Estate of Kevin Brown et al v. City of San Diego et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Kevin Brown and Rebecca Brown
Defendant: City of San Diego, Michael Lambert, Sandra Oplinger and Does 1-50
Case Number: 3:2015cv01583
Filed: July 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William V. Gallo
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 260 Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees. In light of Defendants appeal of this case, the Court denies Plaintiffs motions without prejudice. If necessary, Plaintiffs may renew their motions upon completion of the appellate process. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/6/2020. (mme)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER Denying Defendants' Motion for New Trial and Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law 213 , 214 . Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/12/20. (jmo)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER granting 257 Joint Motion for Addendum Regarding Order on Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/16/2020. (djk)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER on Discovery Dispute Regarding Discoverability of Defendants' Reinsurance Policy. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/02/2020.(djk)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER granting 251 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/30/2020. (djk)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Second Amended ORDER: (1) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and (2) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court grants Defendants' motion on Plaintiffs' fourth claim for relief, grants Plaintiffs' motion on the third claim for relief and denies the remainder of the motions. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/27/2017.(aef)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Amended ORDER: (1) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and (2) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Specifically, the Court grants Defendants' motion on Plaintiffs' fourth claim for relief, grants Plaintiffs' motion on the third claim for relief and denies the remainder of the motions. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/23/2017.(knb)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Order (1) Denying Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and (2) Granting In Part and Denying In Part Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/25/2017. (jjg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Kevin Brown et al v. City of San Diego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Kevin Brown
Represented By: Eugene G Iredale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Brown
Represented By: Eugene G Iredale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Oplinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?