Hose v. WIS Holdings Corp. et al
Plaintiff: |
Richard Hose |
Defendant: |
WIS Holdings Corp. and Washington Inventory Service, Inc. |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv02869 |
Filed: |
December 4, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
William V. Gallo |
Presiding Judge: |
William Q. Hayes |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 2 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 2, 2020 |
Filing
304
ORDER on Motion for Final Approval of Collective Action Settlement, Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Motion for Service Awards, and Joint Motion to Include Opt-ins Who Submit Untimely Claims in the First Distribution of Settlement Funds. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/2/2020. (tcf)
|
December 18, 2018 |
Filing
251
ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Declaratory Relief and Sanctions (ECF No. 215 ) is Granted in Part and Denied in Part. Defendant RSW shall participate in the ongoing arbitration with Plaintiffs and WIS pursuant to the WIS arbitration agreements . Pursuant to the text of the WIS arbitration agreements, the aforementioned dispute as to the allocation of filing fees is properly resolved by the arbitrator. Defendant CLP is not required to participate in arbitration under the WIS arbitration agreements. It is further Ordered that the Applications to File Documents Under Seal (ECF Nos. 216 , 222 , 228 ) are Granted. The lodged documents, ECF Nos. 217 , 223 , 229 , shall be filed under seal. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 12/18/2018. (ajs)
|
August 3, 2017 |
Filing
193
ORDER granting 182 Motion to Amend Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint to Add As Defendants the Successor Companies and Owners of Defendant (ECF No. 182) is GRANTED. No later than seven (7) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff may file the proposed third amended complaint which is attached to the Motion at ECF No. 182-3. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Stipulation as to Discovery Deadlines filed by Plaintiff and Defendant (ECF No. 191) remains pending before the Magistrate Judge. The parties shall contact the Magistrate Judge concerning the discovery deadlines in this matter. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/3/2017. (acc)
|
July 19, 2017 |
Filing
189
ORDER: The Motions to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant (Dkt #s 172 , 176 ) are granted in part and denied in part. The Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant (Dkt # 179 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/19/2017. (mdc)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?