Saterbak v. National Default Servicing Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Laura D. Saterbak
Defendant: National Default Servicing Corporation, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and DOES 1- XXX
Case Number: 3:2015cv00956
Filed: April 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Presiding Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and National Default Servicing Corporation are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant J P Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Securitized Asset Management II, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. The Motion for Order is denied as moot. The Motion for Entry ofDefault is denied. (mdc)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: The motion to dismiss the first amended complaint filed by Defendant SAMI is granted. (Dkt # 56 ). Plaintiff's claims against Defendant SAMI are dismissed with prejudice. The Motion for Order (Dkt # 63 ) is denied as moot in light of the Court's instant Order. The Motion for Entry of Default (Dkt # 55 ) is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/19/2017. (mdc)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: The motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants SPS and NDSC (Dkt # 25 ) is granted. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants SPS and NDSC are dismissed with prejudice. The motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Chase (Dkt # 36 ) is granted. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Chase are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/22/2016. (mdc)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (Re Dkt # 8 ): Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint is granted in its entirety. Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff may file a motion to file a First Amended Complaint within thirty (30 ) days of the date this order is issued, accompanied by the proposed First Amended Complaint. If Plaintiff does not file a motion to file a First Amended Complaint within thirty (30) days of the date this order is issued, the Clerk of Court will be ordered to close the case. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/1/2015. (mdc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saterbak v. National Default Servicing Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura D. Saterbak
Represented By: John Owen Murrin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Default Servicing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1- XXX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?