Alexis v. Rogers et al
Plaintiff: Laura Alexis
Defendant: James B. Rogers, Gladys Holdings, LLC, Beeland Interests, Inc. and DOES 1-50
Case Number: 3:2015cv00691
Filed: March 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER denying 111 Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/1/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: The complaint is Hereby Dismissed With Prejudice. The Clerk shall close the case. It is so Ordered.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jjg)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Terminating Sanctions Against Plaintiff [ECF No. 99 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 5/12/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jjg)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Omnibus Discovery Motion [ECF. No. 82 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 3/21/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jjg)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER: (1) Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendants' Motion to Compel Pablo Ivan Fabian's and Hullinger Firm, PC's Compliance with Defendants' Subpoena Duces Tecum and (2) Denying Defendants' Motion for Sanctions in the Amount of $3,654.50 [Doc. No. 88 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 3/20/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jjg)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER: (1) granting in part and denying in part 59 Defendant's Motion for Monetary Sanctions Based on Plaintiff Laura Alexis' and/or Plaintiff's Counsel's Willful Violation of the October 21, 2016 Court Order; (2) denying 61 D efendants' Motion for Monetary Sanctions Based on Plaintiff's Fraud on the Court; (3) granting in part and denying in part 60 Defendants' Motion for Monetary and/or Evidentiary Sanctions Based on Plaintiffs' Continued Withholding of Critical Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 12/16/2016. (kcm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexis v. Rogers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Alexis
Represented By: Amber Lee Eck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B. Rogers
Represented By: Olaf Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gladys Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beeland Interests, Inc.
Represented By: Olaf Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?