Ocampo v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Lopez, Damaris Manzanero Vazquez, Anakaren Lopez and Karen Ocampo
Defendant: United States of America and National Steel and Shipbuilding Company
Guardian Ad Litem: Gary Dale Jander
Not Classified By Court: American Equity Underwriters, Inc.
Cross Defendant: South Bay Sand Blasting and Tank Cleaning, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00180
Filed: January 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William V Gallo
Referring Judge: John A Houston
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30104
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Filing 274 Joint MOTION to Dismiss For Voluntary Dismissal by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Pettit, Douglas) (jpp).
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER Withdrawing Motions In-Limine. Pending before the Court are Plaintiff's motion to exclude expert witnesses from the courtroom while the other party's expert witness is testifying (Doc. No. #159 ) and Defendant's motion to exclude subsequent remedial measures (Doc. No. #164 ). The parties notified the court they have reached a settlement in this matter and are taking steps to finalize the settlement. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the motions are withdrawn. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 8/27/2020. (tcf)
August 7, 2020 Filing 272 NOTICE Guardian ad Litem Statement Regarding the Court's August 6, 2020 Order Granting Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement and Distribution of Funds by Gary Dale Jander re #271 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Jander, Gary) (tcf).
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER granting #260 Joint Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/06/2020. (djk)
August 3, 2020 Filing 270 RESPONSE in Support re #260 Joint MOTION For Approval of Settlement and Distribution of Funds filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Hannah, Jocelyn) (tcf).
July 30, 2020 Filing 269 REPLY - Other re #265 Response to Motion for Approval of Settlement and Distribution of Funds filed by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Preston Easley, #2 Declaration of Karen Ocampo, #3 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (tcf).
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER granting #261 Ex Parte Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/21/2020. (djk)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/20/2020.(djk)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER granting #264 Motion to Strike Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/20/2020. (djk)
July 17, 2020 Filing 265 RESPONSE to Motion re #260 Joint MOTION For Approval of Settlement and Distribution of Funds Amended [Redacted] filed by Gary Dale Jander. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service by Mail)(Jander, Gary) (tcf).
July 17, 2020 Filing 264 MOTION to Strike Document 263 Response to Motion for Approval of Settlement and Distribution of Funds by Gary Dale Jander. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service by Mail)(Jander, Gary) (tcf).
July 17, 2020 Filing 263 RESPONSE to Motion re #260 Joint MOTION For Approval of Settlement and Distribution of Funds filed by Gary Dale Jander. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service by Mail)(Jander, Gary) (tcf).
July 17, 2020 Filing 262 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel of Guardian ad Litem by Gary D. Jander on behalf of Gary Dale Jander (Jander, Gary)Attorney Gary D. Jander added to party Gary Dale Jander(pty:gal) (tcf).
July 17, 2020 Filing 261 Ex Parte MOTION to Remove Non-Essential Personnel From the Court's ECF Service List by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Preston Easley, #2 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (tcf).
July 9, 2020 Filing 260 Joint MOTION For Approval of Settlement and Distribution of Funds by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (tcf).
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Scheduling Order Regarding Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/25/2020.(djk)
June 23, 2020 Filing 258 NOTICE of State Probate Court's Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Approve Settlement and Distribution of Minor's Funds by Karen Ocampo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (tcf).
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER denying #254 Ex Parte Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/05/2020. (djk)
June 5, 2020 Filing 256 RESPONSE in Opposition re #254 Ex Parte MOTION To Approve Distribution of Minor's Settlement Funds filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hannah, Jocelyn) (tcf).
June 4, 2020 Filing 255 First Amended Proof of Service Re: re #254 Ex Parte MOTION To Approve Distribution of Minor's Settlement Funds by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) Modified text to match document on 6/5/2020 (tcf).
June 4, 2020 Filing 254 Ex Parte MOTION To Approve Distribution of Minor's Settlement Funds by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Declaration of Preston Easley, #8 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (tcf).
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER striking #249 Ex Parte Motion to Remove Non-Essential Personnel from ECF Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/26/2020. (djk)
May 21, 2020 Filing 252 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Ex Parte Motion to Approve Distribution of Minor's Settlement Funds by Karen Ocampo re #250 Ex Parte MOTION Approve Distribution of Minor's Settlement Funds (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (tcf).
May 20, 2020 Filing 251 RESPONSE in Opposition re #250 Ex Parte MOTION Approve Distribution of Minor's Settlement Funds filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Hannah, Jocelyn) (tcf).
May 19, 2020 Filing 250 ***Document withdrawn per ECF #252 *** Ex Parte MOTION Approve Distribution of Minor's Settlement Funds by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (tcf). Modified to withdraw documents on 5/21/2020 (tcf).
May 7, 2020 Filing 249 Ex Parte MOTION to Remove Non-Essential Personnel From the Court's ECF Service List by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Preston Easley, #2 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (tcf).
May 6, 2020 Filing 248 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Scott MacInnes as Attorney for Lien Claimant by South Bay Sand Blasting and Tank Cleaning, Inc. (Marin, John)Attorney John T Marin added to party South Bay Sand Blasting and Tank Cleaning, Inc.(pty:crd) (tcf).
May 5, 2020 Filing 247 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY MARC APPLBAUM by Karen Ocampo re #43 Notice of Appearance (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service Notice of Withdrawal)(Griffin, David) QC mailer sent re: attorney signature doesn't match CM/ECF account (tcf).
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER Granting Stipulation to Unseal Transcript of Settlement Proceedings. The Court ORDERS the unsealing of the transcript of the September 18, 2019 settlement proceedings in the related action for the limited purpose of the Parties' counsel and Defendants South Bay and ALMAs exclusive review of the transcript in an effort to move this case forward. No other person or entity shall have access to the unsealed transcript to any extent or for any purpose, absent the Parties' stipulation and this Court's approval. The Court Reporter is directed to disclose the transcript to Plaintiff's counsel and counsel for Defendants South Bay and ALMA. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/26/2020. (cc: Court Reporter Cami Kircher)(aef)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER Vacating Status Hearing. It is hereby ordered the status hearing on the pending settlement before this Court set for November 18, 2019 is VACATED. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 11/14/2019.(tcf)
October 16, 2019 Filing 243 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Settlement) held on 9/18/2019 before Judge John A. Houston. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cameron P. Kircher. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 11/6/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2020. (akr)
October 16, 2019 Filing 242 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Trial Testimony of Steven Wiker, Ph.D.) held on 9/10/2019 and 9/11/2019 before Judge John A. Houston. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cameron P. Kircher. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 11/6/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2020. (akr)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and pursuant to Local Civil Rule 17.1 for approval of the entire settlement of this action, including the minor's claim, is transferred to Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. (ECF No. #240 ) Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/15/2019. (tcf)
October 14, 2019 Filing 240 Joint MOTION for District Judge Approval for Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction for Approval of Entire Settlement [Local Civil Rule 17.1] by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (tcf).
September 18, 2019 Filing 239 Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company's Exhibit List. (lao)
September 18, 2019 Filing 238 Defendant United States of America Exhibit List. (lao)
September 18, 2019 Filing 237 Plaintiff Exhibit List. (lao)
September 18, 2019 Filing 236 Joint Witness List. (lao)
September 18, 2019 Filing 235 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston: Bench Trial completed on 9/18/2019. Final Day of Trial 6. Case has Settled. Status Hearing re Settlement set for 11/18/2019 03:30 PM in Courtroom 13B before Judge John A. Houston. (Court Reporter Cami Kircher). (Plaintiff Attorney Preston Easley, Peter Yovanovich). (Defense Attorney for United States of America Eric Kaufman-Cohen, Defense Attorneys for National Steel and Shipbuilding Company Douglas Pettit, Jocelyn Hannah).(no document attached) (lao)
September 17, 2019 Filing 234 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston: Bench Trial held on 9/17/2019. Day of Trial 5. Swore witnesses. Exhibits marked/received. Bench Trial continued to 9/18/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13B before Judge John A. Houston.(Court Reporter Cami Kircher). (Plaintiff Attorney Preston Easley, Peter Yovanovich). (Defense Attorney for United States of America Eric Kaufman-Cohen, Defense Attorneys for National Steel and Shipbuilding Company Douglas Pettit, Jocelyn Hannah). (no document attached) (lao)
September 16, 2019 Filing 233 Exhibit List First Amended by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (tcf).
September 13, 2019 Filing 232 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston: Bench Trial held on 9/13/2019. Day of Trial 4. Swore witnesses. Exhibits marked/received. Bench Trial continued to 9/17/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13B before Judge John A. Houston.(Court Reporter/ECR Cami Kircher). (Plaintiff Attorney Preston Easley, Peter Yovanovich). (Defense Attorney for United States of America Eric Kaufman-Cohen, Defense Attorneys for National Steel and Shipbuilding Company Douglas Pettit, Jocelyn Hannah).(no document attached) (lao)
September 12, 2019 Filing 231 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston: Bench Trial held on 9/12/2019. Day of Trial 3. Swore witnesses. Exhibits marked/received. Bench Trial continued to 9/13/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13B before Judge John A. Houston. (Court Reporter Cami Kircher). (Interpreter Vivien Nichols).(Plaintiff Attorney Preston Easley, Peter Yovanovich). (Defense Attorney for United States of America Eric Kaufman-Cohen, Defense Attorney for National Steel and Shipbuilding Company Douglas Pettit, Jocelyn Hannah).(no document attached) (lao)
September 12, 2019 Filing 230 OBJECTION by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company and Counter-Designation of Deposition Testimony of Luis Armando Naranjo. (Pettit, Douglas) (mme).
September 11, 2019 Filing 229 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston: Bench Trial held on 9/11/2019. Day of Trial 2. Swore witnesses. Exhibits marked/received. Bench Trial continued to 9/12/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13B before Judge John A. Houston.(Court Reporter Cami Kircher). (Interpreter Vivien Nichols).(Plaintiff Attorney Preston Easley, Peter Yovanovich). (Defense Attorney for United States of America Eric Kaufman-Cohen, Defense Attorney for National Steel and Shipbuilding Company Douglas Pettit, Jocelyn Hannah).(no document attached) (lao)
September 11, 2019 Filing 228 OBJECTION by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company and Counter-Designation of Deposition Testimony of Luis Armando Naranjo. (Pettit, Douglas) QC mailer sent re: signature doesn't match the CM/ECF account used to file document (tcf).
September 10, 2019 Filing 227 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston: Bench Trial held on 9/10/2019. Day of Trial 1. Swore witnesses. Exhibits marked/received. Defendant United States of America's oral motion to have Court Inspect Cargo/Weapons Elevator No. 3 Aboard USS BOXER's Sister Ship USS MAKIN ISLAND (LHD-8) - granted. Site inspection will take place on 09/11/2019 at 9:45am. Bench Trial continued to 9/11/2019 09:45 AM in Courtroom 13B before Judge John A. Houston.(Court Reporter Cami Kircher). (Plaintiff Attorney Preston Easley, Peter Yovanovich). (Defense Attorney for United States of America Eric Kaufman-Cohen, Defense Attorney for National Steel and Shipbuilding Company Douglas Pettit, Jocelyn Hannah). (no document attached) (lao)
September 6, 2019 Filing 226 TRIAL BRIEF by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (tcf).
September 6, 2019 Filing 225 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Maxwell Yovanovich on behalf of Karen Ocampo (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Yovanovich, Peter)Attorney Peter Maxwell Yovanovich added to party Karen Ocampo(pty:pla) (tcf).
September 5, 2019 Filing 224 NOTICE of Intent to Have Court Inspect Cargo/Weapons Elevator No. 3 Aboard USS BOXER's Sister Ship USS MAKIN ISLAND (LHD-8) by United States of America (Kaufman-Cohen, Eric) (tcf).
September 3, 2019 Filing 223 TRIAL BRIEF by United States of America. (Kaufman-Cohen, Eric) (tcf).
September 3, 2019 Filing 222 TRIAL BRIEF Re: The USA-NASSCO Contract is Not Relevant to Establishing NASSCO's Tort Duties and Any Breach of the Contract is Not Within the Jurisdiction of this Court (5 of 5) by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hannah, Jocelyn) (tcf).
September 3, 2019 Filing 221 TRIAL BRIEF Re: NASSCO is Relieved of Liability Under the Peculiar Risk Doctrine (4 of 5) by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hannah, Jocelyn) (tcf).
September 3, 2019 Filing 220 TRIAL BRIEF Re: NASSCO Legally Delegated the Safety Aspects of its Contract to South Bay (3 of 5) by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hannah, Jocelyn) (tcf).
September 3, 2019 Filing 219 TRIAL BRIEF Re: NASSCO's Duty of Care is Limited Under Maritime Law and is Not Co-extensive with the Duty of Care Owed By the USA (2 of 5) by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hannah, Jocelyn) (tcf).
September 3, 2019 Filing 218 TRIAL BRIEF Re: The Court Must Apportion Fault to South Bay on Plaintiff's Claim Against NASSCO (1 of 5) by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hannah, Jocelyn) (tcf).
August 28, 2019 Filing 217 Exhibit List by United States of America.. (Kaufman-Cohen, Eric) (tcf).
August 28, 2019 Filing 216 NOTICE of Withdrawal by United States of America re #215 Exhibit List (Kaufman-Cohen, Eric) (tcf).
August 27, 2019 Filing 215 ***Document Withdrawn per ECF #216 *** Exhibit List by United States of America. (Kaufman-Cohen, Eric) QC mailer sent re: missing signature (tcf). Modified on 8/29/2019 (tcf).
August 27, 2019 Filing 214 Exhibit List of Trial Exhibits Expected to be Introduced in Case in Chief by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Hannah, Jocelyn) (tcf).
August 26, 2019 Filing 213 Exhibit List Plaintiff's by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (tcf).
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Amended Order Scheduling Pretrial and Trial Proceedings. The order scheduling pretrial and trial proceedings is amended as follows: 1) The parties shall submit two sets of their trial notebooks to the Court no later than August 27, 2019. 2) Each party shall submit to the Court and opposing party an exhibit list containing exhibits the party intends to introduce in its case in chief no later than August 27, 2019. 3) The parties shall exchange any deposition transcript designations for testimony to be read at trial no later than August 27, 2019. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 8/20/2019. (tcf) (jao).
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER on Motions In Limine: (1) NASSCO's motion to exclude evidence of the contract (Doc. No. #160 ) is DENIED. (2) NASSCO's motion to exclude testimony of the United States' expert, Dr. Patrick Hudson (Doc. No. #161 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is DENIED as to the first opinion and GRANTED as to the second and third opinions. (3) NASSCO's motion to preclude evidence or argument regarding legal duty (Doc. No. #162 ) DENIED. (4) NASSCO's motion to exclude evidence of any alleged negligent act not listedin the Pretrial Order (Doc. No. #172 ) is DENIED without prejudice. (5) NASSCO's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Plaintiff's expert Carl Beels (Doc. No. #166 ) is DENIED. (6) The hearing set for July 15, 2019 is VACATED. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 7/12/2019. (tcf) (jao).
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER Granting Defendant Nassco's Motion to Dismiss. (Doc. No. #156 ) The United States' cross-claim for breach of contract is DISMISSED without prejudice. The hearing set for July 15, 2019 is VACATED. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 7/12/2019. (tcf) (jao).
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 AMENDED ORDER rescheduling hearing on #156 Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding company's motion to dismiss and the parties' pending motions in-limine to 7/15/2019 at 3:30pm. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 6/11/2019.(jpp)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER rescheduling hearing on #156 Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding company's motion to dismiss to 7/15/2019 at 3:30pm. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 6/11/2019.(jpp)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 FILED IN ERROR - ORDER rescheduling hearing on #156 Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding company's motion to dismiss to 7/15/2019 at 3:30pm. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 6/11/2019.(jpp) Modified on 6/11/2019 to edit text and remove image. (jpp).
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER rescheduling hearing and trial. the motion hearing set for June 4, 2019 is vacated and rescheduled to 6/17/2019 at 2:30pm. The trial date of July 16, 2019 is vacated and rescheduled to 9/10/2019 at 9:00am. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 5/30/2019.(jpp)
May 21, 2019 Filing 205 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston:Motion Hearing held on 5/21/2019 submitting #156 Motion to Dismiss filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Court Reporter/ECR Cami Kircher). (Plaintiff Attorney n/a).(Defendant Attorney Eric Kaufman-Cohen, Jocelyn Hannah, Douglas Pettit). (no document attached) (lwm)
May 20, 2019 Filing 204 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston:Motion In Limine Hearing held on 5/20/2019 granting #158 Motion to Exclude; temporarily granting #159 Motion to Exclude; submitting #160 Motion to Exclude; submitting #161 Motion to Exclude; submitting #162 Motion to Preclude; temporarily granting #164 Motion to Exclude; granting #165 Motion to Exclude; submitting #166 Motion to Exclude; denying #167 Motion to Exclude; granting #168 Motion to Preclude; granting #169 Motion to Preclude; withdrawing #170 Motion to Preclude; submitting #172 Motion to Exclude. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 13B before Judge John A. Houston. Motion In Limine Hearing set for 5/21/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 13B before Judge John A. Houston. (Court Reporter/ECR Cami Kircher). (Plaintiff Attorney Preston Warham Easley).(Defendant Attorney Eric Kaufman-Cohen, Jocelyn Hannah, Douglas Pettit). (no document attached) (lwm)
May 13, 2019 Filing 203 REPLY to Response to Motion re #167 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Society for Protective Coatings (No. 8 of 8) filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hannah, Jocelyn) (jpp).
May 13, 2019 Filing 202 REPLY to Response to Motion re #166 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Carl Beels (No. 7 of 8) filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hannah, Jocelyn) (jpp).
May 13, 2019 Filing 201 REPLY to Response to Motion re #165 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence of "Admiralty Letter Report Investigation of the Death on USS Boxer (LHD 4) on 31 July 2014" (No. 6 of 8) filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hannah, Jocelyn) (jpp).
May 13, 2019 Filing 200 REPLY to Response to Motion re #164 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Subsequent Remedial Measures (No. 5 of 8) filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hannah, Jocelyn) (jpp).
May 13, 2019 Filing 199 REPLY to Response to Motion re #172 Amended MOTION to Exclude Evidence of Any Alleged Negligent Act Not Listed in Pretrial Order (No. 4 of 8) filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hannah, Jocelyn) (jpp).
May 13, 2019 Filing 198 REPLY to Response to Motion re #162 In Limine MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff's Introduction of Evidence or Argument Regarding Legal Duty (No. 3 of 8) filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hannah, Jocelyn) (jpp).
May 13, 2019 Filing 197 REPLY to Response to Motion re #161 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Patrick Hudson (No. 2 of 8) filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hannah, Jocelyn) (jpp).
May 13, 2019 Filing 196 REPLY to Response to Motion re #160 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence of Contract (No. 1 of 8) filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hannah, Jocelyn) (jpp).
May 13, 2019 Filing 195 REPLY - Other re #168 In Limine MOTION to Preclude NASSCO's Exhibit DI and DJ, #169 In Limine MOTION to Preclude NASSCO's Exhibits DD; DE; DH; DK; DL and DM and Notice of Withdrawal of Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Exhibits 15 and 16 and NASSCO's Exhibits DF and DG (ECF 170) filed by United States of America. (Kaufman-Cohen, Eric) (jpp).
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER rescheduling hearing on #156 Motion to Dismiss to 5/20/2019 at 2:30pm. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 5/08/2019.(jpp)
May 6, 2019 Filing 193 RESPONSE in Opposition re #167 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Society for Protective Coatings (No. 8 of 8) filed by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
May 6, 2019 Filing 192 RESPONSE in Opposition re #166 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Carl Beels (No. 7 of 8) filed by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Preston Easley, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
May 6, 2019 Filing 191 RESPONSE in Opposition re #170 In Limine MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff's Exhibits 15 and 16; and NASSCO's Exhibits DF and DG filed by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Preston Easley, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
May 6, 2019 Filing 190 REPLY to Response to Motion re #156 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hannah, Jocelyn) (jpp).
May 6, 2019 Filing 189 NON Opposition re #170 In Limine MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff's Exhibits 15 and 16; and NASSCO's Exhibits DF and DG filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hannah, Jocelyn) (jpp).
May 6, 2019 Filing 188 NON Opposition re #169 In Limine MOTION to Preclude NASSCO's Exhibits DD; DE; DH; DK; DL and DM filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hannah, Jocelyn) (jpp).
May 6, 2019 Filing 187 NON Opposition re #168 In Limine MOTION to Preclude NASSCO's Exhibit DI and DJ filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hannah, Jocelyn) (jpp).
May 6, 2019 Filing 186 NON Opposition re #159 In Limine MOTION to Exclude From Courtroom Expert Witness While the Other Party's Expert Witness is Testifying [2 of 2] filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hannah, Jocelyn) (jpp).
May 6, 2019 Filing 185 NON Opposition re #158 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Any Evidence That Decedent Salomon Rodriguez Should Have Refused to Work Under Dangerous Conditions [1 of 2] filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hannah, Jocelyn) (jpp).
May 6, 2019 Filing 184 RESPONSE in Opposition re #167 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Society for Protective Coatings (No. 8 of 8) filed by United States of America. (Kaufman-Cohen, Eric) (jpp).
May 6, 2019 Filing 183 DECLARATION re #182 Response in Opposition to Motion in limine to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Patrick Hudson by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kaufman-Cohen, Eric) (jpp).
May 6, 2019 Filing 182 RESPONSE in Opposition re #161 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Patrick Hudson (No. 2 of 8) filed by United States of America. (Kaufman-Cohen, Eric) (jpp).
May 6, 2019 Filing 181 RESPONSE in Opposition re #160 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence of Contract (No. 1 of 8) filed by United States of America. (Kaufman-Cohen, Eric) (jpp).
May 6, 2019 Filing 180 RESPONSE in Opposition re #172 Amended MOTION to Exclude Evidence of Any Alleged Negligent Act Not Listed in Pretrial Order (No. 4 of 8) filed by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
May 2, 2019 Filing 179 RESPONSE in Opposition re #164 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Subsequent Remedial Measures (No. 5 of 8) filed by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
May 2, 2019 Filing 178 RESPONSE in Opposition re #167 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Society for Protective Coatings (No. 8 of 8) filed by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
May 2, 2019 Filing 177 NON Opposition re #165 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence of "Admiralty Letter Report Investigation of the Death on USS Boxer (LHD 4) on 31 July 2014" (No. 6 of 8) filed by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
May 2, 2019 Filing 176 RESPONSE in Opposition re #162 In Limine MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff's Introduction of Evidence or Argument Regarding Legal Duty (No. 3 of 8) filed by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
May 2, 2019 Filing 175 NON Opposition re #161 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Patrick Hudson (No. 2 of 8) filed by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
May 2, 2019 Filing 174 RESPONSE in Opposition re #160 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence of Contract (No. 1 of 8) filed by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
April 29, 2019 Filing 173 RESPONSE in Opposition re #156 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States of America. (Kaufman-Cohen, Eric) (jpp).
April 24, 2019 Filing 172 Amended MOTION to Exclude Evidence of Any Alleged Negligent Act Not Listed in Pretrial Order (No. 4 of 8) by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Any Alleged Negligent Act Not Listed in Pretrial Order (No. 4 of 8), #2 Proof of Service Re: Motion in Limine No. 4 of 8)(Hannah, Jocelyn) (jpp).
April 24, 2019 Filing 171 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company re #163 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence of Any Alleged Negligent Act Not Listed in Pretrial Order (No. 4 of 8) filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company . (Hannah, Jocelyn) (jpp).
April 22, 2019 Filing 170 In Limine MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff's Exhibits 15 and 16; and NASSCO's Exhibits DF and DG by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Kaufman-Cohen, Eric)
April 22, 2019 Filing 169 In Limine MOTION to Preclude NASSCO's Exhibits DD; DE; DH; DK; DL and DM by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Kaufman-Cohen, Eric)
April 22, 2019 Filing 168 In Limine MOTION to Preclude NASSCO's Exhibit DI and DJ by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Kaufman-Cohen, Eric)
April 22, 2019 Filing 167 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Society for Protective Coatings (No. 8 of 8) by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Society for Protective Coatings (No. 8 of 8), #2 Declaration of Emily R. Arnett in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Society for Protective Coatings (No. 8 of 8), #3 Proof of Service Re: Motion in Limine No. 8 of 8)(Hannah, Jocelyn)
April 22, 2019 Filing 166 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Carl Beels (No. 7 of 8) by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Opinions of Carl Beels (No. 7 of 8), #2 Declaration of Emily R. Arnett in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Opinions of Carl Beels (No. 7 of 8), #3 Proof of Service Re: Motion in Limine No. 7 of 8)(Hannah, Jocelyn)
April 22, 2019 Filing 165 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence of "Admiralty Letter Report Investigation of the Death on USS Boxer (LHD 4) on 31 July 2014" (No. 6 of 8) by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of "Admiralty Letter Report Investigation of the Death on USS Boxer (LHD 4) on 31 July 2014" (No. 6 of 8), #2 Declaration of Jocelyn D. Hannah, Esq. in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of "Admiralty Letter Report Investigation of the Death on USS Boxer (LHD 4) on 31 July 2014" (No. 6 of 8), #3 Proof of Service Re: Motion in Limine No. 6 of 8)(Hannah, Jocelyn)
April 22, 2019 Filing 164 ***Motion withdrawn per Order #273 *** In Limine MOTION to Exclude Subsequent Remedial Measures (No. 5 of 8) by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Subsequent Remedial Measures (No. 5 of 8), #2 Proof of Service Re: Motion in Limine No. 5 of 8)(Hannah, Jocelyn) Modified to withdraw motion on 8/27/2020 (tcf).
April 22, 2019 Filing 163 WITHDRAWN PER #171 - In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence of Any Alleged Negligent Act Not Listed in Pretrial Order (No. 4 of 8) by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Any Alleged Negligent Act Not Listed in Pretrial Order (No. 4 of 8), #2 Proof of Service Re: Motion in Limine No. 4 of 8)(Hannah, Jocelyn).
April 22, 2019 Filing 162 In Limine MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff's Introduction of Evidence or Argument Regarding Legal Duty (No. 3 of 8) by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff's Introduction of Evidence or Argument Regarding Legal Duty (No. 3 of 8), #2 Proof of Service Re: Motion in Limine No. 3 of 8)(Hannah, Jocelyn)
April 22, 2019 Filing 161 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Patrick Hudson (No. 2 of 8) by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Patrick Hudson (No. 2 of 8), #2 Declaration of Jocelyn D. Hannah, Esq. in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Opinions of Patrick Hudson (No. 2 of 8), #3 Proof of Service Re: Motion in Limine No. 2 of 8)(Hannah, Jocelyn)
April 22, 2019 Filing 160 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence of Contract (No. 1 of 8) by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Contract, #2 Proof of Service)(Hannah, Jocelyn)
April 9, 2019 Filing 159 ***Motion withdrawn per Order #273 *** In Limine MOTION to Exclude From Courtroom Expert Witness While the Other Party's Expert Witness is Testifying [2 of 2] by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp). Modified to withdraw motion on 8/27/2020 (tcf).
April 9, 2019 Filing 158 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Any Evidence That Decedent Salomon Rodriguez Should Have Refused to Work Under Dangerous Conditions [1 of 2] by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
March 27, 2019 Filing 157 RESPONSE to Motion re #156 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
March 22, 2019 Filing 156 MOTION to Dismiss by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration EMILY R. ARNETT, #3 Exhibit 1-5, #4 Proof of Service)(Arnett, Emily)
January 31, 2019 Filing 155 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Marc Applbaum on Behalf of Plaintiff by Karen Ocampo (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting #153 unopposed Motion to Continue date. Motion In Limine Hearing set for 5/20/2019 at 2:30pm. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/09/2019. (jpp)
January 9, 2019 Filing 153 MOTION to Continue Dates Related to Motions In Limine (Unopposed) by United States of America. (Kaufman-Cohen, Eric) (jpp).
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER scheduling pretrial and trial proceedings. The trial set for May 7, 2019 is rescheduled to 7/16/2019 at 9:00am. The parties shall appear before this Court for hearing motions in limine on 2/19/2019 at 2:30pm. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/24/2018.(jpp)
October 22, 2018 Filing 151 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston: Telephonic Status Hearing held. Bench Trial set for 7/16/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13B before Judge John A. Houston. Trial date of 5/7/19 is vacated.(Court Reporter/ECR Cami Kircher). (Plaintiff Attorney Preston Warham Easley). (Defendant Attorney Eric Kaufman-Cohen, Jocelyn Hannah). (no document attached) (lwm)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference. On the Court's own motion, it is hereby ordered a telephonic status conference shall be held on 10/22/2018 at 2:30 PM before Judge John A. Houston. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/10/2018.(jdt)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 9/24/2018.(sjm)
September 24, 2018 Filing 148 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston: Pretrial Conference held on 9/24/2018. Motion In Limine Hearing set for 2/19/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 13B before Judge John A. Houston. Bench Trial set for 5/7/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13B before Judge John A. Houston.(Court Reporter/ECR Cami Kircher). (Plaintiff Attorney Preston Warham Easley). (Defendant Attorney Eric Kaufman-Cohen, Jocelyn Hannah, Douglas A. Pettit). (no document attached) (lwm)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER denying #106 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Case Management Conference Order and for leave to file Fourth Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 9/24/2018. (jpp)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER denying #79 Defendant Nassco's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 9/21/2018. (jpp)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER re #144 unopposed application to continue Pre=trial Conference to 9/24/2018. Final Pretrial Conference continued to 9/24/2018 at 2:30pm. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 9/18/2018. (jpp)
September 18, 2018 Filing 144 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Pre-Trial Conference by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jocelyn D. Hannah, #2 Proof of Service)(Hannah, Jocelyn). Modified on 9/18/2018 - Edited to remove "Joint" per call from Filer (jah).
September 18, 2018 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Jocelyn D. Hannah on behalf of National Steel and Shipbuilding Company (Hannah, Jocelyn)Attorney Jocelyn D. Hannah added to party National Steel and Shipbuilding Company(pty:crd), Attorney Jocelyn D. Hannah added to party National Steel and Shipbuilding Company(pty:dft) (jpp).
September 10, 2018 Filing 142 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Karen Ocampo. Plaintiff's First Amended Exhibit List. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER rescheduling hearing. Final Pretrial Conference continued to 9/20/2018 at 3:45pm. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 9/07/2018.(jpp)
August 20, 2018 Filing 140 Pretrial Disclosures by Karen Ocampo of Trial Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
August 20, 2018 Filing 139 Witness List by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
August 20, 2018 Filing 138 Pretrial Disclosures by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company (Pettit, Douglas) (jpp).
August 20, 2018 Filing 137 NOTICE of Designation of Deposition of Lieutenant Kenneth M. Davis, Jr. by Karen Ocampo (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
August 20, 2018 Filing 136 NOTICE of Filing of Pretrial Disclosure by United States of America (Kaufman-Cohen, Eric) (jpp).
August 20, 2018 Filing 135 NOTICE of Designation of Deposition of Candido Parco by Karen Ocampo (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
August 20, 2018 Filing 134 NOTICE of Designation of Deposition of Joe Pritchard by Karen Ocampo (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
August 20, 2018 Filing 133 NOTICE of Designation of Deposition of Francis Dodderer by Karen Ocampo (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
August 20, 2018 Filing 132 NOTICE of Designation of Deposition of Luis Armando Naranjo by Karen Ocampo (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
August 20, 2018 Filing 131 NOTICE of Designation of Deposition of Commander Robert Preston Suanders by Karen Ocampo (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
August 20, 2018 Filing 130 NOTICE of Designation of Deposition of Dean DelCamp by Karen Ocampo (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
August 20, 2018 Filing 129 NOTICE of Designation of Deposition of Frank Flores, Jr. by Karen Ocampo (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
August 17, 2018 Filing 128 NOTICE of Designation of Deposition of Barton J. Deem by Karen Ocampo (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
August 17, 2018 Filing 127 NOTICE of Designation of Deposition of Daniel Conley by Karen Ocampo (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
August 17, 2018 Filing 126 NOTICE of Designation of Deposition of Luis Campos by Karen Ocampo (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
August 17, 2018 Filing 125 NOTICE of Designation of Deposition of William S. Benjamin by Karen Ocampo (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
August 17, 2018 Filing 124 NOTICE of Designation of Deposition of David A. Burruel by Karen Ocampo (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
August 17, 2018 Filing 123 NOTICE of Designation of Deposition of Wayne Brown by Karen Ocampo (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
August 17, 2018 Filing 122 NOTICE of Designation of Deposition of Rick Pankow by Karen Ocampo (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
August 17, 2018 Filing 121 NOTICE of Designation of Deposition of Jared Powell by Karen Ocampo (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
August 17, 2018 Filing 120 NOTICE of Designation of Deposition of Christopher Young by Karen Ocampo (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
August 17, 2018 Filing 119 NOTICE of Designation of Deposition of Jack McGowan by Karen Ocampo (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
August 17, 2018 Filing 118 NOTICE of Designation of Deposition of Theodore R. Griggs by Karen Ocampo (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
August 17, 2018 Filing 117 NOTICE of Designation of Deposition of Dave Askew by Karen Ocampo (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
August 17, 2018 Filing 116 NOTICE of Designation of Deposition of David Anthony De Arman by Karen Ocampo (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
August 9, 2018 Filing 115 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Jennifer M. Hendricks by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company (Pettit, Douglas) (jpp).
August 8, 2018 Filing 114 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Valerie Garcia Hong by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company (Pettit, Douglas) (mpl).
July 16, 2018 Filing 113 NOTICE of Change of Handling Attorney by American Equity Underwriters, Inc. (Marin, John)Attorney John T Marin added to party American Equity Underwriters, Inc.(pty:misc) (jpp).
May 23, 2018 Filing 112 REPLY - Other re #111 Response - Other United States' Objection to National Steel and Shipbuilding Company's Opposition to Application for Leave to File Additional Evidence filed by United States of America. (Kaufman-Cohen, Eric) (jpp).
May 23, 2018 Filing 111 RESPONSE re #109 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Valerie Garcia Hong, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proof of Service)(Hong, Valerie) (jpp).
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER vacating hearing on #106 Motion for leave to amend the complaint set for 5/21/2018. The motion is taken under submission without oral argument. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 5/16/2018.(jpp)
May 14, 2018 Filing 109 RESPONSE in Opposition re #79 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment Application for Leave to File Additional Evidence in Opposition to NASSCO's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by United States of America. (Kaufman-Cohen, Eric) (jpp).
May 7, 2018 Filing 108 RESPONSE in Opposition re #106 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Conference Order and Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint for Damages United States' Joinder in National Steel and Shipbuilding Company's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Case Management Order and Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint filed by United States of America. (Kaufman-Cohen, Eric) (jpp).
May 7, 2018 Filing 107 RESPONSE in Opposition re #106 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Conference Order and Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint for Damages filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Hong, Valerie) (jpp).
April 12, 2018 Filing 106 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Conference Order and Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint for Damages by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fourth Amended Complaint For Damages, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion to Amend Case Management Conference Order and Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint for Damages, #3 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER re: #104 Joint Motion for Extension of expert discovery dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/02/2018. (jpp)
March 30, 2018 Filing 104 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Regarding Expert Completion Dates by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Valerie Garcia Hong, #2 Proof of Service)(Hong, Valerie) (jpp).
March 12, 2018 Filing 103 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Motion Hearing) held on 2/26/2018, before Judge John A. Houston. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cameron P. Kircher. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2018. (akr)
February 26, 2018 Filing 102 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston:Motion Hearing held on 2/26/2018 submitting #79 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment. (Court Reporter/ECR Cami Kircher). (Plaintiff Attorney Preston Warham Easley).(Defendant Attorney Douglas A. Pettit, Eric Kaufman-Cohen). (no document attached) (lwm)
February 26, 2018 Filing 101 NOTICE re: oral argument. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 2/26/2018.(jpp)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER rescheduling hearing on #79 Motion for Summary Judgment to 2/26/2018 at 2:30pm. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/12/2018.(jpp)
January 9, 2018 Filing 99 REPLY to Response to Motion re #79 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company's Reply to Plaintiff and Co-Defendant's Responses to Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company's Objections to Plaintiff and Co-Defendant's Evidence, #3 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Arnett, Emily) (jpp).
January 2, 2018 Filing 98 REPLY - Other re #95 Response in Opposition to Motion Response to Separate Statement of Material Facts of Defendant NASSCO filed by United States of America. (Kaufman-Cohen, Eric) (jpp).
January 2, 2018 Filing 97 DECLARATION re #95 Response in Opposition to Motion (Declaration of John McGowan) by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration A)(Kaufman-Cohen, Eric) (jpp).
January 2, 2018 Filing 96 DECLARATION re #95 Response in Opposition to Motion (Declaration of Eric Kaufman-Cohen) by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Kaufman-Cohen, Eric) (jpp).
January 2, 2018 Filing 95 RESPONSE in Opposition re #79 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by United States of America. (Kaufman-Cohen, Eric) (jpp).
December 27, 2017 Filing 94 RESPONSE in Opposition re #79 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven Wiker, #2 Statement of Facts Plaintiff's Response to Separate Statement of Material Facts In Support of Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company's Motion for Summary Judgment, or In The Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit 1-3, #4 Exhibit 4-6, #5 Exhibit 7-9, #6 Exhibit 10-18, #7 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #92 Plaintiff's application to exceed page limit. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 12/22/2017. (jpp)
December 18, 2017 Filing 92 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Allow Plaintiff to Exceed 25 Page Limit For Summary Judgment Opposition Brief by Anakaren Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Preston Easley, #2 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
December 15, 2017 Filing 91 Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company's ANSWER to #90 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim (Third Amended) of United States of America by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company.(Arnett, Emily) (jpp).
December 1, 2017 Filing 90 ANSWER to #80 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against National Steel and Shipbuilding Company by United States of America.(Kaufman-Cohen, Eric) (jpp).
November 17, 2017 Filing 89 ANSWER to #80 Amended Complaint by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company.(Hong, Valerie) (jpp).
November 17, 2017 Filing 88 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Document by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company re #86 Answer to Amended Complaint (Hong, Valerie) (jpp).
November 17, 2017 Filing 87 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company (Hong, Valerie) (jpp).
November 16, 2017 Filing 86 WITHDRAWN PER #88 ANSWER to #80 Amended Complaint by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company.(Hong, Valerie) (jpp). (jpp).
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting in part #82 Plaintiff's ex parte Motion to Continue hearing on Defendant's motion for summary judgment. Motion Hearing continued to 1/16/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 13B before Judge John A. Houston. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 11/08/2017. (jpp)
November 8, 2017 Filing 84 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Mandatory Settlement Conference held on 11/8/2017. Case did not resolve.(no document attached) (ajf)
November 7, 2017 Filing 83 NOTICE Amended Notice of and Application for Lien and Request for Notice by American Equity Underwriters, Inc. (MacInnes, Scott) (jpp).
November 7, 2017 Filing 82 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Preston Easley In Support of Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
November 6, 2017 Filing 81 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jpp)
November 6, 2017 Filing 80 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Complaint for Damages against All Defendants, filed by Karen Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)New Summons Requested. (Easley, Preston) (jpp)
November 3, 2017 Filing 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration Valerie Garcia Hong, #4 Declaration Joe Willcuts, #5 Declaration Dave Askew, #6 Notice Notice of Lodgment of Evidence, #7 Exhibit 1-3, #8 Exhibit 4-8, #9 Exhibit 9-16, #10 Exhibit 17-26, #11 Notice Notice of Lodgment of Foreign Authorities, #12 Exhibit Foreign Authorities A-J, #13 Proof of Service)(Hong, Valerie) (jpp).
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's #75 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file the Third Amended Complaint on or before November 13, 2017. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 11/2/2017. (knb) (Main Document 78 replaced to correct image on 11/3/2017) (knb).
November 1, 2017 Filing 77 NOTICE of and Application for Lien and Request for Notice by American Equity Underwriters, Inc. (MacInnes, Scott)Attorney Scott R. MacInnes added to party American Equity Underwriters, Inc.(pty:misc) (jpp).
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER regulating discovery and other pre-trial proceedings. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 11/8/2017 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 13B before Judge John A. Houston. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/03/2017. (jpp)
September 28, 2017 Filing 75 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct For Leave to File Third Amended Complaint for Damages by Anakaren Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of First Amended Motion For Leave to File Third Amended Complaint for Damages, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
September 28, 2017 Filing 74 Amended MOTION to Continue Joint Motion to Continue Fact Discovery Cut Off Date by Anakaren Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Preston Easley, #2 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
September 28, 2017 Filing 73 Joint MOTION to Continue Fact Discovery Cut Off Date by Anakaren Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Preston Easley, #2 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
September 26, 2017 Filing 72 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint For Damages by Anakaren Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion For Leave To File Third Amended Complaint For Damages, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER regulating discovery and other pre-trial proceedings. Telephonic Status Conference held 7/13/2017. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 11/8/2017 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/4/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2018 02:30 PM before Judge John A. Houston.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/13/2017.(jpp)
July 13, 2017 Filing 70 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Status Conference held on 7/13/2017(no document attached) (ajf)
July 7, 2017 Filing 69 STATUS REPORT Joint Letter Brief for Status Conference by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hong, Valerie) (jpp).
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Scheduling Telephonic Status Conference: On 7/13/2017 at 10:00 AM, the Court will hold an attorneys-only telephonic status conference. No later than 7/7/2017, the parties shall jointly file a 3-page maximum letter-brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/30/2017. (mdc)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion to set aside Magistrate Judge's orders (Doc. No. #47 , #63 ). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 5/18/2017. (jpp)
March 30, 2017 Filing 66 ANSWER to #64 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim of United States of America's Amended Cross-Claim by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company.(Arnett, Emily)Attorney Emily Rebekah Arnett added to party National Steel and Shipbuilding Company(pty:crd), Attorney Emily Rebekah Arnett added to party National Steel and Shipbuilding Company(pty:dft) (jpp).
March 29, 2017 Filing 65 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Christopher Bulone on Behalf of Plaintiff by Anakaren Lopez (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
March 28, 2017 Filing 64 ANSWER to #59 Amended Complaint (Second), CROSSCLAIM against National Steel and Shipbuilding Company by United States of America.(Kaufman-Cohen, Eric) (jpp).
March 27, 2017 Filing 63 OBJECTION by Plaintiff's to Order #56 Confirming Court's Prior Denial of Plaintiff's Request to Compel a Second Vessel Inspection [FRCP Rule 72(a)] by Anakaren Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp). Modified on 3/27/2017 to term motion, efiling is not a motion, text edited to reflect efiling is an objection. (jpp).
March 24, 2017 Filing 62 ANSWER to #59 Amended Complaint by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company.(Hong, Valerie) (jpp).
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER after #56 Order Referring Motion, confirming Court's prior denial of Plaintiff's request to compel second vessel inspection. Signed by Judge William V. Gallo on March 21, 2017. (ajf)
March 16, 2017 Filing 60 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference and Hearing held on 3/16/2017(Plaintiff Attorney Preston Easley, Marc Applbaum). (Defendant Attorney Eric Kaufman-Cohen, Douglas Pettit). Order to follow.(no document attached) (ajf)
March 14, 2017 Filing 59 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint for Damages against All Defendants, filed by Anakaren Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Easley, Preston) (jpp).
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER scheduling Telephonic Status Conference for 3/16/2017 at 9:00am. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/13/2017.(jpp)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #38 Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file the Second Amended Complaint on or before March 20, 2017. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/13/2017. (jpp)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Remanding Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Compelling Defendant to Provide an Opportunity for Another Inspection. It is Ordered: (1) Plaintiff's motion to compel is remanded to Judge Gallo to consider Plaintiff's new argument in determining whether Plaintiff's interest in inspecting the elevator platform a second time outweighs the burden to Defendant. (2) Plaintiff shall notify the Court of Judge Gallo's ruling and whether she renews her objection and motion to set aside based upon the ruling no more than seven (7) days after Judge Gallo issues his ruling. (ECF No. #47 ). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/6/2017. Motions set before William V. Gallo.(rlu)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER vacating hearing on #47 motion to set aside the magistrate judge's 9/30/2016 order. Court deems the motion suitable for adjudication without oral argument. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 11/09/2016.(jpp)
November 4, 2016 Filing 54 REPLY to Response to Motion re #47 MOTION vacate order re #46 Order Motion to Set Aside Magistrate Judge's Order filed by Anakaren Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bulone, Christopher) (kcm).
October 28, 2016 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #47 MOTION vacate order re #46 Order Motion to Set Aside Magistrate Judge's Order filed by United States of America. (Kaufman-Cohen, Eric) (jpp).
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER On Joint #51 Motion For Determination of Discovery Dispute; Compelling Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/17/2016. (ajf)
October 17, 2016 Filing 51 Joint MOTION to Compel by Anakaren Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Proof of Service)(Bulone, Christopher) (jpp).
October 17, 2016 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Vincent Bulone on behalf of Anakaren Lopez (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bulone, Christopher)Attorney Christopher Vincent Bulone added to party Anakaren Lopez(pty:pla) (jpp).
October 13, 2016 Filing 49 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 10/13/2016(Plaintiff Attorney Christopher Balone). (Defendant Attorney Jennifer Hendricks). (no document attached) (ajf)
October 13, 2016 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Hendricks on behalf of National Steel and Shipbuilding Company (Hendricks, Jennifer)Attorney Jennifer Hendricks added to party National Steel and Shipbuilding Company(pty:dft) (jpp).
October 5, 2016 Filing 47 MOTION vacate order re #46 Order Motion to Set Aside Magistrate Judge's Order by Anakaren Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying Plaintiff's request to compel compliance with second request for inspection #40 . Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/30/2016.(jpp)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER vacating hearing on #38 motion for leave to file a second amended complaint set for 10/03/2016. Court deems the motion suitable for adjudication without oral argument. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 9/26/2016.(jpp)
September 24, 2016 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re #38 MOTION to Amend/Correct for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint for Damages filed by Damaris Manzanero Vazquez. (Easley, Preston) (jpp).
September 20, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc S Applbaum on behalf of Damaris Manzanero Vazquez (Applbaum, Marc)Attorney Marc S Applbaum added to party Damaris Manzanero Vazquez(pty:pla) (jpp).
September 19, 2016 Filing 42 RESPONSE to Motion re #38 MOTION to Amend/Correct for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint for Damages filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Hong, Valerie) (jpp).
September 13, 2016 Filing 41 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Telephonic Discovery Conference re: Lopez depsotion held on 9/13/2016 with Plaintiff Attorney Preson Easley; Defense Attorneys Eric Kaufman-Cohen, Valerie Hong). No order to follow.(no document attached) (ajf)
September 9, 2016 Filing 40 JOINT HEARING STATEMENT by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit B-1, #5 Exhibit B-2, #6 Exhibit B-3, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Declaration of Eric Kaufman Re: Joint Statement for Discovery Dispute)(Kaufman-Cohen, Eric)(kas).
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER following telephonic discovery conference held 8/31/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/06/2016.(jpp)
August 25, 2016 Filing 38 MOTION to Amend/Correct for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint for Damages by Damaris Manzanero Vazquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint for Damages, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion For Leave to File Second Amended Complaint for Damages, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SCHEDULING ORDER regulating discovery and other pre-trial proceedings. Case Management Conference held 4/22/2016. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 9/6/2017 at 9:00am before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/2/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2018 at 2:30pm in Courtroom 13B before Judge John A. Houston. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/26/2016.(jpp)
April 25, 2016 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Case Management Conference held on 4/25/2016(no document attached) (mcb)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order Following ENE, setting Rule 26 compliance and notice of Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 3/09/2016.Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2016 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/16/2016.(jpp)
March 9, 2016 Filing 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 3/9/2016(no document attached) (lms)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/28/2016 is re-set for 3/9/2016 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/1/16.(kas)
December 18, 2015 Filing 32 ANSWER to #29 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim of United States of America by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company.(Pettit, Douglas) (jpp).
December 14, 2015 Filing 31 NASSCO's ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company.(Pettit, Douglas) (jpp).
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/28/2016 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/1/15.(dlg)
November 27, 2015 Filing 29 ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against National Steel and Shipbuilding Company by United States of America.(Kaufman-Cohen, Eric)(jpp).
November 23, 2015 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Damages against All Defendants, filed by Damaris Manzanero Vazquez. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Easley, Preston) (jpp).
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file a First Amended Complaint and vacating hearing. Plaintiff shall file her First Amended Complaint no later than December 7, 2015. The hearing set for November 30, 2015 on Plaintiffs motion is vacated. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 11/23/2015. (jpp)
October 28, 2015 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint for Damages by Damaris Manzanero Vazquez. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proof of Service)(Easley, Preston) (jpp).
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER following Telephonic Status Conference. On or before November 30, 2015, Plaintiff shall file a First Amended Complaint. On December 4, 2015, at 8:30 a.m., this Court will hold a telephonic Status Conference if Plaintiff has not filed a FAC. The Status Conference automatically will be vacated if Plaintiff filed a FAC on or before November 30, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/30/2015.(jpp)
September 30, 2015 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Status Conference held on 9/30/2015(no document attached) (mcb)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Minute Order: Plaintiff has not filed a First Amended Complaint, despite the August 14, 2015 deadline. Therefore, the Court will hold a telephonic Status Conference on September 30, 2015, at 9:00 a.m. Only counsel must participate and the Court will initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/25/15.(dlg)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER following second telephonic attorneys-only Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. On or before August 14, 2015, Plaintiff shall file a First AmendedComplaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/09/2015.(jpp)
July 9, 2015 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: second telephonic attorneys-only Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 7/9/2015(no document attached) (mcb)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER following Telephonic Attorneys-only Early Neutarl Evaluation Conference, Setting Second Telephonic Attorneys-only Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Second Telephonic Attorneys-only Early Neutral Evaluation set for 7/9/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Any supplemental ENE statements shall be submitted directly to the undersigned's chambers on or before July 2, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/12/15.(kas)
May 11, 2015 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: telephonic attorneys-only Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 5/11/2015(no document attached) (mcb)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FOURTH AMENDED NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation set for 5/11/2015 at 2:00pm before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/7/15.(jpp)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 THIRD AMENDED NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; converting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference into attorneys-only telephonic conference. Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation set for 5/7/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/28/2015.(jpp)
April 24, 2015 Filing 16 NOTICE by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company Dismissal of Cross-Claim against South Bay Sand Blasting & Tank Cleaning, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Hong, Valerie) (jpp).
March 27, 2015 Filing 15 National Steel and Shipbuilding Company's ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, United States of America by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company.(Pettit, Douglas) (jpp).
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. The Early Neutral Evaluation (ENE) Conference set for April 29, 2015, at9:00 a.m. is hereby vacated. The Court will instead hold an Early NeutralEvaluation Conference on May 6, 2015, at 2:00 p.m., before United States Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/12/2015.(jpp)
March 11, 2015 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against South Bay Sand Blasting and Tank Cleaning, Inc. by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company.(Pettit, Douglas) (jpp).
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 4/29/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 03/09/2015.(jpp)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 6/29/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/9/2015.(jpp)
March 6, 2015 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, of Damaris Manzanero Vazquez, CROSSCLAIM against National Steel and Shipbuilding Company by United States of America.(Kaufman-Cohen, Eric)Attorney Eric Kaufman-Cohen added to party United States of America(pty:dft) (jpp).
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file a responsive pleading. National Steel and Shipbuilding Company responsive pleading due 3/11/2015.. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 02/27/2015. (jpp)
February 26, 2015 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Valerie Garcia Hong on behalf of National Steel and Shipbuilding Company (Hong, Valerie)Attorney Valerie Garcia Hong added to party National Steel and Shipbuilding Company(pty:dft) (jpp).
February 26, 2015 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Nicholas Kohn on behalf of National Steel and Shipbuilding Company (Kohn, Andrew)Attorney Andrew Nicholas Kohn added to party National Steel and Shipbuilding Company(pty:dft) (jpp).
February 25, 2015 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. Amendment to #4 Notice of Appearance, #5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, Amended Certificate of Service. (Pettit, Douglas) (jpp).
February 25, 2015 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Pettit, Douglas) (jpp).
February 25, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas A Pettit on behalf of National Steel and Shipbuilding Company (Pettit, Douglas)Attorney Douglas A Pettit added to party National Steel and Shipbuilding Company(pty:dft) (jpp).
January 27, 2015 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (fth)(jrd)
January 27, 2015 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Damaris Manzanero Vazquez. (fth)(jrd)
January 27, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-7752247.), filed by Damaris Manzanero Vazquez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:15-cv-00180-JAH-WVG. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Easley, Preston)(fth)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ocampo v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Eric Kaufman-Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company
Represented By: Jennifer Megan Hendricks
Represented By: Emily Rebekah Arnett
Represented By: Valerie Garcia Hong
Represented By: Douglas A Pettit
Represented By: Andrew Nicholas Kohn
Represented By: Jocelyn D. Hannah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damaris Manzanero Vazquez
Represented By: Marc S Applbaum
Represented By: Preston Warham Easley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anakaren Lopez
Represented By: Marc S Applbaum
Represented By: Christopher Vincent Bulone
Represented By: Preston Warham Easley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Ocampo
Represented By: Preston Warham Easley, Jr.
Represented By: Peter Maxwell Yovanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Guardian ad litem: Gary Dale Jander
Represented By: Gary D. Jander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: American Equity Underwriters, Inc.
Represented By: Scott R. MacInnes
Represented By: John T Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: South Bay Sand Blasting and Tank Cleaning, Inc.
Represented By: John T Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?