Clay et al v. Cytosport, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Chayla Clay, Erica Ehrlichman and Logan Reichert |
Defendant: |
Cytosport, Inc. |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv00165 |
Filed: |
January 23, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
David H. Bartick |
Presiding Judge: |
M. James Lorenz |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 29, 2020 |
Filing
245
ORDER (1) Granting 240 Plaintiff's motion for final approval of Class Action Settlement; (2) Granting 239 Plaintiffs' motion for Attorneys' fees, expenses, and incentive awards; and (3) Final order of dismissal. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/29/2020. (jpp)
|
December 23, 2019 |
Filing
229
ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement [ECF No. 222 ]. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 12/20/2019. (lrf)
|
September 7, 2018 |
Filing
210
ORDER (1) Granting in Part and Denying In Part Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification; and (2) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/7/2018. (lrf)
|
July 31, 2018 |
Filing
209
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 170 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/31/2018. (lrf)
|
May 23, 2017 |
Filing
195
ORDER Granting Defendant's 186 Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal. It is ordered that (1) Exhibit F to the Declaration of Matthew I. Kaplan (redacted version filed as doc. 170-4 at 14-52); (2) Declaration of Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D. (Ugone Declaration) (redacted version filed as doc. 170-22); and (3) Exhibits 5-9 and 13-16 to the Ugone Declaration (redacted versions filed as doc. 170-23 at 81-95 and 170-24 at 5-40) be filed under seal. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/23/2017. (dxj)
|
March 9, 2017 |
Filing
154
ORDER re: Briefing Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Defendant's Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions 152 . Defendant's pending summary judgment motion 151 is Denied Without Prejudice to including the same arguments and requests for relief in Defendant's opposition to Plaintiffs' class certification motion as provided herein. No later than April 26, 2017, Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of class certification and opposition to any summary jud gment and/or Daubert motions Defendant joined with its opposition to class certification. No later than May 3, 2017, Defendant shall file a reply in support of its summary adjudication and/or Daubert motions. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/9/2017. (sjt)
|
October 18, 2016 |
Filing
126
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 95 Motion for Discovery; granting in part and denying in part 96 Motion for Discovery; granting 97 Motion to File Documents Under Seal; granting 104 Joint Motion Regarding Certain Discovery and Class Certification. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 10/18/2016. (sjt)
|
August 19, 2015 |
Filing
53
ORDER Denying 24 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/19/2015. (knb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?