association to pay remaining balance of monetary sanctions. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/15/2020. (jpp)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 326 and 359 Plaintiff CrossFit, Inc's renewed motion for terminating sanction.. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/04/2019. (jpp)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's 215 Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order to Allow Additional Expert Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 7/18/2018. (mpl)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER Denying 229 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. The Court denies without prejudice Plaintiffs Motion and grants Plaintiff leave to amend its motion to file documents under seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/7/2018. (mpl)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER denying 186 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/19/2017. (mpl)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Motion for Sanctions (ECF Nos. 150, 162). Given the Court's ruling regarding the instant Sanctions Motion, and that the issues presented in the Supplemental Motion overlap those presented in the ins tant Sanctions Motion, the Court denies as moot the 174 Supplemental Motion. It is ordered that the Court grants Plaintiff's sanctions Motion as set forth above and denies without prejudice Plaintiff's Sanctions Motion regarding terminating sanctions. All specified deadlines shall be calculated from the date on which this Order is electronically docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/26/2017. (dxj)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER (1) Denying 126 Motion for Certificate of Interlocutory Appeal, And (2) Denying as Moot 126 Motion to Stay. It is ordered that the Court concludes that defendant has not sufficiently established that this case is one of the few " ;exceptional" ones that warrants certifying an interlocutory appeal. Accordingly, the Court denies defendant's motion for interlocutory appeal, and denies as moot defendant's motion to stay. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/3/2017. (dxj)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER RE RENEWED JOINT MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF DISCOVERY DISPUTE (PUBLISHING AGREEMENTS); PROTECTIVE ORDER; AND ORDER QUASHING, IN PART, SUBPOENA SERVED ON THIRD PARTY LWW [Doc. No. 104] Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 10/7/2016. (plh)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER (1) granting Crossfit, Inc.'s Partial Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting in part and denying in part 102 National Strength and Conditioning Association's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/21/2016. (kcm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crossfit, Inc. v. National Strength and Conditioning Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crossfit, Inc.
Represented By: David F. Kowalski
Represented By: William O. Reckler
Represented By: Daniel Scott Schecter
Represented By: Paul A. Serritella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Strength and Conditioning Association
Represented By: Anthony J Ellrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?