San Diego Unified Port District v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: San Diego Unified Port District and City of San Diego
Defendant: Monsanto Company, Solutia Inc. and Pharmacia Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv00578
Filed: March 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Jill L. Burkhardt
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 410 Protective Order for Third-Party Materials: Granting 405 Joint MOTION for Protective Order for Third Party Materials. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 7/3/2019. (tcf)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER: The motion to amend (ECF No. 328 ) filed by Plaintiff City of San Diego is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/20/2019. (ag)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER: The motion to sever (ECF No. 296 ) filed by Plaintiff San Diego Unified Port District is denied. The alternative motion to amend (ECF No. 296 ) the fourth amended scheduling order is granted in part as follows: "All fact discovery shall be completed by all parties by July 8, 2019." and is otherwise denied. The fourth amended scheduling order (ECF No. 270 at 1:20) is amended as follows: "All fact discovery shall be completed by all parties by July 8, 2019." Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/1/2019. (ag)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER: The Joint Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings (ECF No. 292 ) is Granted in part and Denied in part. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 01/30/2019. (ajs)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER Re Defendants' In Camera Submission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman on 11/13/2018.(ajs)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER: The motion to sever filed by Plaintiff San Diego Unified Port District (ECF No. 248 ) is Denied. It is further Ordered that trial is set for Tuesday, 02/18/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14B before this Court and the Final Pretrial Conferenc e is set for Friday, 12/06/2019 at 9:30 a.m. The Magistrate Judge shall set an amended scheduling order addressing the deadlines set in the Third Amended Scheduling Order in light of the pretrial conference date and the trial date. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 09/21/2018. (ajs)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER: The motion for judgment on the pleadings is Denied. (ECF No. 213 ). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 09/05/2018. (ajs)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER: That the motion for leave to file a supplement to the First Amended Complaint is Denied. (ECF No. 214 ). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 08/30/2018. (ajs)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER: The motion to dismiss the counterclaims (ECF No. 208 ) filed by City of San Diego is Granted. The counterclaims for unjust enrichment and violations of the Clean Water Act are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 08/10/2018. (ajs)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion to Compel (ECF No. 223 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Clinton Averitte on 08/02/2018. (ajs)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER: The motions to withdraw Lauren K. Valastro, Melanie Ann McDonald, and Ann L. Al-Bahish as counsel are Granted. (ECF Nos. 227 , 228 , 229 ). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 07/19/2018. (ajs)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER: The motion for reconsideration or, in the alternative, certification for interlocutory appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) is Denied. (ECF No. 175 ). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 04/17/2018. (ajs)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER: The Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses filed by the Port District is Denied. (ECF No. 112 ). The Motion to Dismiss the Counterclaims (ECF No. 113 ) filed by the Port District is Granted. The Counterclaims alleged in the First Amended Answer and Counterclaim filed by Monsanto against the Port District are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 01/30/2018. (ajs)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER: The motion to dismiss the City's Second Amended Complaint filed by Monsanto is Denied. (ECF No. 108 ). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/22/2017. (ajs)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER: Monsanto's Motion to Dismiss the Port District's Amended Complaint (Dkt # 32 ) is granted as to the Port District's equitable indemnity cause of action and denied in all other respects. Monsanto's Motion to Dismiss the City's Amended Complaint (Dkt # 31 ) is granted. Plaintiffs shall file any motions for leave to amend complying with Local Rule 15.1 within sixty (60) days of this Order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 9/28/2016. (mdc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Diego Unified Port District v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Diego Unified Port District
Represented By: John N. Carter
Represented By: John P. Fiske
Represented By: Paul Frederick Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of San Diego
Represented By: John N. Carter
Represented By: John P. Fiske
Represented By: Paul Frederick Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solutia Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?