Bilema et al v. Bostic et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Bilema, Frank Uriarte, Rudy Alarcon, Luis Casillas, Steven Garcia, German Duran, Gabriel Rodriguez, Isaias Navarro and Stephen Frazier
Defendant: Michael Bostic, Richard Warne, City of Calexico, Gonzalo C. Gerardo, Maritza Hurtado and DOES 1-10
Case Number: 3:2015cv01606
Filed: July 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER re: 94 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; 110 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay; 112 Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal; and 121 122 Plaintiffs' Motions for Taxation of Costs. The Court grants Defen dants' unopposed motion and stays the case. Doc. No. 110. The Court orders the parties to file a joint status report within three business days of the remaining administrative appeals reaching finality. In light of the stay and procedural postur e of this case, the Court denies without prejudice Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Doc. No. 94) and Plaintiffs' motion to file documents under seal (Doc. No. 112). Once the stay is lifted, Defendants may file a renewed motion for s ummary judgment and Plaintiffs' may renew their motion to file under seal. It is further ordered that the Clerk of Court administratively terminate Plaintiffs' motions for taxation of costs. Doc. Nos. 121, 122. The Court will address all motions for taxation of costs, if necessary, upon resolution of all claims in this action. Accordingly, Plaintiffs may file renewed motions for taxation of costs upon resolution of this action. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/14/2019. (rmc)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Denying 103 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration. Having reviewed moving Plaintiffs' arguments in conjunction with the record, the Court finds no basis to reconsider the decision on summary judgment. The Court is not "left wi th the definite and firm conviction that a mistake has been committed," and therefore, moving Plaintiffs have not shown clear error or manifest injustice. Accordingly, the Court denies the moving Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/13/2019. (rmc)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is against Plaintiffs Bielma, Uriarte, Garcia, Duran, and Frazier, and for Defendant Hurtado.(rmc)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Granting 77 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court finds that Defendants have shown there is no genuine dispute as to any material fact and that they are entitled to judgment as a matter of law on Plaintiffs Uriarte&# 039;s, Garcia's, Duran's, and Frazier's claims because they are barred by res judicata. Accordingly, the Court grants Defendants' motion. The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate this action as to Plaintiffs Frank Uriarte, Steven Garcia, German Duran, and Stephen Frazier. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 12/6/2018. (rmc)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Denying 62 Unopposed Motion to Stay. The Court denies Defendants' unopposed motion to stay proceedings pending resolution of Plaintiffs' state administrative proceedings and orders the parties to jointly contact Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis within five days to schedule a Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 12/6/2017. (rmc)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Denying Defendants' 52 Request for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 8/7/2017. (ag)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 42 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' SAC; and Granting Defendants' 43 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/25/2017. (ag)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' and Defendants Requests for Judicial Notice; Granting 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Granting 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Denying 9 Defendant s' Motion to Strike. Plaintiffs' request for leave to amend the Complaint is granted as to claims that are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs may not reallege claims that have been dismissed with prejudice, nor may they amend the Complaint to add parties or Counts without first seeking permission from the Court. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 1/4/16. (dlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bilema et al v. Bostic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bilema
Represented By: Michael Andrew McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Uriarte
Represented By: Michael Andrew McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudy Alarcon
Represented By: Michael Andrew McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Casillas
Represented By: Michael Andrew McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Garcia
Represented By: Michael Andrew McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: German Duran
Represented By: Michael Andrew McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael Andrew McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaias Navarro
Represented By: Michael Andrew McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Frazier
Represented By: Michael Andrew McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bostic
Represented By: Michael T Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Warne
Represented By: Michael T Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Calexico
Represented By: Michael T Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzalo C. Gerardo
Represented By: Michael T Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maritza Hurtado
Represented By: Michael T Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?