Arora v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ashok Arora
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc. and Midland Funding LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv01712
Filed: July 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D. Dembin
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 31 Plaintiff Arora's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Electronically File Documents. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 2/26/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (tcf)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER on Joint Motion for Determination of Dispute Presenting Plaintiff Ashok Arora's Motion to Compel Compliance with Court Order (ECF No. 28 ). Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, as presented in this Joint Motion, is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIE D IN PART. To the extent that the Court has ordered Midland to supplement is production pursuant the September 2018 Order, it must do so no later than 30 days following the entry of this Order on the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 1/31/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tcf)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Re: Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. The Court DENIES Arora's motion to compel as presented in this Joint Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 1/6/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (tcf)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Denying Motion for Remand. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 7/31/2017.(ag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arora v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashok Arora
Represented By: Cathleen M. Combs
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Represented By: James O. Latturner
Represented By: Cassandra P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?