Textron Financial Corporation v. Gallegos
Plaintiff: Textron Financial Corporation
Defendant: Michael S Gallegos
Case Number: 3:2015cv01678
Filed: July 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: David H. Bartick
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendation. The Court adopts Judge Averitte's Amended Report and Recommendation (Dkt. 314 }, which shall be the operative Assignment Order going forward. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/2/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 314 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Grant Plaintiff's Application to Amend the Second Amended Assignment Order, re 307 MOTION to Amend/Correct Second Amended Assignment Order dated October 4, 2017 [DKT 236] filed by Textron Fina ncial Corporation. Due to a typo in the original order, the Clerk is directed to strike this Court's 7/31/2018 Report. (See ECF No. 313.) The Court recommends plaintiff's motion to amend (ECF No. 307) be granted and the two entities be subject to the Second Amended Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clinton Averitte on 8/15/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2018: # 1 Stricken Document) (jdt).
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 313 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Grant Plaintiff's Application to Amend the Second Amended Assignement. the Court recommends plaintiff's motion to amend (ECF No. 307 ) be granted and the two entities listed in Appendix of the Second Amended Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clinton Averitte on 7/31/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER Re: Ex Parte Application for Relief (Dkt. 302 ). Since Gallegos has complied with the order, and Spe Lo's failed to file an opposition within two days (see Standing Order § 8), the portion of the order at Dkt. 300 restraining Gallegos from moving funds in the four accounts is lifted. Gallegos's motion to have his stock certificate returned is denied. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 2/2/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER Partially Adopting Report and Recommendation: Spe Lo's ex parte motion is granted in part and denied in part (Dkt. 246 ). Spe Lo's motion to amend the Assignment Order to add Tunica Hotel Investment LLC is granted (Dkt. 247 ). The M iles Grant Law Firm's motion to substitute Gallegos is granted (Dkt. 295 ). Attorney Alexander J. Kessler terminated as to pty Michael S Gallegos. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/25/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER denying 286 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/3/2018. (jdt)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER denying 282 Request for Judgment Debtor's Exam. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/19/2017. (jdt)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 225 Ex Parte Motion. A hearing on this matter will be held on 10/24/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5C before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Since this order obviates the need to seal the ex parte motion, the 241 motion to seal is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/19/2017. (lrf)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 236 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 225 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Textron Financial Corporation. Objections to R&R due by 10/18/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 10/4/2017.(lrf)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that SPE LO's request for a show-cause order be denied. Objections to R&R due by 7/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 6/30/2017.(lrf)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Joint motion must be filed on or before 5/8/2017. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/24/17.(kas)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the motion to amend the charging order 92 be denied as moot, the motion for assignment and for a turnover order 93 be GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, with the motion granted in its entirety except that the turnover order shall be limited to records dating back to April 5, 2011. Objections to R&R due by 4/21/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 4/7/17.(kas)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting restraining order. The Court restrains Gallegos from assigning, or otherwise disposing of, his rights to payment from the 122 entities SPE LO identified (Dkt. 93-1 at 1015), and from taking any action that might prevent SPE LOs collect ion efforts until the Court decides the motion for assignment. The Court warns Gallegos that if he fails to comply with this order, the Court won't hesitate to hold him in contempt of court. Cal. Civ. Proc. Code § 708.520(d). Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 12/12/16.(kas)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER denying defendant's 66 Motion for Protective Order Re: Jennifer Gaghen. The stay of Gaghen's deposition, which was entered on June 2, 2016 (ECF No. 77 ) is hereby lifted. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 8/5/16. (kas)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion to Compel Further Depositions and Request for Sanctions. The Court, in its discretion, declines to issue sanctions at this time. PPH and PPHM shall produce an appropriate witness for further depositions. The depositions shall be limited to an additional four (4) hours for each entity (for 8 hours total). Gallegos request for oral argument 72 is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 8/1/16. (kas)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying 60 Motion to Quash Subpoena. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 12/14/15. (kas)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying without prejudice Textron's 40 Motion for Order to Charge Gallegos' Membership Interest. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/7/15. (kas)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Textron Financial Corporation v. Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Textron Financial Corporation
Represented By: Denise H Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S Gallegos
Represented By: Alexander J. Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?