Ayala v. Fermon et al
Plaintiff: |
Jonathan Ayala |
Defendant: |
W. Fermon and W. L. Montgomery |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv01794 |
Filed: |
July 25, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
Imperial |
Presiding Judge: |
Jill L. Burkhardt |
Presiding Judge: |
Gonzalo P. Curiel |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 2, 2017 |
Filing
59
ORDER Adopting in Part 58 Report and Recommendation and Granting 50 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/2/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
|
August 12, 2015 |
Filing
36
ORDER Denying 35 Motion to Appoint Counsel Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/12/2015. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm)
|
May 8, 2015 |
Filing
17
ORDER Denying 16 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/8/15. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
|
September 3, 2014 |
Filing
4
ORDER: (1) Granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and (2) Dismissing Complaint for Failing to State a Claim. Plaintiff is Granted forty five (45) days leave to file a First Amended Complaint. The Secretary CDCR, or his designee , is ordered to collect from prison trust account the $350 balance of the filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the trust account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month income credited to the account and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b)(2). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/3/2014. (Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR) (Plaintiff mailed a court approved civil rights complaint form) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
|
August 4, 2014 |
Filing
2
ORDER DISMISSING Civil Action Without Prejudice For Failing to Pay Filing Fee Required and/or Failing to Move to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff is Granted forty-five (45) days to pay the entire $400 filing and administrative fee in full , or complete and file a new Motion to Proceed IFP, which includes a certified copy of his trust account statement for the 6-month period preceding the filing of his Complaint. Plaintiff provided new IFP Form. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/1/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?