Cleon Neal Jones v. Dr Ajmel Sangha MD et al
Plaintiff: Cleon Neal Jones
Defendant: Ajmel Sangha MD, K Wyatt RN and Irene Pulido MD
Case Number: 3:2014cv02828
Filed: November 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Presiding Judge: Peter C. Lewis
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331fp
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DISMISSING Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Against Defendant Pulido. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/12/17.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 43 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/9/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Directing Service. The Court directs the Government Attorney assigned to this case to contact the litigation coordinator at Centinela State Prison in order to obtain a current address for Pulido. The Court directs the Government Attorney to provide any such information to the U.S. Marshal in a confidential memorandum. The U.S. Marshal should then use that information to serve the summons and First Amended Complaint on Pulido. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/8/17.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Denying 25 Without Prejudice Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 1/14/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part 12 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint as to Defendant Sangha. The Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint as to Defendant Sangha is Granted as to suit against the Defendant in his official capacity and Denied as to suit against the Defendant in his individual capacity. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/16/2015. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Denying 10 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/4/15. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: (1) Directing Clerk of Court to File Complaint; (2) Granting 1 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; and (2) Sua Sponte DISMISSING Complaint Without Prejudice for Failing to State a Claim Pursuant to 28 USC §§ 1915( e)(2) and 1915A(b). Plaintiff is Granted forty-five (45) days to file a First Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a court approved civil rights form toPlaintiff. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/16/2015. (approved form § 1983 civil rights complaint mailed to Plaintiff)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleon Neal Jones v. Dr Ajmel Sangha MD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ajmel Sangha MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Wyatt RN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irene Pulido MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleon Neal Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?