Mohamed v. Lackner
Petitioner: Khaled Mohamed
Respondent: Heidi M. Lackner
Case Number: 3:2015cv00267
Filed: February 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: Karen S. Crawford
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DISMISSING Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus as Moot. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/31/17.(dlg)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting Petitioner's 29 Motion to Expand the Record. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/21/2017. (fth)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Denying 19 Motion for In Forma Pauperis Status and Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 6/17/16. (dlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohamed v. Lackner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Khaled Mohamed
Represented By: Charles R. Khoury, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Heidi M. Lackner
Represented By: Angela M Borzachillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?