Rodriguez v. Stall et al
Plaintiff: |
Pedro Rodriguez |
Defendant: |
Robert S Stall, Laura Engrem, F. Michael Garcia and Office of Assigned Counsel Superior Court of San Diego |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv02646 |
Filed: |
November 5, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
David H. Bartick |
Presiding Judge: |
Larry Alan Burns |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 pr Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 13, 2015 |
Filing
20
ORDER denying without prejudice plaintiff's 14 Motion for Relief from Judgment. The Clerk of court shall close the file. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/9/15. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kas)
|
April 23, 2015 |
Filing
11
ORDER dismissing First Amended Complaint without prejudice. The court denies plaintiff leave to amend as futile. The Court certifies that an IFP appeal from this Order would be frivolous and therefore, not taken in good faith. The clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/23/15. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kas)
|
January 13, 2015 |
Filing
8
ORDER denying 7 Motion to Amend Complaint without prejudice. Plaintiff is GRANTED sixty (60) days leave from the date of this Order in which to file an Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of a form § 1983 complaint. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/12/15. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(form mailed to plaintiff)(kas)
|
November 26, 2014 |
Filing
4
ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Watch Commander, or his designee, is ordered to collect the $20 initial filing fee from prison trust account, and shall forward remaining $330 balance of the filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the trust account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month income credited to the account and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds & #036;10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b)(2). Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff is granted sixty (60) days leave from the date of this Order in which to file an Amended Complaint. (Order electronically transmitted to Watch Commander, Vista Detention Facility). Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/25/14 (form 1983 to plaintiff)(cc: Watch Commander) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kas)
|
November 13, 2014 |
Filing
2
ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice for Failing to Pay Filing Fees Required by 28 U.S.C. § 1914(a) and/or Failing to Move to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a). Plaintiff is granted forty five days leave from the date of this Order to pay the filing and administrative fee or file a motion to proceed IFP. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/12/14. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(motion for ifp form to plaintiff)(kas)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?