Ruvalcaba v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: |
Camila S. Ruvalcaba |
Defendant: |
Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC., Equifax Information Services, LLC., Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Trans Union LLC. |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv00744 |
Filed: |
April 6, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
David H. Bartick |
Presiding Judge: |
Cynthia Bashant |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 8, 2018 |
Filing
210
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Ocwen Loan Servicing's state-law claims against Equity Title Company and dismisses the Cross-Claim 111 without prejudice. With no claims remaining in this litigation, The Clerk is directed to close the case. Court terminates as moot Equity's 204 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 3/8/2018. (jah)
|
January 26, 2018 |
Filing
201
ORDER granting 196 Joint Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement. All Cross-Claims by Ocwen Loan Servicing LCC (Ocwen) against the Settling Defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Ocwen's sole remaining cross-claims in this action a re against Plaintiff and Equity Title Company (Equity). Court bars any present or potential joint tortfeasor from bringing any future claims against the Settling Defendants for equitable contribution or partial or comparative indemnity based on compa rative negligence or comparative fault in connection with the conduct at issue in this litigation. The Settling Defendants and Plaintiff are ordered to carry out the terms of the Settlement. Settling Defendants shall pay the Plaintiff the agreed amount within 30 days of this Order. Plaintiff and Settling Defendants shall thereafter move to dismiss with prejudice their respective claims and cross-claims. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/26/2018. (jah)
|
January 4, 2018 |
Filing
198
ORDER denying Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC's 183 Motion for Leave to File Amended Cross-Claim. Cross-Defendant Equity Title Company shall file answer to the Cross-Claim by 1/15/2018. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/4/2018. (jah)
|
July 13, 2017 |
Filing
156
ORDER granting 107 Equity Title Company's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 107 Equity Title Company's Motion to Strike. The Court dismisses Plaintiff's negligence claim against Equity Title with leave to amend. If Plaintiff chooses to file a Fourth Amended Complaint, it must be filed no later than July 27, 2017. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 7/13/2017. (bxc)
|
December 9, 2016 |
Filing
93
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC's 71 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying People's Escrow, Inc.'s 74 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint; denying Prospect Mortgage, LLC's 75 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 12/9/2016. (jah)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?