Champion-Cain et al v. MacDonald et al
Plaintiff: Gina Champion-Cain, Luv Surf, LP, Ani Commercial CA I, LLC and Ani Commercial CA II, LP
Defendant: Brian MacDonald, Lovesurf, Inc. and DOES 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2014cv02540
Filed: October 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Request to 175 Dismiss Defendant Brian MacDonald; Granting Plaintiffs' 175 Motion for Default Judgment ; Granting Plaintiffs' 175 Motion for Permanent Injunction. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over this action to the extent necessary to enforce and interpret this order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/12/18. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service & Brian MacDonald's address in order)(dlg)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Order Granting Plaintiffs' Request for Preliminary Injunction. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over this action to the extent necessary to enforce and interpret this order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 09/15/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Providing Tentative Ruling Denying Without Prejudice 154 Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction Against Defendant Lovesurf, Inc.. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/20/17.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service & sent to address in Order)(dlg)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER Granting Defendant Brian MacDonald's 157 Motion to Grant Access to the Court's Electronic Filing System. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/1/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service, document mailed to address in Order )(dlg)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER: Granting Motion to Strike Answer and Dismiss Counterclaim of Defendant Lovesurf, Inc. 132 ; Directing Clerk of the Court to Enter Default as to Defendant Lovesurf, Inc.; and Denying as Moot Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion to Allow Witness to Testify Telephonically at Trial 145 and Motion to Exclude Evidence of Damages Incurred by Defendants 109 . Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/17/17.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER: Vacating Clerk's Entry of Default as to Lovesurf, Inc. ( 140 , 141 ); Vacating Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Answer and Dismiss Counterclaim on Defendant Lovesurf, Inc. ( 139 ); and Resetting Hearing for February 17, 2017 at 1:30pm on Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Answer and Dismiss Counterclaim of Defendant Lovesurf, Inc. ( 132 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/2/17.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; Order sent to Defendant Brian MacDonald via U.S. Mail to address indicated in Order)(dlg)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' Renewed 124 Motion for Preliminary Injunction 125 . Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/12/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Denying 72 Plaintiffs' - Counterdefendants' Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/10/16. (dlg)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Adopting 69 Report and Recommendation in its Entirety and Denying Defendants Motion 67 for Leave to Amend the Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/15/15. (dlg)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Denying Defendants' Motion For Sanctions (Re Dkt # 46 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/27/2015. (mdc)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Denying 18 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/15/2015. (srm)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER On Ex Parte Applications: Granting 37 Ex Parte Application to Submit New Evidence in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Granting In Part and Denying in Part 38 Ex Parte Application for Order Permitting Oral Argument and Limite d Witness Testimony on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Granting 41 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Submit Additional Evidence in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court will hear oral argument by counsel on June 18, 2015. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/17/2015. (srm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Champion-Cain et al v. MacDonald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Champion-Cain
Represented By: Steven J Cologne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luv Surf, LP
Represented By: Steven J Cologne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ani Commercial CA I, LLC
Represented By: Steven J Cologne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ani Commercial CA II, LP
Represented By: Steven J Cologne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian MacDonald
Represented By: James A. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lovesurf, Inc.
Represented By: James A. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?