June 26, 2018 |
Filing
334
ORDER Denying Third Party Defendants' 328 Motion for Reconsideration. The hearing set for June 28, 2018 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/26/18. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
|
March 23, 2018 |
Filing
322
Order on Plaintiff's Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law on Express Indemnification Cause of Action in Third Party Complaint ( 316 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/23/18.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
|
November 29, 2017 |
Filing
217
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. David Howitt 152 ; Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimonies of Dr. David Hall 148 , Dr. Miche l Brones 147 , and Paul Schwartzman 150 ; and Denying Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimonies of Dr. David Xu, and Andrew Ellison 149 , 156 . Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/29/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
|
November 16, 2017 |
Filing
202
ORDER Providing Tentative Ruling: Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. David Howitt 152 ; Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimonies of Dr. Da vid Hall 148 , and Dr. Michel Brones 147 ; and Denying Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimonies of Dr. David Xu, and Andrew Ellison 149 , 156 . Counsel are advised that the Court's rulings are tentative and the Court will entertain additional arguments at the hearing on November 17, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/16/17.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
|
November 14, 2017 |
Filing
200
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 146 Motion to Bifurcate the issue of punitive damages from the trial on liability and damages. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/14/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
|
June 28, 2017 |
Filing
138
ORDER granting 125 Defendants' Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement. The Court GRANTS Ralph Lauren Defendants' motion for determination of good faith settlement. The hearing set for 7/14/2017 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/28/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
|
December 6, 2016 |
Filing
99
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Schwab Defendants' 80 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court denies Schwab Defendants' motion for summary on the causes of action for manufacturing defect, design defect, failure to warn, negl igence and breach of warranty and grants Schwab Defendants' motion for summary judgment as to the individually named Defendants. The hearing date set for December 9, 2016 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/6/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
|
September 12, 2016 |
Filing
90
ORDER on 79 MOTION for Discovery Dispute Re: Defendant Ralph Lauren Corporation's Responses To Plaintiffs Special Interrogatories, Set One. As provided herein, Defendant is required to supplement its responses no later than 14 days from the filing of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 9/12/16. (Dembin, Mitchell)
|
September 2, 2016 |
Filing
89
ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' Ex Parte 82 Motion to Deny Schwab defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing Date on Schwab Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court reschedules the hearing on Schwab Defendants' motion for summary judgment from September 23, 2016 to December 9, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Any opposition shall be filed on or before November 4, 2016. Any reply shall be filed on or before November 18, 2016. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/2/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
|
June 30, 2016 |
Filing
72
ORDER Granting in Part anDefendants' Ex Parte 68 Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule on Their Motion for Summary Judgment 66 . Any opposition to Defendants' motion for summary judgment be filed on or before August 12, 2016. Any reply shall be filed on or before August 19, 2016. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/30/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
|
September 16, 2015 |
Filing
21
ORDER Granting 13 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint. The hearing set for September 25, 2015 is Vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/16/2015. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
|