Howell v. Grindr LLC
Plaintiff: Mark Howell
Defendant: Grindr LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv01337
Filed: June 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting Joint #54 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/26/16. (dlg) (jao).
October 26, 2016 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Grindr LLC re #54 Joint MOTION to Dismiss (stipulated) dismissal with prejudice (Dailey, Colin) (dlg).
October 25, 2016 Filing 54 Joint MOTION to Dismiss (stipulated) dismissal with prejudice by Grindr LLC. (Dailey, Colin) qc email, missing certificate of service (dlg).
October 3, 2016 Filing 53 The parties filed a notice of settlement. Telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference set for 11/18/2016 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Plaintiff's counsel must arrange the conference call. If the parties filed dismissal papers before that time the conference will be vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 10/3/16.(no document attached) (ecp)
September 29, 2016 Filing 52 NOTICE of Settlement by Mark Howell (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Loker, Matthew) (dlg).
July 28, 2016 Filing 51 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Mark Howell (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Loker, Matthew) (knb).
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting Joint #49 Motion for Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 7/18/16. (dlg)
July 15, 2016 Filing 49 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Grindr LLC. (Dailey, Colin) QC email re attached proposed order (dlg).
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Class Certification Motion Filing Deadline. Plaintiff must file a motion for class certification by December 2, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 6/27/16.(dlg)
June 27, 2016 Filing 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 6/27/2016. Case did not settle. Scheduling order to issue. (Plaintiff Attorney Matthew Loker). (Defendant Attorneys Douglas Thompson, Colin Dailey). (no document attached) (lkw)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference With Counsel Only. Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation set for 6/27/2016 at 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 5/12/16.(dlg) (jao).
May 11, 2016 Filing 45 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Grindr LLC re #43 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Grindr LLC . (Dailey, Colin) (dlg).
May 11, 2016 Filing 44 Defendant's ANSWER to #33 Amended Complaint Second by Grindr LLC.(Dailey, Colin) (dlg).
May 11, 2016 Filing 43 *** DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF 45 *** Defendant's ANSWER to #33 Amended Complaint (Second) by Grindr LLC.(Dailey, Colin). Modified on 5/11/2016 - Pages missing, Atty refiling. Updated answer deadline (jah). Modified on 5/12/2016 (dlg).
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting #41 Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney. Added attorney Douglas Andrew Thompson,Linda C. Hsu,Colin Dailey for Grindr LLC. Attorney Darcie Tilly; Mazda K Antia and Craig Edward TenBroeck terminated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/10/16. (dlg) (jao).
May 10, 2016 Filing 41 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Grindr LLC. (Thompson, Douglas) (dlg).
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #36 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The Court denies Defendant's motion to dismiss as to the claims brought under California Civil Code section 1694 et seq. and California Business & Professions Code section 17200 et seq. The Court Grants Defendant's motion to dismiss the claim under California Business & Professions Code section 17535 et seq. with prejudice. The hearing set for April 29, 2016 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/27/16. (dlg) (jao).
April 1, 2016 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Support re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Grindr LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Antia, Mazda) (dlg).
March 18, 2016 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Mark Howell. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Loker, Matthew) (nbp)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint : Any opposition shall be filed on or before March 18, 2016. Any reply shall be filed on or before April 1, 2016. A hearing is set on April 29, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/10/16.(dlg)
February 9, 2016 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Grindr LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Antia, Mazda) (srm).
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting #34 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant Grinder LLC to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Grindr LLC shall have until and including February 9, 2016 to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/8/16. (dlg)
January 7, 2016 Filing 34 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Grindr LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Antia, Mazda) (dlg).
December 31, 2015 Filing 33 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Grindr LLC, filed by Mark Howell. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Loker, Matthew) (srm).
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting #19 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss With Leave to Amend. Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint on or before December 31, 2015. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/15/15. (srm)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel, Motions Submitted #19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Strike Plaintiff's Class Allegations, Court will prepare a written order. Motion Hearing scheduled for 12/11/2015 is vacated.(no document attached) (lsf)
December 2, 2015 Filing 30 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendant Grindr LLC re #26 Order Setting Briefing Schedule, . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Antia, Mazda) (dlg).
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Grindr LLC's Unopposed Application for Administrative Relief: Motion for a One Day Extension to File its Supplemental Brief. Grindr shall have up to and December 2, 2015 to file its response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/30/2015. (kcm)
November 25, 2015 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed Application for Administrative Relief: Motion for A One Day Extension to File Its Supplemental Brief by Grindr LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Antia, Mazda) (aef).
November 24, 2015 Filing 27 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Plaintiff Mark Howell re: the Application of the Dating Service Contract Act to Smartphones in Response to this Court's November 12, 2015 Order [ECF No. 26]. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Loker, Matthew) (aef).
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Requesting Additional Briefing and Rescheduling Hearing Date re #19 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint: Plaintiff's brief due by 11/24/2015, Defendant's response due by 12/1/2015. The hearing on Defendant's motion to dismiss is continued from November 13, 2015 to December 11, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/12/2015. (srm)
November 12, 2015 Filing 25 NOTICE of Change of Hearing on Motion #19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Strike Plaintiff's Class Allegations : Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2015 is continued to 12/11/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. (no document attached) (lsf)
October 23, 2015 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Strike Plaintiff's Class Allegations filed by Grindr LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Antia, Mazda)
October 9, 2015 Filing 23 OBJECTION by Mark Howell re #20 Request for Judicial Notice, (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Loker, Matthew) (srm).
October 9, 2015 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Strike Plaintiff's Class Allegations filed by Mark Howell. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Loker, Matthew) (srm).
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #19 MOTION to Dismiss: Responses due by 10/9/2015, Replies due by 10/23/2015. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/23/2015. (srm)
September 23, 2015 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Grindr LLC re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Strike Plaintiff's Class Allegations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 3), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 3), #3 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 3), #4 Proof of Service)(Antia, Mazda) (srm).
September 23, 2015 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Strike Plaintiff's Class Allegations by Grindr LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Antia, Mazda) (srm).
September 1, 2015 Filing 18 NOTICE by Grindr LLC re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Defendant Grindr LLC's Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Antia, Mazda) (dlg).
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #16 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant Grindr LLC to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Defendant shall have until and including September 23, 2015 to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/31/15. (dlg)
August 28, 2015 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to First Amended Complaint by Grindr LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Antia, Mazda) (dlg).
August 21, 2015 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Grindr LLC, filed by Mark Howell. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Loker, Matthew) (dlg).
August 12, 2015 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Edward TenBroeck on behalf of Grindr LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(TenBroeck, Craig)Attorney Craig Edward TenBroeck added to party Grindr LLC(pty:dft) (srm).
August 12, 2015 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Darcie Tilly on behalf of Grindr LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Tilly, Darcie)Attorney Darcie Tilly added to party Grindr LLC(pty:dft) (srm).
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #10 MOTION to Dismiss: Responses due by 9/4/2015, Replies due by 9/11/2015. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/12/2015. (srm)
August 11, 2015 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Grindr LLC re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 3), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 3), #3 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 3), #4 Proof of Service)(Antia, Mazda) (srm).
August 11, 2015 Filing 10 *** DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN *** MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Grindr LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Antia, Mazda) (srm). Modified on 9/2/2015 to withdraw per ecf 18 (dlg).
August 11, 2015 Filing 9 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Grindr LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Antia, Mazda) (srm).
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint, Grindr LLC answer/response due 8/11/2015. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/10/2015. (srm)
July 6, 2015 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to Complaint by Grindr LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Antia, Mazda)Attorney Mazda K Antia added to party Grindr LLC(pty:dft) (srm).
June 23, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd M. Friedman on behalf of Mark Howell (Friedman, Todd)Attorney Todd M. Friedman added to party Mark Howell(pty:pla) (srm).
June 22, 2015 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Howell. Grindr LLC served. (Loker, Matthew) (srm).
June 19, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Swigart on behalf of Mark Howell (Swigart, Joshua)Attorney Joshua Swigart added to party Mark Howell(pty:pla) (srm).
June 18, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Abbas Kazerounian on behalf of Mark Howell (Kazerounian, Abbas)Attorney Abbas Kazerounian added to party Mark Howell(pty:pla) (srm).
June 18, 2015 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (fth)
June 18, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Grindr LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-8171291.), filed by Mark Howell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:15-cv-1337-GPC-NLS. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Loker, Matthew)(fth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howell v. Grindr LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grindr LLC
Represented By: Craig Edward TenBroeck
Represented By: Darcie Tilly
Represented By: Mazda K Antia
Represented By: Linda C. Hsu
Represented By: Colin D Dailey
Represented By: Douglas Andrew Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Howell
Represented By: Matthew M. Loker
Represented By: Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Represented By: Joshua B. Swigart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?