September 14, 2023 |
Filing
221
ORDER Granting 209 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss: Plaintiff may file a third amended complaint within thirty days of the date of thisorder amending only his §§ 1985(3) and 1986 claims against Defendant Guerrero. Failureto timely file a third amended complaint will result in dismissal of the action for failure toprosecute. Signed by Judge Jinsook Ohta on 9/14/2023. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(exs)
|
April 20, 2022 |
Filing
201
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Serve the United States. Signed by Judge Jinsook Ohta on 4/19/2020.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (Certified Copy to USM) (axc)
|
February 8, 2021 |
Filing
196
ORDER 195 on Plaintiff's Motion to Know if Service to the U.S. Attorney General is Necessary. The Clerk of Court is requested to include a copy of the Summons and Complaint when mailing this Order to plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 2/8/21. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service, including Summons and Complaint)(dlg)
|
January 6, 2021 |
Filing
193
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 192 Motion for Address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 1/6/21. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
|
November 9, 2020 |
Filing
189
ORDER: Dissolving Order to Show Cause; Directing Plaintiff to Serve the United States; and Dismissing Plaintiff's Bivens Claim Against the United States 188 .. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/9/20.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (NEF sent to USM) (dlg)
|
August 21, 2020 |
Filing
181
ORDER Granting County of San Diego's 148 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting City of San Diego's 149 Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying 180 Motion for Reconsideration; and Issuing Order to Show Cause and Dismissing Certain Def endants from the Action. Guerrero Bail Bonds, Officer Guerrero, the San Diego Violent Crimes Task Force, and the U.S. Marshalls Office are dismissed. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause as to why Jesus Guerrero, P. Beal, and the United States should not be dismissed from this case. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/21/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
|
February 28, 2020 |
Filing
175
ORDER Denying Motion for Default Judgment and Related Motions (ECF 145 , 154 , 156 ). The Clerk of Court shall provide Plaintiff with copies of the Court's orders docketed at ECF Nos. 145, 154, and 156, as well as a copy of the docket as of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/27/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service including copies of Motions requested)(dlg)
|
January 28, 2020 |
Filing
169
ORDER denying 161 Plaintiff's ninth Motion for Appointment Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 1/27/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
|
April 11, 2019 |
Filing
132
ORDER denying 129 Plaintiff's Motion for the appointment of investigator and disclosure of names of persons and procedures involved in the execution of arrest warrant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 4/11/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
|
June 13, 2018 |
Filing
123
ORDER Denying 119 Motion to Appoint Counsel and Granting 122 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/13/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
|
April 17, 2018 |
Filing
117
ORDER:(1) Denying 93 Motion for Reconsideration; Denying 104 Motion to Join Causes of Action; (3) Denying as Moot 114 Motion to Apply Reply to City of El Cajon; and (4) Granting 112 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/17/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
|
August 18, 2017 |
Filing
87
ORDER (1) Granting in part and Denying in part Motions to Dismiss; and (2) Denying Motion for Reconsideration: Granting in part and Denying in part 64 Motion to Dismiss; and Granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion to Dismiss for Failur e to State a Claim; Granting in part and Denying in part 65 ; Denies as moot 70 Motion to Dismiss; denying 73 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/18/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
|
January 24, 2017 |
Filing
61
ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's 60 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint; Denying Plaintiff's 60 Motion for Reconsideration ; And Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Interlocutory Appeal. It is ordered that plaintiff shall file his amended complaint on or before 3/27/2017. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/24/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
|
December 28, 2016 |
Filing
58
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 42 43 Municipal Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. The Court grants in part and denies in part Municipal Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant City of El C ajon are dismissed with prejudice. However, Plaintiff's claims against Defendant County of San Diego and Defendant City of San Diego are dismissed without prejudice and with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, if any, on or before January 24, 2017. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/27/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kcm)
|
November 3, 2014 |
Filing
3
ORDER: (1) Granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and (2) Directing US Marshal shall effect service of complaint. Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed IFP pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a) (ECF Doc. No. 2) is granted. The Secr etary CDCR, or his designee, is ordered to collect from prison trust account the $350 balance of the filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the trust account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month inco me credited to the account and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b)(2). The Clerk is diredcted to issue a summons as to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF Do c. No. 1) upon Defendants and forward it to Plaintiff along with a blank U.S. Marshal Form 285 for each Defendant. Plaintiff is directed to complete the Form 285s as completely and accurately as possible, and to return them to the United States Mar shal according to the instructions provided by the Clerk in the letter accompanying his IFP package. Upon receipt, the U.S. Marshal is ordered to serve a copy of the Complaint and summons upon each Defendant as directed by Plaintiff on the USM F orm 285s. Defendants are thereafter ordered to reply to Plaintiffs Complaint within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/3/2014. (Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (Certified Copy to USM) (jao)
|