Jennings v. Polanco et al
Plaintiff: |
Brian Jennings |
Defendant: |
Justin Polanco, MD, Goldstein and Does 1 through 5 |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv00890 |
Filed: |
April 21, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
Kern |
Presiding Judge: |
Larry Alan Burns |
Presiding Judge: |
Bernard G. Skomal |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 9, 2016 |
Filing
20
ORDER denying without prejudice plaintiff's 19 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 3/9/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kas)
|
December 30, 2015 |
Filing
15
ORDER denying without prejudice plaintiff's 14 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 12/30/15. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kas)
|
June 2, 2015 |
Filing
4
ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. US Marshal shall effect service of complaint. The Secretary CDCR, or his designee, is ordered to collect from prison trust account 1.54 initial filing fee and forward the remaining $348.46 balance of the filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the trust account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month income credited to the account and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each ti me the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b)(2). (Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR). Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/1/15. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(IFP package prepared)(kas)
|
April 29, 2015 |
Filing
2
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice for failure to pay the $400 civil filing and administrative fee or to submit a Motion to Proceed IFP pursuant to28 U.S.C. §§ 1914(a) and 1915(a); the court grants Plaintiff forty-five (45) days l eave from the date this Order is filed to: (a) prepay the entire $400 civil filing and administrative fee in full; or (b) complete and file a Motion to Proceed IFP which includes a certified copy of his trust account statement for the 6-month period preceding the filing of his Complaint. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/27/15. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(motion for ifp mailed to plaintiff)(kas)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?