Sekerke v. Gonzalez et al
Plaintiff: Keith Wayne Sekerke
Defendant: John Doe Gonzalez, John Doe, Lisa Guiguite Stark and Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2015cv00573
Filed: March 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William V. Gallo
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendation Re Motions for Summary Judgment. The Court adopts Judge Gallo's 108 R&R, grants Defendant's 90 Motion for Summary Judgment, and denies Plaintiff's 101 Motion for Summary Judgment. Because Plaintiff has failed to serve the Defendants within the time requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m), the Doe Defendants are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/5/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Adopting 108 Report and Recommendation Re Plaintiff's 88 Motion for to Reinstate Dismissed Defendant. It is ordered, the court adopts Magistrate Judge Gallo's Report and Recommendation and denies with prejudice Plaintiff's 88 Motion to Reinstate Dismissed Defendant Lisa Stark. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/20/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on (1) Defendant's 90 Motion for Summary Judgment and (2) Plaintiff's 101 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court recommends Defendant's motion be granted. The Court further recommends that Plainti ff's cross-motion be denied as untimely. It is ordered that no later than 2/28/2018, any party to this action may file written objections with the Court and serve a copy on all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/14/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Reinstate Dismissed Defendant re 88 MOTION for Reconsideration. Objections to the R&R are due by 2/9/2018. Replies are due by 2/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 1/8/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER: (1) Overruling Plaintiff's R & R Objections; (2) Adopting 78 R & R (3) And Denying 76 Ex Parte Request for a Prison Transfer and Motion for Injunction. It is ordered that the Court overrules Plaintiff's Objections; adopts Magistrate Judge Gallo's Report and Recommendation; and denies Plaintiff's Transfer Motion in its entirety. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/26/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiff's 64 Motion to Appoint Counsel And Expert Witness. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/19/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION re 76 MOTION Ex Parte Request for a Prison Transfer MOTION for Order Upon CDCR Officials to Stop Retaliation and Assaults and Injunction filed by Keith Wayne Sekerke. It is hereby recommended that plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief be denied. No later than 5/20/2017, the parties may file written objections with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/17/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER On Motion For Determination of Discovery Dispute re 68 Objection filed by Keith Wayne Sekerke. It is ordered that the Court overrules plaintiff's objections to defendant's subpoena and enters a Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/7/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sekerke v. Gonzalez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Wayne Sekerke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Guiguite Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?