Mendoza v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Ali Alejandro Mendoza
Defendant: United States of America and National City, City of
Case Number: 3:2015cv01528
Filed: July 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 141 Defendants National City and Benjamin Peck's motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 4/19/2018. (jpp)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER setting Mandatory Settlement Conference for 1/17/2018 at 1:30pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 10/20/2017.(jpp)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER denying as moot 66 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or, alternatively, to strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint; and 101 Defendant Malandris' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 9/28/2017. (jpp)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 61 Defendant USA's motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, failure to state a claim, or, in the alternative, to strike the second amended complaint. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 9/27/2017. (jpp)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER: (1) Granting Defendant USA's Motions For Summary Judgment, Docs 43 62 ; and (2) Granting in part and denying in part Defendant National City's Motions For Summary Judgment, Docs 48 65 . Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/31/2017. (jao)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Alejandro Mendoza
Represented By: Joseph Gary Dicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National City, City of
Represented By: Mitchell D Dean
Represented By: Heather E. Paradis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?