Arellano v. Ojeda et al
Plaintiff: Raul Arellano
Defendant: E. Ojeda, Helmick, D. Mack and Unknown Officer
Case Number: 3:2014cv02401
Filed: October 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Presiding Judge: Jill L. Burkhardt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Denying 123 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Judgment under Rule 59(e). The Court has carefully reviewed the entire record of this case and exhaustively reconsidered its previous rulings. The Court is satisfied that it did not commit a ny error. Defendants Mack and Helmick are entitled to qualified immunity from suit and judgment in their favor. Accordingly, the Court DENIES Plaintiff's motion. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to provide Plaintiff with a blank Notice of Appeal (Civil) form. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 4/23/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service and Plaintiff mailed blank Notice of Appeal (Civil).) (tcf)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Denying 113 Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Case without Prejudice. The Court will consider the arguments raised therein when ruling via separate written order on Plaintiff's request for relief from judgment pursuant to Rule 59(e). Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 1/7/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (tcf)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Granting 101 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Qualified Immunity; Denying 103 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. The Court GRANTS Defendants' motion for summary judgment based on qualified immunity. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 12/2/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tcf)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Denying 90 Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time or in the Alternative for Reconsideration. The Court denies Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration of its previous order and entry of judgment in favor of Defendants. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to provide Plaintiff with a blank Notice of Appeal (Civil) form. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 4/27/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(Blank civil Notice of Appeal form mailed)(rmc)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. The Court grants Defendants' motion for summary judgment. The Clerk of Court is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close the case(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rmc)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Denying 63 Plaintiff's Motion. Plaintiff's motion seeking an order appointing an expert witness is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 2/26/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rmc)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Denying Defendants' 34 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 4/25/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arellano v. Ojeda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Ojeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helmick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?