Mohamed v. Tampkins
Petitioner: Ebrahim Mussa Mohamed
Respondent: Cynthia Tampkins
Case Number: 3:2015cv00704
Filed: March 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Presiding Judge: William V. Gallo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 44 ) is Adopted in its entirety. The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (ECF No. 1 ) is Denied. A certificate of appealability is Granted with respect to the first, second, and third grounds for relief in the Petition. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for Respondent and against Petitioner and close the case. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 02/12/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for an Order Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Objections to R&R due by 7/12/2017, Replies due by 7/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/9/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting Petitioner's 38 Motion for Leave to Amend Traverse. Petitioner shall file an Amended Traverse on or before January 20, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/20/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and Denying Motion to Stay ( 9 , 21 ). Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/4/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Denying Petitioner's 15 Motion to Appoint Counsel without Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/30/2015. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohamed v. Tampkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ebrahim Mussa Mohamed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cynthia Tampkins
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?