Flores v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Maria Flores
Defendant: United States of America and Does 1 through 20
Case Number: 3:2015cv00836
Filed: April 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: David H. Bartick
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting 65 Motion Re-Tax Defendant's Bill of Costs. The motion hearing scheduled for November 17, 2017, is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/7/17. (dlg)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW Following Bench Trial. The Court enters judgment in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/30/17.(dlg)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 17 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Defendant's motion for partial summary judgment as to Plaintiff's claim for relief under California's Elder Abuse and Dependent Adult Civil Protection Act, Cal. Welf. & Inst. Code §§ 15600-15675, and for tortious intentional infliction of emotional distress be GRANTED. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/20/16. (dlg)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting 11 Joint Motion for Additional Time to Allow Parties to Designate Additional Expert. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 4/4/16. (dlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Flores
Represented By: Alvin Mark Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?