Trujillo et al v. Ametek, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Danielle Trujillo, Lacey Morales and Beverly Hoy
Defendant: Ametek, Inc., Senior Aerospace Ketema, Does 1 through 100 and Senior Operations LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv01394
Filed: June 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Presiding Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER Granting Unopposed 178 Motion Order (1) Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, (2) Certifying Settlement Class, (3) Appointing Class Representatives and Class Counsel, (4) Approving Notice Plan, and (5) Setting Final App roval Hearing. All pretrial and trial proceedings and deadlines are stayed and suspended until further notice from the Court. Fairness Hearing set for 8/24/2020 at 11:30 AM before Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/13/20. (dlg)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Denying Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Lone Pine Submission. (ECF 84 and 85 ). This case shall proceed forward in due course. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/17/17.(dlg)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 89 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/21/17. (dlg)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Denying 81 Request for Status Conference; and Granting Request for Briefing Schedule for Objections to Plaintiff's Response to Court's Lone Pine Order 77 . Defendants shall file any objections by January 2, 2016. Plaintiff shall file any reply by January 23, 2016. A response to Plaintiffs reply may be filed on or before January 30, 2016. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/2/16. (dlg)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Denying Attorney's Fees and Costs Associated with Spoliation Motion 55 . The Court's Order 54 dated March 4, 2016 is amended to exclude payment of reasonable attorney fees and costs associated with bringing the spoliation motion. The remainder of the Court's Order March 4, 2016 is unaffected. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 9/2/16.(dlg)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: (1) Vacating Further Telephonic Case Management Conference; and (2) Setting Telephonic Status Conference. The telephonic Case Management Conference currently scheduled for August 19, 2016, is vacated. The Court will hold a telephonic status conference on October 12, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. to receive a status update regarding Plaintiff's prima facie showing before Judge Curiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 8/15/16.(dlg)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Granting in Part 59 , 60 Defendants' Motions for Entry of Lone Pine Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/28/16. (dlg)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 31 Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions and Preservation. No later than March 28, 2016, Plaintiffs' counsel shall file a declaration as to the attorney's fees and costs associated with the ins tant spoliation motion. Counsel for Defendant Ametek may file a response to the attorney's fees and costs listed in Plaintiffs' counsel's declaration no later than April 4, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 3/4/16. (dlg)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 25 Defendant Ametek's Motion to Dismiss and Granting in Part and Denying in Part 24 Defendant Senior Operation's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' strict liability (ultrahazardous activity) claim is dismissed as to all Defendants. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/18/15. (dlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trujillo et al v. Ametek, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Trujillo
Represented By: Carla Burke
Represented By: Celeste A. Evangelisti
Represented By: John P. Fiske
Represented By: Scott Summy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacey Morales
Represented By: Carla Burke
Represented By: Celeste A. Evangelisti
Represented By: John P. Fiske
Represented By: Scott Summy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Hoy
Represented By: Celeste A. Evangelisti
Represented By: John P. Fiske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ametek, Inc.
Represented By: Hazel Ocampo
Represented By: Sean Michael Sullivan
Represented By: Edward C. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Aerospace Ketema
Represented By: Mackenzie A. Baird
Represented By: Robert J Parks
Represented By: David James Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Operations LLC
Represented By: Robert J Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?