Kaseberg v. Conaco, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Robert Alexander Kaseberg
Defendant: Conaco, LLC, Turner Broadcasting System, Time Warner, Inc., Conan O'Brien, Jeff Ross, Mike Sweeney and DOES 1-50
Case Number: 3:2015cv01637
Filed: July 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: David H. Bartick
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER : (1) Denying Plaintiff's motion to amend Complaint, (2) Granting in part and denying in part motions in limine, and (3) Setting hearing on proposed jury instructions and verdict form. The Court sets a hearing on the Parties amended proposed jury instructions and verdict form for 5/23/2019, at 1:30pm in Courtroom 4D. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/16/2019. (jpp)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER (1) Granting 167 Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, and (2) Dismissing Defendants' Ninth and Tenth Affirmative Defenses. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/15/2018. (jpp)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER Granting 154 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/13/2018. (mpl)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER Regarding 132 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Re Modifying the Scheduling Order to Reopen Discovery and Permit the Deposition of Plaintiff's Counsel. The Court grants in part and denies in part Defendants' motion to modify the scheduling order and reopen discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 9/18/2017. (mpl)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER re 132 Joint MOTION For Determination Of Discovery Dispute Re Modifying The Scheduling Order To Reopen Discovery And Permit The Deposition Of Plaintiffs Counsel. It is ordered that no later than 8/11/2017, Defendants shall file, a propo sed amended answer based on all of the information presently in Defendants' possession. The proposed amended answer shall be filed as an exhibit to the supplemental brief discussed below. A supplemental brief to the Joint Motion, clearly defi ning the scope of any proposed discovery of Plaintiffs counsel, written and/or oral, and demonstrating how (1) no other means exist to obtain this information, (2) the information is relevant and non-privileged, and (3) the information is crucial to the preparation of the case. The brief should further explain the basis for re-deposing Plaintiff. Defendants' brief shall be no longer than five pages. No later than 8/18/2017, Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants' brief. Plaintiffs response shall be no longer than five pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 8/4/2017.(dxj)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER re 132 Joint MOTION For Determination Of Discovery Dispute Re Modifying The Scheduling Order To Reopen Discovery And Permit The Deposition Of Plaintiffs Counsel. It is ordered that a Telephonic attorneys only Discovery Conference shall be held on 7/28/2017 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 7/25/2017.(dxj)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 70 Motion for Summary Judgment. It is ordered that the Court grants Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment for failure to establish a genuine issue of material fact regardin g (1) the UAB Joke and (2) the Delta Joke. The Court denies Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment regarding (1) the Washington Monument Joke; (2) the Jenner Joke; and (3) the Tom Brady Joke. Additionally, the Court grants Defendants&# 039; Motion for Summary Adjudication that the jokes are only entitled to "thin" protection, but denies Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication as to a failure to create a genuine issue of material fact regarding willfulness. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/9/2017. (dxj) (Main Document 131 replaced on 5/12/2017) (dxj).
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER regarding 52 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Regarding Document Produtcion at the Deposition of Danielle Weisberg. The Court grants in part and denies in part Plaintiff's motion to compel. (ECF No. 52.) The Court orde rs production of all e-mail correspondence between Ms. Weisberg and Josh Comers, Brian Kiley, and Rob Kutner on the following dates: January 14, 2015, February 4, 2015, February 17, 2015, and June 9, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 9/28/2016. (kcm)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: (1) regarding 36 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute, 38 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute; and (2) granting 34 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 7/26/2016. (kcm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaseberg v. Conaco, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Alexander Kaseberg
Represented By: Jayson Michael Lorenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conaco, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turner Broadcasting System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conan O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?