Torbert v. Gore et al
Plaintiff: Javon Lamar Torbert
Defendant: William D. Gore, Dailly, McMahon, Y. G. Gebregiorgis, Estrada and Medical Docs
Case Number: 3:2014cv02911
Filed: December 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Presiding Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 227 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The Plaintiffs claim against the Defendant is hereby dismissed.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mme)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER Granting Motion for Summary Judgment and Dismissing Case. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/21/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER: (1) denying Plaintiff's 146 Motion to Amend Claim of Excessive Force; and (2) denying Plaintiff's 155 Motion for Extension of Pretrial Proceedings. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/5/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (fth)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER: (1) Denying Plaintiff's 136 Motion to Preserve a Claim of Error; (2) Denying Plaintiff's 138 Motion for Relief of Judgment; (3) Granting in Part Plaintiff's 140 Motion for Extension of Time; (4) Granting Defendant's 131 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/4/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Denying 128 Motion for Clarification/Objection to Denial of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 12/19/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Denying 113 Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint to Add a Claim for Obstruction of Justice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/26/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER: Adopting 100 Report and Recommendation; (2) Granting in Part Defendants' 71 Motion for Summary Judgment; and Granting Plaintiff's 106 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/5/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER: (1) Denying Third Motion for Appointment of Counsel 82 ; and (2) Denying Second Motion for Appointment of Expert Witness 84 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 6/23/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: (1) Denying 66 Motion to Appoint Counsel; and (2) Denying 68 Motion to Appoint Expert Witness. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 4/8/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: (1) ADOPTING 51 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ; (2) Denying 46 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 12/30/2015.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Denying 27 Motion to Appoint Counsel without Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 9/17/2015. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: (1) Granting Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and (2) Directing U.S. Marshal to effect service. The Secretary CDCR, or his designee, is ordered to collect from prison trust account the $350 balance of the filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the trust account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month income credited to the account and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b)(2). Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/16/2015.(cc: Watch Commander) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (IFP packet prepared) (knb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torbert v. Gore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javon Lamar Torbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dailly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y. G. Gebregiorgis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Docs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?