Persian Gulf Inc. v. BP West Coast Products LLC et al
Plaintiff: Persian Gulf Inc.
Defendant: Alon USA Energy, Inc., Does 1-25, Kern Oil & Refining Co., ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company, Phillips 66, Valero Energy Corporation, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC, Equilon Enterprises LLC, ConocoPhillips, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., BP West Coast Products LLC, Valero Marketing and Supply Company and Equilon Enterprises LLC doing business as Shell Oil Products US
Case Number: 3:2015cv01749
Filed: August 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Todd W Robinson
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
2 Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 786 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. re #785 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to File Surreply (Garcia, Abiel) (fth).
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 785 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #783 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Liversidge, Samuel) (anh).
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 784 RESPONSE in Opposition re #779 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Surreply to Reply Memorandum of Defendants Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Phillips 66, Equilon Enterprises LLC (D/B/A Shell Oil Products US), and Valero Marketing and Supply Company in Support of Joint Motion REDACTED filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Liversidge, Samuel) (fth).
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 783 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Sestito, Dawn) (anh).
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 782 NOTICE of Intent To Oppose Plaintiffs Ex Parte Motion For Leave To File A Sur-Reply by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company re #779 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Surreply to Reply Memorandum of Defendants Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Phillips 66, Equilon Enterprises LLC (D/B/A Shell Oil Products US), and Valero Marketing and Supply Company in Support of Joint Motion (Sestito, Dawn)(sxa).
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 781 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #780 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Coughlin, Patrick) (anh).
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 780 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Coughlin, Patrick) (anh).
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 779 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Surreply to Reply Memorandum of Defendants Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Phillips 66, Equilon Enterprises LLC (D/B/A Shell Oil Products US), and Valero Marketing and Supply Company in Support of Joint Motion for Summary Judgment [Redacted] by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Table of Exhibit, #2 Exhibit A - Proposed Surreply and Supporting Documents [Redacted], #3 Declaration of Carmen A. Medici in Support thereof, #4 Certificate of Service)(Coughlin, Patrick)(sxa).
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 778 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/24/2021 before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cameron P. Kircher. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 10/20/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/1/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2021. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:15-cv-01749-TWR-AGS and 3:18-cv-01374-TWR-AGS.) (akr)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 777 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on September 24, 2021 by Equilon Enterprises LLC. (Roger, Kent)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 776 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on September 24, 2021 by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Bernay, Alexandra)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 775 MINUTE ENTRY and ORDER (AGS): On September 24, 2021, the Court held a motion hearing. For the reasons set out on the record, plaintiff's motion for sanctions (ECF #756 ) is denied. The parties' motions to seal (ECF #757 , #764 , #767 ) are granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 09/24/2021. (CD# 9/24/2021 AGS 3:00-4:20). (no document attached) (mxa)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 774 ORDER: (1)Continuing Hearing on Motions to Exclude and For Summary Judgment, and (2) Denying as Moot Motions to Appear Telephically. Motion Hearings reset for 2/23/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3A before Judge Todd W. Robinson. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 9/13/21. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sxa)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 773 Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic / To Permit Non-Arguing Counsel to Attend Motion Hearing by Telephone by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Wofford, Robin)(sxa).
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 772 ORDER Granting #771 Withdrawal of Michelle L. Carter as Counsel of Record for Defendant Phillips 66. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 9/7/21. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sxa)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 771 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michelle L. Carter as Counsel of Record for Defendant Phillips 66 by Phillips 66. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua D. Lichtman In Support of Motion of Michelle L. Carter to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Phillips 66, #2 [Proposed] Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Lichtman, Joshua)(sxa).
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 770 ORDER (AGS): At the request of the moving and responding parties, the upcoming hearing on plaintiffs' motion for sanctions (ECF #756 ) is reset to September 24, 2021, at 3:00 p.m. The parties may use the same Zoom link to access the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 09/02/2021. (no document attached) (mxa)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 769 ORDER (AGS): Due to the Court's schedule, the motion hearing on plaintiffs' motion for sanctions (ECF #756 ) is reset to September 10, 2021, at 4:00 p.m. The hearing will still occur by Zoom. The parties may use the link already provided. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 09/01/2021.(no document attached) (mxa)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 768 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #767 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Hartley, Jason) (anh).
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 767 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hartley, Jason) (anh).
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 766 REPLY to Response to Motion re #756 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiffs' Motion for Further Rule 37(e) Sanctions as to Defendant Equilon Enterprises LLC (dba Shell Oil Products filed by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, Persian Gulf Inc., David Rinaldi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Jason Hartley, #2 Exhibit A- Redacted [Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proof of Service)(Hartley, Jason) (zda).
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 765 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #764 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Roger, Kent)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 764 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Roger, Kent)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 763 RESPONSE in Opposition re #756 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiffs' Motion for Further Rule 37(e) Sanctions as to Defendant Equilon Enterprises LLC (dba Shell Oil Products filed by Equilon Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kent M. Roger, #2 Declaration of Minna L. Naranjo, #3 Declaration of Michael Kavalinas, #4 Declaration of Corrine Graney)(Roger, Kent)(sxa).
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 762 RESPONSE in Opposition re #756 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiffs' Motion for Further Rule 37(e) Sanctions as to Defendant Equilon Enterprises LLC (dba Shell Oil Products (Non-Shell Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Further Rule 37(e) Sanctions as to Defendant Shell) filed by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Sestito, Dawn)(sxa).
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 761 NOTICE NOTICE PURSUANT TO COURTS AUGUST 4, 2021 ORDER by Persian Gulf Inc. re #759 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra)(sxa).
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 760 NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PERSIAN GULF ECF NO. 759 AND BARTLETT ECF NO. 594 by Persian Gulf Inc. re #759 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (sxa).
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 759 ***WITHDRAWN PER #761 NOTICE pursuant to Court's Order regarding Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Joint Objections and Alon's Objections by Persian Gulf Inc. re #755 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Attachments: #1 Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) QC mail sent on 8/9/2021 re format(sxa). Modified on 8/10/2021 to withdraw document filed in error (sxa).
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 758 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #757 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hartley, Jason)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 757 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hartley, Jason)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 756 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiffs' Motion for Further Rule 37(e) Sanctions as to Defendant Equilon Enterprises LLC (dba Shell Oil Products by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, Persian Gulf Inc., David Rinaldi. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities REDACTED - ORIG FILED UNDER SEAL, #2 Declaration OF JASON HARTLEY, #3 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibits A-M - ORIG FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Proof of Service)(Hartley, Jason)Attorney Jason S Hartley added to party Joshua Ebright(pty:ip), Attorney Jason S Hartley added to party Paul Lee(pty:ip), Attorney Jason S Hartley added to party David Rinaldi(pty:ip)(sxa).
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 755 ORDER Granting #743 Ex Parte Application Seeking Court's Permission to Respond to Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to Plaintiffs' Evidence. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 8/4/21. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sxa)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 754 REDACTION to #635 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Defendant BP West Coast Products LLC's Notice of Joinder and Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment) by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert A. Sacks, #2 Exhibits to Declaration of Robert A. Sacks)(Sacks, Robert) (sxa).
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 753 REDACTION to #617 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Joint Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Paul Hanouna and Michael Williams [Public] by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Liversidge, Samuel)(sxa).
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 752 REDACTION to #629 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Joint Memorandum of Defendants Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Phillips 66, Equilon Enterprises LLC (D/B/A Shell Oil Products US), and Valero Marketing and Supply Company in Support of Joint Motion for Summary Judgment [Public and Redacted] by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Combined Exhibits to S. Liversidge Declaration [Public with Additional Redactions])(Liversidge, Samuel)(sxa).
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 751 REDACTION to #631 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Defendant ExxonMobil's Notice of Joinder and Supplemental Brief in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion) by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Sestito, Dawn)(sxa).
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 750 REDACTION to #614 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony) by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Sestito, Dawn)(sxa).
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 749 REDACTION to #621 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment by Tesoro Modified on 7/27/2021 (sxa).
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 748 REDACTION to #624 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Plaintiffs Joint Motion To Exclude The Expert Testimony And Opinion Of Andrew Lipow, Dr. Janusz A. Ordover And Dr. Richard J. Bergin [Redacted] by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1-6 [Redacted], #3 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 747 REDACTION to #628 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Joint Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony and Opinion of Dr. Janusz A. Ordover as to the Issue of Damages by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 to Aguilar Declaration)(Aguilar, George)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 746 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi re #723 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal Plaintiffs' Supplement to Joint Motion to File Documents Under Seal. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of George C. Aguilar)(Aguilar, George)(jrm).
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 745 RESPONSE in Opposition re #743 Ex Parte MOTION Seeking Court's Permission to Respond to Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to Plaintiffs' Evidence filed by Alon USA Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hittinger, Carl)(jrm).
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 744 NOTICE of Intent to Respond by Alon USA Energy, Inc. re #743 Ex Parte MOTION Seeking Court's Permission to Respond to Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to Plaintiffs' Evidence (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hittinger, Carl) (jrm).
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 743 Ex Parte MOTION Seeking Court's Permission to Respond to Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to Plaintiffs' Evidence by Persian Gulf Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in support thereof, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (jrm).
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 742 REDACTION to #699 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendants Chevron U.S.A Inc., Phillips 66, Equilon Enterprises LLC (d/b/a Shell Oil Products US), and Valero Marketing and Supply Co. by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1 - Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections (Redacted), #2 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay, #3 Exhibit 1-11 (redacted), #4 Exhibit 12-44 (redacted), #5 Exhibit 45-72 (redacted), #6 Exhibit 73-100 (redacted), #7 Exhibit 101-125 (redacted), #8 Exhibit 126-141 (redacted), #9 Exhibit 142-162 (redacted), #10 Exhibit 163-182 (redacted), #11 Exhibit 183-201 (redacted), #12 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 741 REDACTION to #707 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Supplement To Plaintiffs' Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Joint Motion For Summary Judgment Of Defendants Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Phillips 66, Equilon Enterprises LLC d/b/a Shell Oil Products US), And Valero Marketing And Supply Co. Regarding Newly Produced Shell Documents by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay, #2 Exhibit 202-209, #3 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 740 REDACTION to #708 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Plaintiffs' Reply In Support Of Their Joint Motion To Exclude The Expert Testimony And Opinion Of Andrew Lipow, Dr. Janusz A. Ordover And Dr. Richard J. Bergin by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 739 REDACTION to #689 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant Alon USA Energy, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick J. Coughlin, #2 Exhibit 1-20, #3 Exhibit 21-45, #4 Exhibit 46-57, #5 Certificate of Service)(Coughlin, Patrick)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 738 REDACTION to #717 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Defendant BP West Coast Products LLC's Notice of Joinder and Supplemental Reply in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment) by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert A. Sacks, #2 Exhibits to Declaration of Robert A. Sacks)(Sacks, Robert)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 737 REDACTION to #694 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Robert McCullough by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carmen A. Medici, #2 Exhibit 1-5, #3 Certificate of Service)(Medici, Carmen)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 736 REDACTION to #721 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Defendant ExxonMobil's Notice of Joinder and Supplemental Reply in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment) by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Sestito, Dawn)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 735 REDACTION to #716 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Robert McCullough) by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Sestito, Dawn)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 734 REDACTION to #719 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document re Reply Memorandum of Defendants Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Phillips 66, Equilon Enterprises LLC (D/B/A Shell Oil Products US), and Valero Marketing and Supply Company in Support of Joint Motion for Summary Judgment by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of Samuel Liversidge, #2 Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Objections and Objections to Plaintiffs' Evidence)(Liversidge, Samuel)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 733 REDACTION to #714 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document re Joint Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Paul Hanouna and Michael Williams by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Liversidge, Samuel)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 732 REDACTION to #692 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document re Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony and Opinion of Dr. Janusz Ordover as to the Issue of Damages by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Liversidge, Samuel)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 731 REDACTION to #690 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Defendants' Joint Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Andrew Lipow, Dr. Janusz A. Ordover and Dr. Richard J. Bergin by Phillips 66. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua Lichtman in Support)(Lichtman, Joshua)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 730 REDACTION to #709 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony and Opinion of Dr. Janusz A. Ordover as to the Issue of Damages by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George C. Aguilar, #2 Exhibits 5-7)(Aguilar, George)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 729 RESPONSE re #707 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Plaintiffs' Supplement To Its Opposition To Defendants' Joint Motion For Summary Judgment) filed by Equilon Enterprises LLC. (Roger, Kent)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 728 REDACTION to #698 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Paul Hanouna and Michael Williams by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George C. Aguilar, #2 Exhibit 1)(Aguilar, George)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 727 REDACTION to #697 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Tesoro's Motion for Summary Judgment by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Nicoud, #2 Exhibits 1-7)(Nicoud, Michael)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 726 REDACTION to #696 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant ExxonMobil's Supplemental Brief in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Nicoud, #2 Exhibits 1-9)(Nicoud, Michael)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 725 REDACTION to #695 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant BP's Supplemental Memorandum In Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Nicoud, #2 Exhibits 1-5)(Nicoud, Michael)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 724 REDACTION to #712 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Danielle R. Leneck (Redacted))(Kiernan, David)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 723 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Sestito, Dawn)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 722 Joint Statement of Undisputed Material Facts by Phillips 66, re #625 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Phillips 66, Equilon Enterprises LLC (d/b/a Shell Oil Products US), and Valero Marketing and Supply Company, #630 Notice of Joinder, #620 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal, #615 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #634 Notice of Joinder, Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts re: Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment. (Lichtman, Joshua)(jrm).
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 721 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #705 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Sestito, Dawn) (anh).
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 720 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. re #719 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document re Reply Memorandum of Defendants Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Phillips 66, Equilon Enterprises LLC (D/B/A Shell Oil Products US), and Valero Marketing and Supply Company in Support of Joint Motion for Summary Judgment (Whittaker, Stephen)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 719 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #705 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Liversidge, Samuel) (anh).
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 718 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BP West Coast Products LLC re #717 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Sacks, Robert)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 717 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #705 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Sacks, Robert) (anh).
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 716 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #705 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Sestito, Dawn) (anh).
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 715 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. re #714 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document re Joint Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Paul Hanouna and Michael Williams (Whittaker, Stephen) (anh).
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 714 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #705 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Liversidge, Samuel) (anh).
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 713 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC re #712 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Kiernan, David)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 712 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #705 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Kiernan, David) (anh).
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 711 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Persian Gulf Inc. re #708 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document re. Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Joint Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony and Opinion of Andrew Lipow, Dr. Janusz A. Ordover and Dr. Richard J. Bergin, Bernay Declaration and Exhibit 7 (Bernay, Alexandra)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 710 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Persian Gulf Inc. re #707 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Supplement to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendants Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Phillips 66, Equilon Enterprises LLC (D/B/a Shell Oil Products US), and Valero Marketing and Supply Co. Regarding Newly Produced Shell Documents; Bernay Declaration and Exhibits 202-209 (Bernay, Alexandra)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 709 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #705 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Aguilar, George) (anh).
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 708 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #705 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (anh).
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 707 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #705 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (anh).
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 706 REPLY to Response to Motion re #615 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Alon USA Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Evidentiary Objection Chart, #2 Exhibit 1-10)(Hittinger, Carl)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 705 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Sestito, Dawn) QC mail sent on 7/2/2021 re sealed lodged(sxa).
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 704 ORDER Granting #702 Joint Motion and Stipulation Seeking Court's Permission To Supplement Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Opposition. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 6/30/21. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sxa)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 703 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #688 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Bernay, Alexandra)(sxa).
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 702 Joint MOTION for Leave to File regarding Supplement to Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Opposition in Light of Newly-Produced Evidence by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Table of Exhibit, #2 Exhibit A [Placeholder], #3 Proof of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra)(sxa).
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 701 ORDER Granting #700 Joint Motion and Stipulation Seeking The Courts Permission Regarding Deadline For Filing of Joint Statement if Undisputed Facts and Rescheduling Currently Scheduled Summary Judgment Hearing Date. Motion Hearings reset for 9/29/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3A before Judge Todd W. Robinson. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 6/24/21. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sxa) (dlg).
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 700 Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline for Filing of Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts and Rescheduling Currently Scheduled Summary Judgment Hearing Date by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 699 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #688 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (anh).
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 698 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #688 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Aguilar, George) (anh).
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 697 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #688 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Nicoud, Michael) (anh).
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 696 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #688 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Nicoud, Michael) (anh).
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 695 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #688 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Nicoud, Michael) (anh).
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 694 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #688 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Medici, Carmen) (anh).
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 693 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. re #692 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document re Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony and Opinion of Dr. Janusz Ordover as to the Issue of Damages (Whittaker, Stephen) (anh).
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 692 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #688 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Liversidge, Samuel) (anh).
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 691 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Phillips 66 re #690 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Lichtman, Joshua) (anh).
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 690 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #688 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Lichtman, Joshua) (anh).
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 689 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #688 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Coughlin, Patrick) (anh).
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 688 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Sestito, Dawn) (anh).
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 686 ORDER Granting #681 #682 In Part Ex Parte Application Regarding Presentation of Evidentiary Matters Related to Summary Judgment and Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 5/25/21. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sxa) (dlg).
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 685 RESPONSE in Opposition re #681 Ex Parte MOTION Seeking Court's Permission Regarding Presentation of Evidentiary Matters Related to Summary Judgment [Redacted] filed by Valero Marketing and Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gerald E. Hawxhurst in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application, #2 Exhibit Table Re Declaration of Gerald E. Hawxhurst in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application)(Hawxhurst, Gerald)(sxa).
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 684 NOTICE OF INTENT TO OPPOSE by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company re #681 Ex Parte MOTION Seeking Court's Permission Regarding Presentation of Evidentiary Matters Related to Summary Judgment [Redacted] (Wofford, Robin) (jpp).
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 683 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #682 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (anh).
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 682 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (anh).
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 681 Ex Parte MOTION Seeking Court's Permission Regarding Presentation of Evidentiary Matters Related to Summary Judgment [Redacted] by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in support thereof [Redacted], #2 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (mme).
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 680 ORDER Granting #679 Joint Motion and Stipulation Tolling Deadline to Object Ruling on Defendant's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 5/11/21. (sxa)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 679 Joint MOTION to Continue / Tolling Deadline to Object to Ruling on Defendants' Motions to Strike Expert Testimony on the Ground of Improper Rebuttal by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Wofford, Robin)(sxa).
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 678 ORDER Granting #677 For Withdrawal of Carissa J. Dolan as Attorney of Record. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 5/5/21. (sxa)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 677 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney [Notice of Motion and Motion for Withdrawal of Carissa J. Dolan as Attorney of Record] by Persian Gulf Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra)(sxa).
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 676 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/26/2021 before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ellen L. Simone. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 5/24/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2021. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:15-cv-01749-TWR-AGS and 3:18-cv-01374-TWR-AGS.) (akr)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 675 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on April 26, 2021 by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Bernay, Alexandra)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 674 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on 04/26/2021 by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Garcia, Abiel)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 673 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on 04/26/2021 by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Mittelstaedt, Robert)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 663 MINUTE ENTRY and ORDER (AGS): On April 26, 2021, the Court held a motion hearing. For the reasons set out on the record, the motions to compel and strike (ECF #600 , #603 , & #606 ) are DENIED. The parties motions to seal (ECF #601 , #604 , #607 , #641 , #644 , #647 , #653 , #656 , & #659 ) are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 04/26/2021. (CD# 4/26/2021 AGS 3:00-5:10). (no document attached) (mxa)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 662 ORDER Granting #650 Motion For Withdrawal of Armen Zohrabian as Attorney of Record. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 4/23/21. (sxa)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 661 ORDER Granting #651 Joint Motion and Stipulation Clarifying Status of Previously Filed Motions to Seal. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 4/19/21. (sxa)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 660 **Docketed under seal at doc. no. 672 per Minute Entry 663 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #659 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Kiernan, David) (anh). Modified on 4/27/2021 (anh).
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 659 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Kiernan, David) (anh).
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 658 REPLY to Response to Motion re #606 Joint MOTION to Strike Defendants' Joint Motion to Strike or Exclude Improper Rebuttal Expert Opinion Testimony of Michael Williams and Paul Hanouna, or in the Alternative, for Leave to Submit Defense Expert Surreplies Reply Memorandum (Redacted) filed by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Kiernan, David)(sxa).
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 657 **Docketed under seal at doc. no. 671 per Minute Entry 663 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #656 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (anh). Modified on 4/27/2021 (anh).
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 656 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (anh).
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 655 REPLY to Response to Motion re #603 Joint MOTION to Strike Defendants' Joint Motion to Strike or Exclude Improper Rebuttal Expert Testimony of Robert McCullough, or in the Alternative, for Leave to Submit Defense Expert Surreplies Reply Memorandum (Redacted) filed by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Danielle Leneck (Redacted))(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (sxa).
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 654 **Docketed under seal at doc. no. 670 per Minute Entry 663 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #653 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (anh). Modified on 4/27/2021 (anh).
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 653 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (anh).
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 652 REPLY to Response to Motion re #600 Joint MOTION to Compel Defendants' Joint Motion for Additional Time to Depose Robert McCullough and to Compel Further Deposition Testimony Reply Memorandum (Redacted) filed by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Danielle Leneck (Redacted))(Mittelstaedt, Robert)(sxa).
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 651 Joint MOTION to Clarify Status of Previously Filed Motions to Seal by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Wofford, Robin) (sxa).
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 650 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney [Notice of Motion and Motion for Withdrawal of Armen Zohrabian as Attorney of Record] by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (sxa).
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 649 NOTICE Jt. Notice of the Parties' Agreement re Payment of Sanctions to Plaintiffs' Counsel by Persian Gulf Inc. re 591 Motion Hearing,,,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,,,, Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hartley, Jason)(sxa).
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 648 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #647 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (anh).
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 647 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (anh).
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 646 RESPONSE in Opposition re #603 Joint MOTION to Strike Defendants' Joint Motion to Strike or Exclude Improper Rebuttal Expert Testimony of Robert McCullough, or in the Alternative, for Leave to Submit Defense Expert Surreplies [Redacted] filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1-2 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (jmr).
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 645 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #644 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (anh).
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 644 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (anh).
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 643 RESPONSE in Opposition re #600 Joint MOTION to Compel Defendants' Joint Motion for Additional Time to Depose Robert McCullough and to Compel Further Deposition Testimony [Redacted] filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1-5 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (jmr).
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 642 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #641 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Aguilar, George) (anh).
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 641 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Aguilar, George) (anh).
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 640 RESPONSE in Opposition re #606 Joint MOTION to Strike Defendants' Joint Motion to Strike or Exclude Improper Rebuttal Expert Opinion Testimony of Michael Williams and Paul Hanouna, or in the Alternative, for Leave to Submit Defense Expert Surreplies [REDACTED] filed by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George C. Aguilar, #2 Exhibits 1-2 [REDACTED])(Aguilar, George)(jmr).
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 639 ORDER Vacating Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Dates. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 4/5/21.(sxa)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 638 ORDER Granting #611 Joint Motion and Stipulation to Amend Sealing Procedures. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 4/2/21. (sxa)
April 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 636 NOTICE of Joinder by Alon USA Energy, Inc. re #625 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Phillips 66, Equilon Enterprises LLC (d/b/a Shell Oil Products US), and Valero Marketing and Supply Company (Hittinger, Carl) (sxa).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 637 ORDER Granting Joint Motion and Stipulation to Amend Sealing Procedures [No. #611 ]. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 4/2/2021. (anh)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 635 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #612 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Sacks, Robert) (anh).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 634 NOTICE of Joinder by BP West Coast Products LLC re #625 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Phillips 66, Equilon Enterprises LLC (d/b/a Shell Oil Products US), and Valero Marketing and Supply Company (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert A. Sacks In Support of Notice of Joinder, #2 Exhibit s to Declaration of Robert A. Sacks In Support of Notice of Joinder)(Sacks, Robert) (sxa).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 633 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. re #612 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal Re Joint Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Phillips 66, Equilon Enterprises LLC (d/b/a Shell Oil Products US), and Valero Marketing and Supply Company (Whittaker, Stephen)(sxa).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 632 NOTICE of Joinder by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC re #625 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Phillips 66, Equilon Enterprises LLC (d/b/a Shell Oil Products US), and Valero Marketing and Supply Company (Kiernan, David) (sxa).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 631 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #612 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Sestito, Dawn) (anh).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 630 NOTICE of Joinder by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company re #625 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Phillips 66, Equilon Enterprises LLC (d/b/a Shell Oil Products US), and Valero Marketing and Supply Company (Sestito, Dawn)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 629 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #612 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Liversidge, Samuel) (anh).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 628 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #627 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Aguilar, George) (anh).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 627 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Aguilar, George) (anh).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 626 Joint MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony and Opinion of Dr. Janusz A. Ordover as to the Issue of Damages by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities [Redacted], #2 Declaration of George C. Aguilar, #3 Exhibits 1-4 [Redacted])(Aguilar, George) (sxa).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 625 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Phillips 66, Equilon Enterprises LLC (d/b/a Shell Oil Products US), and Valero Marketing and Supply Company by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities (redacted), #2 Declaration of Samuel Liversidge, #3 Combined Public Exhibits to S. Liversidge Declaration, #4 Joint Appendix (redacted))(Liversidge, Samuel) (sxa).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 624 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #623 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (anh).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 623 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (anh).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 622 Joint MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony and Opinion of Andrew Lipow, Dr. Janusz A. Ordover and Dr. Richard J. Bergin by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities [Redacted], #2 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support thereof, #3 Exhibit 1-6 to Bernay Declaration [Redacted], #4 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (sxa).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 621 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #620 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Kiernan, David) (anh).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 620 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Kiernan, David) (anh).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 619 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities (Redacted), #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix Part 1 (Redacted), #4 Appendix Part 2, #5 Appendix Part 3, #6 Appendix Part 4, #7 Appendix Part 5 (Redacted))(Kiernan, David) (sxa).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 618 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. re #612 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal re Joint Motion to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Paul Hanouna and Michael Williams (Whittaker, Stephen)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 617 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #612 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Liversidge, Samuel) (anh).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 616 Joint MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Paul Hanouna and Michael Williams by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities (redacted), #2 Declaration of Janusz A. Ordover and Ex. A (sealed))(Liversidge, Samuel)(sxa).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 615 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Alon USA Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1 - 5)(Hittinger, Carl) (sxa).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 614 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #612 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Sestito, Dawn) (anh).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 613 Joint MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Robert McCullough by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities (Publicly Redacted))(Sestito, Dawn) (sxa).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 612 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Sestito, Dawn) (anh).
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 611 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #589 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1),, Re Sealing Procedures by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Wofford, Robin) (sxa).
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion to extend the Rule 69 objection date (ECF #609 ) is granted. Shell shall file any Objection to the Order and/or the Court's adjudication of attorneys' fees, within 14 days of the earlier of (a) the parties informing the Court that they have agreed on the amount of attorneys' fees or (b) the Court's adjudication of attorneys' fees after motion as set forth in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 3/29/2021. (no document attached) (say)(Modified on 3/29/2021 to update docket text.)(jrd)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 609 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 72 Objection to Discovery Order by Equilon Enterprises LLC. (Roger, Kent) (sxa).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 608 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #607 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Kiernan, David) (sxa).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 607 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Kiernan, David) (sxa).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 606 Joint MOTION to Strike Defendants' Joint Motion to Strike or Exclude Improper Rebuttal Expert Opinion Testimony of Michael Williams and Paul Hanouna, or in the Alternative, for Leave to Submit Defense Expert Surreplies by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities (Redacted), #2 Declaration of David Kiernan, #3 Exhibit A-E to Kiernan Decl. (Redacted), #4 Exhibit F-J to Kiernan Decl. (Redacted))(Kiernan, David) (sxa).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 605 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #604 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (sxa).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 604 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (sxa).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 603 Joint MOTION to Strike Defendants' Joint Motion to Strike or Exclude Improper Rebuttal Expert Testimony of Robert McCullough, or in the Alternative, for Leave to Submit Defense Expert Surreplies by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities (Redacted), #2 Declaration of Robert Mittelstaedt, #3 Exhibit A-G to Mittelstaedt Declaration (Redacted))(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (sxa).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 602 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #601 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (sxa).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 601 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (sxa).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 600 Joint MOTION to Compel Defendants' Joint Motion for Additional Time to Depose Robert McCullough and to Compel Further Deposition Testimony by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities (REDACTED), #2 Declaration of Robert Mittelstaedt, #3 Exhibit A-C (REDACTED))(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (sxa).
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 599 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Motion Hearing) held on 3/16/2021 before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cameron P. Kircher. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/8/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2021. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:15-cv-01749-TWR-AGS and 3:18-cv-01374-TWR-AGS.) (akr)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 598 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on March 16, 2021 by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Bernay, Alexandra)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 597 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on 3/16/2021 by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Garcia, Abiel)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 596 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on 3/16/2021 by Alon USA Energy, Inc.. (Hittinger, Carl)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 591 MINUTE ENTRY and ORDER (AGS): On March 16, 2021, the Court held a motion hearing. For the reasons set out on the record, plaintiff's motion for sanctions (ECF #566 ) is granted in part and denied in part, and both parties' motions to seal (ECF #568 , #583 & #586 ) are granted. Defendant Equilon must pay 2/3 of plaintiff's reasonable attorneys' fees arising from the cellphone spoliation. Additionally, Equilon may not use any traders' text messages in its defense. The parties must meet and confer on the appropriate amount of the sanction. By April 16, 2021, the parties must file any motion to adjudicate any dispute as to the attorneys' fees or the sanction amount. This deadline modifies and supersedes the deadline announced at the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 03/16/2021. (CD# 3/16/2021 AGS 3/16/2021 4:00-5:15). (no document attached) (mxa)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 590 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on 03/16/2021 by Equilon Enterprises LLC. (Roger, Kent)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 589 ORDER Granting #588 Joint Motion and Stipulation Re Protocols for Motions For Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions. The Court Set a hearing on the motions for summary judgment and Daubert motions for 7/28/2021 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 3A. As stipulated among the Parties, the motions Shall be Briefed on the following schedule: Opening briefs Shall Be Filed 4/2/2021.Opposition briefs Shall be Filed by 5/28/2021, and Reply briefs Shall be Filed by 7/2/2021. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 3/16/21. (sxa)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 588 Joint MOTION Re Protocols for Motions for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Wofford, Robin) (sxa).
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 587 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #586 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Hartley, Jason) (anh).
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 586 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hartley, Jason) (anh).
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 585 REPLY to Response to Motion re #566 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff Persian Gulf Inc.'s Motion for Rule 37e Sanctions as to Defendant Equilon Enterprises LLC filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Jason Hartley, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B [filed under seal], #4 Proof of Service)(Hartley, Jason) (sxa).
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 584 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #583 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Roger, Kent) (anh).
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 583 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Roger, Kent) (anh).
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 582 RESPONSE in Opposition re #566 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff Persian Gulf Inc.'s Motion for Rule 37e Sanctions as to Defendant Equilon Enterprises LLC filed by Equilon Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kent M. Roger, #2 Declaration of Sandra B. Gallini, #3 Declaration of Corrine Graney, #4 Declaration of Jeff Marino, #5 Declaration of Michael Kavalinas, #6 Declaration of Frank Contreras, #7 Declaration of Clyde Williams)(Roger, Kent) (sxa).
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 581 RESPONSE in Opposition re #566 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff Persian Gulf Inc.'s Motion for Rule 37e Sanctions as to Defendant Equilon Enterprises LLC filed by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Sestito, Dawn) (sxa).
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER Granting #579 Joint Motion and Stipulation to Extend Certain Case Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 2/22/21. (sxa)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 579 Joint MOTION to Continue /Extend Certain Case Deadlines by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Wofford, Robin) (sxa).
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER Granting #577 Joint Motion and Stipulation to Correct Scheduling Order Re Description of Expert Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 2/18/21. (sxa)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 577 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 562 Order on Motion for Discovery, #463 Order on Motion to Continue by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Wofford, Robin) (sxa).
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion to continue (ECF #575 ) is granted. The March 5, 2021 Mandatory Settlement Conference is vacated, along with the related briefing schedule. Within three days of the adjudication of the forthcoming dispositive motions, the parties must jointly contact Judge Schopler's chambers to propose a new MSC schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 02/12/2021. (no document attached) (mxa)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 575 Joint MOTION to Continue the Mandatory Settlement Conference and Related Briefing Deadline by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Wofford, Robin) (sxa).
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion to extend (ECF #573 ) is granted. The hearing date on the pending motion for sanctions is reset to March 16, 2021, at 4:00 p.m. Shell's response is now due March 2, 2021; plaintiffs' reply March 9, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 02/10/2021. (no document attached) (mxa)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 573 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefing for Rule 37(e) Sanctions Motion by Equilon Enterprises LLC. (Roger, Kent) (sxa).
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 572 REDACTION to #566 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff Persian Gulf Inc.'s Motion for Rule 37e Sanctions as to Defendant Equilon Enterprises LLC Redacted Declaration of Jason Hartley in Support of Plaintiff Persian Gulf Inc.'s Motion for Rule 37e Sanctions as to Defendant Equilon Enterprises LLC by Persian Gulf Inc. (Hartley, Jason) (sxa).
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 571 REDACTION to #566 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff Persian Gulf Inc.'s Motion for Rule 37e Sanctions as to Defendant Equilon Enterprises LLC Redacted Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff Persian Gulf Inc.'s Motion for Rule 37e Sanctions as to Defendant Equilon Enterprises LLC by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Hartley, Jason) (sxa).
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 570 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #568 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hartley, Jason) (anh).
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 569 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #568 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Hartley, Jason) (anh).
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 568 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hartley, Jason) (anh).
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 567 NOTICE of Withdrawal of ECF Nos. 566-1, 566-2, 566-4, 566-5, 566-6, 566-7, 566-9, 566-13 and 566-14 by Persian Gulf Inc. re #566 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff Persian Gulf Inc.'s Motion for Rule 37e Sanctions as to Defendant Equilon Enterprises LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hartley, Jason) QC mail sent on 1/20/2021 re incorrect withdrawal (sxa).
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 566 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff Persian Gulf Inc.'s Motion for Rule 37e Sanctions as to Defendant Equilon Enterprises LLC by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Jason Hartley, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Proof of Service)(Hartley, Jason) (sxa).
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ORDER granting #564 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael P. Murtagh terminated. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 1/8/2021. (jmr) (jms).
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 564 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Michael P. Murtagh) by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert A. Sacks)(Sacks, Robert) (jmr).
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER (AGS): Defendant's motion for sanctions (ECF #502 ) is granted in part. The diesel portion of Dr. Hanouna's report is stricken. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 12/17/2020.(mxa)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion to modify the scheduling order (ECF #560 ) is granted. Expert discovery dates are extended one week as set out in the parties' joint motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 12/02/2020. (no document attached) (mxa)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 561 ORDER (AGS): Plaintiffs' unopposed motion to modify (ECF #556 ) is granted. Plaintiffs may serve one additional Rule 45 subpoena as outlined in their motion. The December 2, 2020 hearing on the matter is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 12/02/2020. (no document attached) (mxa)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 560 Joint MOTION for Discovery Extension re Expert Discovery Deadlines by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Wofford, Robin) (jmr).
November 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER (AGS): Plaintiffs' motion to shorten time (ECF #557 ) is granted. By November 30, 2020, defendants must file any response to plaintiffs' motion to amend the scheduling order. On December 2, 2020, at 2:00 p.m., the Court will hold a Zoom-based motion hearing to discuss the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 11/27/2020. (no document attached) (mxa)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER (AGS): Plaintiffs' ex parte motion to shorten time (ECF #557 ) is taken under advisement. By November 25, 2020, any interested defendant may file a response. Given the potential scheduling issues caused by such short notice, the Court will inform the parties it is currently tentatively inclined to grant the motion, require any response to the motion to amend the scheduling order by November 30, 2020, and hold a Zoom-based hearing December 2, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 11/24/2020.(no document attached) (mxa)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 557 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Motion to Modify the Court's October 14, 2020 Order Regarding Spoliation [ECF No. 556] by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in support thereof, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (jmr).
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 556 MOTION to Modify the Court's October 14, 2020 Order Regarding Spoliation re 524 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1),,,, Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal,,,, Motion Hearing,,, by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in support thereof, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (jmr).
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ORDER Denying as Moot Renewed Motions to File Documents Under Seal (ECF No. #548 , #553 ). Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 11/16/2020. (anh)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 554 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #553 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 553 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 552 REDACTION to #481 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, [Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion Pursuant to Rule 72(a) Objecting to July 17, 2020 Order on Plaintiffs' Motion Regarding Defendant Phillips 66's Claw Back Document [ECF No. 458] [Updated Redacted Version pursuant to No. 3:18-cv-01374 ECF No. 392]] by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (jmr).
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 551 REDACTION to #460 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, [Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion Pursuant to Rule 72(a) Objecting to July 17, 2020 Order on Plaintiffs' Motion Regarding Defendant Phillips 66's Claw Back Document [ECF No. 458] [Updated Redacted Version pursuant to No. 3:18-cv-01374 ECF No. 392]] by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (jmr).
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 550 DECLARATION of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion Pursuant to Rule 72(a) Objecting to July 17, 2020 Order on Plaintiffs' Motion Regarding Defendant Phillips 66's Claw Back Document [ECF No. 458] by Plaintiff Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [filed publicly pursuant No. 3:18-cv-01374 ECF No. 392], #2 Exhibit B [filed publicly pursuant No. 3:18-cv-01374 ECF No. 392], #3 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (jmr).
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 549 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #548 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Lichtman, Joshua) (anh).
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 548 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Lichtman, Joshua) (anh).
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER (AGS): Defendants' request for additional time to depose plaintiffs' expert, Robert McCullough, (ECF #545 ) is granted. Defendants may depose Mr. McCullough for no more than 14 hours. Given the complexity of this case and the length and importance of Mr. McCullough's report, defendants have shown good cause to modify the presumptive 7-hour time limit for this deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 11/02/2020. (no document attached) (mxa)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER granting #544 Joint Motion and Stipulation to Extend the Rule 72(a) Deadline to File Written Objections. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 11/2/2020. (jmr) (jms).
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 545 Joint MOTION and stipulation for the Court's consideration of Defendants' request for an additional seven hours to depose Plaintiffs' expert Robert McCullough by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (jmr).
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 544 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File / Joint Motion and Stipulation to Extend the Rule 72(a) Deadline to File Written Objections by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Sestito, Dawn) (dlg).
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion for an extension of time (ECF No. #541 ) is granted. Without prejudice to Shell raising the timeliness of any deadlines already passed, plaintiffs must file any motion arising from the identified discovery by November 24, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 10/26/2020. (no document attached) (mxa)
October 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 541 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion To Extend Disputed Deadline For Motion To Compel Further Production By Shell In Response To Plaintiffs Requests For Production by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hartley, Jason) QC Mailer, incorrect Judge in caption(jmr).
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 540 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/16/2020 before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ellen L. Simone. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 11/10/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2021. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:15-cv-01749-TWR-AGS and 3:18-cv-01374-TWR-AGS.) (akr)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 539 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/14/2020 before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ellen L. Simone. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 11/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2021. (akr)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 536 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on October 16, 2020 by Alon USA Energy, Inc.. (Hittinger, Carl) (jmr).
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 533 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on 10/16/2020 by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Kim, Hubert) (jmr).
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 532 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on 10/16/2020 by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Garcia, Abiel) (jmr).
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 531 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on October 16, 2020 by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Bernay, Alexandra) (jmr).
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 534 MINUTE ENTRY and ORDER (AGS): On October 16, 2020, the Court held a motion hearing. Defendants' motion for sanctions (ECF #502 ) is denied in part and deferred in part, as set out on the record. On October 23, 2020, at 3:00 p.m., the Court will hold a follow-up Zoom-based motion hearing to rule on the deferred issues. The related motions to seal (ECF #503 , #512 , & #521 ) are granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 10/16/2020.(CD# 10/16/2020 AGS 4:00-5:15). (no document attached) (mxa)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 530 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on 10/14/2020 by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Garcia, Abiel) (jmr).
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 529 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on October 14, 2020 by Alon USA Energy, Inc.. (Hittinger, Carl)(jmr).
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 528 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on October 14, 2020 by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Bernay, Alexandra) (dlg).
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion for an extension of time (ECF No. #526 ) is granted. Without prejudice to Valero raising the timeliness of any deadlines already passed, plaintiffs must file any motion arising from the identified discovery by November 13, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 10/15/2020. (no document attached) (mxa)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 526 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel Further Production by Valero by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi. (Aguilar, George)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 524 MINUTE ENTRY and ORDER (AGS): On October 14, 2020, the Court held a continued motion hearing. Plaintiff's motion (ECF #376 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Defendant Chevron must bear the costs for other defendants to search their ESI for any instant message chats from Chevron's employee Plumier to their employees. The results of that search must be provided to plaintiff by November 14, 2020. Plaintiff must also issue any Rule 45 subpoenas on the relevant brokerage firms seeking any Plumier instant message by December 4, 2020. To the extent the motion seeks any other relief, it is denied. Chevron's motion to seal (ECC #517 ) is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 10/14/2020. (CD# 10/14/2020 AGS 10:00-11:12). (no document attached) (mxa)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 523 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company re #510 Notice (Other) filed by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company . (Sestito, Dawn) (sxa).
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 522 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #521 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Sestito, Dawn) (anh).
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 521 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Sestito, Dawn) (anh).
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 520 REPLY to Response to Motion re #502 Joint MOTION to Strike or Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony filed by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dawn Sestito, #2 Exhibits 14-20)(Sestito, Dawn) (sxa).
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 519 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. re #518 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Srinivasan, Jagannathan)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 518 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #517 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (anh).
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 517 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (anh).
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 516 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendant Chevron U.S.A. Inc. re #508 MOTION Supplemental Brief in Opposition To Plaintiff Persian Gulf Inc.'s Motion Seeking Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Abiel Garcia, #2 Exhibit 1-5 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 6)(Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (dlg).
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Judge Dana M. Sabraw is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Todd W. Robinson for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 15cv1749-TWR-AGS. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/6/20.(dlg)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 514 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Persian Gulf Inc. re #511 Response in Opposition to Motion,, (Bernay, Alexandra)0 (mme).
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 513 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #512 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (anh).
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 512 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (anh).
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 511 RESPONSE in Opposition re #502 Joint MOTION to Strike or Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 [redacted], #4 Exhibit 3 [redacted], #5 Exhibit 4-6 [filed under seal], #6 Exhibit 7 [redacted], #7 Exhibit 8-10 [filed under seal], #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit 13-15 [filed under seal], #11 Exhibit 16, #12 Exhibit 17, #13 Exhibit 18, #14 Exhibit 19, #15 Exhibit 20, #16 Exhibit 21, #17 Exhibit 22-27 [filed under seal], #18 Memo of Points and Authorities 28, #19 Exhibit 39-34)(Bernay, Alexandra) (mme).
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 510 NOTICE of Errata by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company re #504 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, #502 Joint MOTION to Strike or Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony (Sestito, Dawn)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 509 NOTICE of Joinder by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi re #508 Supplemental Briefing,, (Aguilar, George) (mme).
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 508 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Plaintiff Persian Gulf Inc. re 487 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1),,,,, Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal,,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,,, Set Hearings,,,, [Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff Persian Gulf Inc.'s Motion Seeking Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law as to Defendant Chevron U.S.A. Inc.]. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) Modified on 10/1/2020 to change event type to motion (mme).
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation and Motion to Extend Certain Case Deadlines (ECF No. #501 ). Mandatory Settlement Conference reset for 3/5/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 9/24/20. (jmo)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion for an extension of time (ECF No. #505 ) is granted. Without prejudice to Shell raising the timeliness of any deadlines already passed, plaintiffs must file any motion arising from the identified discovery by October 26, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 09/23/2020. (no document attached) (mxa)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 505 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion To Extend Disputed Deadline For Motion To Compel Further Production By Shell In Response To Plaintiffs Requests For Production by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hartley, Jason) (mme).
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 504 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #503 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Sestito, Dawn) (anh).
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 503 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Sestito, Dawn) (anh).
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 502 Joint MOTION to Strike or Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Declaration of Dawn Sestito in Support, #3 Exhibits 1-13)(Sestito, Dawn)(mme).
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 501 Joint MOTION to Continue Joint Stipulation and Motion to Extend Certain Case Deadlines by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (mme).
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ORDER granting Motion to File Documents Under Seal [Doc. No. #480 ]. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/18/2020. (anh)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER granting Motion to File Documents Under Seal [Doc. no. #473 ]. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/18/2020. (anh)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Application to File Under Seal [Doc. No. #459 ]. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/18/2020. (anh)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's Objections to July 17, 2020 Order on Plaintiffs' Motion Regarding Defendant Phillips 66's Request to Claw Back Document (ECF No. #458 ). Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/18/20. (jmo)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion for an extension of time (ECF No. #492 ) is granted. Without prejudice to Tesoro raising the timeliness of any deadlines already passed, plaintiffs must file any motion arising from the identified discovery by October 15, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 09/16/2020. (no document attached) (mxa)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 492 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel Further Production by Tesoro by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi. (Aguilar, George) (mme).
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 491 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on 9/9/20 by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Kim, Hubert)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 490 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on 9/9/2020 by Alon USA Energy, Inc.. (Hittinger, Carl)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 489 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/9/2020 before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ellen L. Simone. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 10/5/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/14/2020. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:15-cv-01749-DMS-AGS and 3:18-cv-01374-DMS-AGS.) (akr)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 488 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on September 9, 2020 by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Whittaker, Stephen)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 487 MINUTE ENTRY and ORDER (AGS): On September 9, 2020, the Court held a motion hearing. For the reasons set out on the record, the Court denies Chevron's motion to compel (ECF No. #453 ). Plaintiff's motion for findings of fact (ECF No. #376 ) is granted in part and denied in part. On October 14, 2020, at 10:00 a.m., the court will hold a further Zoom hearing to discuss the matters raised on the record. The parties must file supplemental briefing, limited to ten pages, on the following three issues: (1) whether plaintiff can show "prejudice" or "deliberate intent" (or neither) for Rule 37(e) purposes; (2) if so, what spoliation sanction is appropriate under Rule 37(e); and (3) whether plaintiff waived the application of Rule 37(e) at all. Plaintiffs must file their supplemental brief by September 30, 2020. Defendant Exxon must respond by October 7, 2020. The parties' motions to seal (ECF Nos. #377 , #454 , #465 , #470 ) are granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 09/09/2020. (CD# 9/9/2020 AGS 4:00-5:30). (no document attached) (mxa)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 486 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on September 9, 2020 by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Bernay, Alexandra)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER (AGS): Defendant Tesoro's motion to seal (ECF No. #264 ), which was filed in opposition to a later withdrawn motion, is granted. Similarly, plaintiff's motion to seal (ECF No. #342 ), filed in support of a mooted motion, is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 09/10/2020. (no document attached) (mxa)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER Re: Oral Argument. The Court finds this matter suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Accordingly, the 9/11/20 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/8/20.(jmo)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 481 **Docketed under seal as doc. no. 500 per doc. no. #499 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #480 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Bernay, Alexandra) (anh). Modified on 9/18/2020 (anh).
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 480 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (anh).
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 479 REPLY to Response to Motion re #458 MOTION Pursuant to Rule 72(a) Objecting to July 17, 2020 Order on Plaintiffs' Motion Regarding Defendant Phillips 66's Request to Claw Back Document re 447 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1),,,,, Order on Motion to File Documen filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (mme).
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER Setting Video Conference. On 9/9/20 at 4:00 PM, the Court will hold a motion hearing. The Court will conduct the hearing over the Zoom teleconference program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 9/2/20.(jmo)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 477 REPLY to Response to Motion re #453 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from All Plaintiffs filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Liversidge, Samuel) (mme).
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 476 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Phillips 66 re #475 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Lichtman, Joshua) (mme).
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 475 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #473 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Lichtman, Joshua)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 474 RESPONSE in Opposition re #458 MOTION Pursuant to Rule 72(a) Objecting to July 17, 2020 Order on Plaintiffs' Motion Regarding Defendant Phillips 66's Request to Claw Back Document re 447 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1),,,,, Order on Motion to File Documen [REDACTED] filed by Phillips 66. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua D. Lichtman)(Lichtman, Joshua) (mme).
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 473 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Lichtman, Joshua)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion for an extension of time (ECF No. #468 ) is granted. Without prejudice to Valero raising the timeliness of any deadlines already passed, plaintiffs must file any motion arising from the identified discovery by October 14, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 08/27/2020. (no document attached) (mxa)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 471 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #470 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Browne, Lonnie) (sxa).
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 470 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Browne, Lonnie) (sxa).
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 469 RESPONSE in Opposition re #453 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from All Plaintiffs [REDACTED] filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lonnie A. Browne in Support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6 [Filed Under Seal], #8 Exhibit 7 [Intentionally Omitted], #9 Exhibit 8 [Filed Under Seal], #10 Exhibit 9 [Intentionally Omitted], #11 Exhibit 10-14 [Filed Under Seal], #12 Certificate of Service)(Browne, Lonnie) (mme).
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 468 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel Further Production by Valero by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi. (Aguilar, George) (mme).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 467 NOTICE of Joinder by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi re #464 Reply to Response to Motion,, (Aguilar, George) (mme).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 466 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #465 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (anh).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 465 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (anh).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 464 REPLY to Response to Motion re #376 MOTION Seeking Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law as to Defendant Chevron U.S.A. Inc. [REDACTED] filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1-2 [filed under seal], #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5-8 [filed under seal], #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12-24 [filed under seal], #10 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (mme).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Certain Case Deadlines (ECF No. #462 ). Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 1/27/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 8/18/20. (jmo)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 462 Joint MOTION to Continue / Extend Certain Case Deadlines by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Wofford, Robin) (mme).
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 461 RESPONSE in Opposition re #376 MOTION Seeking Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law as to Defendant Chevron U.S.A. Inc. filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Abiel Garcia, #2 Exhibit A to Garcia Decl, #3 Exhibit B to Garcia Decl, #4 Declaration of Scott Lane, #5 Declaration of Rick Pluimer)(Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (mme).
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 460 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #459 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (anh).
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 459 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (anh).
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 458 MOTION Pursuant to Rule 72(a) Objecting to July 17, 2020 Order on Plaintiffs' Motion Regarding Defendant Phillips 66's Request to Claw Back Document re 447 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1),,,,, Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal,,,,,,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,, by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof [Redacted], #2 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support thereof, #3 Exhibit A (filed under seal), #4 Exhibit B (filed under seal), #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D (filed under seal), #7 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (mme).
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER (AGS): Due to an unexpected change in the Court's schedule, the September 10, 2020 motion hearing on defendant's motion to compel (ECF No. #453 ) is reset to September 9, 2020, at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 07/29/2020. (no document attached) (nxk)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 456 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. re #455 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Liversidge, Samuel)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 455 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #454 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Liversidge, Samuel)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 454 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Liversidge, Samuel)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 453 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from All Plaintiffs by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Stephen C. Whittaker, #3 Index to Exhibits, #4 Exhibit A (filed under seal), #5 Exhibit B (filed under seal), #6 Exhibit C (filed under seal), #7 Exhibit D (filed under seal), #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G)(Liversidge, Samuel)Attorney Samuel Grant Liversidge added to party Chevron U.S.A. Inc.(pty:dft) (mme).
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 452 MINUTE ENTRY and ORDER (AGS): On July 23, 2020, the Court held a telephonic discovery conference. For the reasons set out on the record, plaintiffs' request to extend the expert disclosure deadline to August 7, 2020, is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 07/23/2020. (CD# 7/23/2020 AGS 4:30-4:50). (no document attached) (mxa)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 451 NOTICE [Joint Letter to Judge Schopler from the Parties regarding Expert Report Due Dates] by Persian Gulf Inc. re 450 Set Hearings,, (Bernay, Alexandra) *QC Mailer sent re improper format* (mme).
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER (AGS): At the parties' request, the Court will hold a telephonic discovery conference to discuss expert dates on July 23, 2020, at 4:00 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel is responsible for initiating the joint call with counsel for all participating parties on the line. By 9:00 a.m. on July 23, 2020, the parties must submit a joint two-page statement outlining the parties' positions on the issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 07/22/2020. (no document attached) (mxa)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 449 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/17/2020 before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ellen L. Simone. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/11/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2020. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:15-cv-01749-DMS-AGS and 3:18-cv-01374-DMS-AGS.) (akr)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 448 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on July 17, 2020 by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Bernay, Alexandra)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 447 MINUTE ENTRY and ORDER (AGS): On July 17, 2020, the Court held a telephonic motion hearing. For the reasons set out on the record, plaintiff's motion regarding claw back (ECF No. #435 ) is denied. Phillips 66 may claw back the two identified comments on PSXPGI00145902, and plaintiff must revise interrogatory responses omitting reference to those materials. Plaintiff's motion to seal (ECF No. #436 ) is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted as to Exhibits 2-6 and 8-9, but denied as to Exhibit 1. Phillips 66's motion to seal (ECF No. #438 ) is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted as to Exhibit 1, but denied as to Exhibits 3-5. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 07/17/2020. (CD# 7/17/2020 AGS 2:00-3:15). (Plaintiff Attorney Alexandra S. Bernay, Michael J. Nicoud).(Defendant Attorney Jeffry W. Duffy, Carl W. Hittinger, Rasha Gerges Shiels, Joshua D. Lichtman, Layne E. Kruse, Robbin Wofford, C. Prentice Butterworth). (no document attached) (mxa)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion to amend the scheduling order (ECF No. #441 ) is granted. The scheduling order is amended to permit the depositions of: Fred Sisneros on August 5, 2020; David Baker on August 11, 2020; Anthony Nader on August 13, 2020; and Alan Moret on August 27, 2020. All other dates and provisions of the scheduling order remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 07/15/2020. (no document attached) (mxa)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion to set a briefing schedule (ECF No. #442 ) is granted. Any opposition to plaintiffs' motion for findings of fact and conclusions of law (ECF No. #376 ) is due August 7, 2020. Any reply is due August 21, 2020. On September 9, 2020, at 4:00 p.m., the Court will hold a telephonic motion hearing on the matter. Plaintiffs' counsel is responsible for initiating the joint call to chambers with counsel for all parties that wish to participate on the line. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 07/13/2020. (no document attached) (mxa)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion for an extension of time (ECF No. #434 ) is granted. Any discovery motion arising from plaintiffs' responses to the identified ExxonMobil discovery is now due August 6, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 07/13/2020. (no document attached) (mxa)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion for an extension of time (ECF No. #433 ) is granted. Any discovery motion arising from plaintiffs' responses to the identified discovery is now due July 28, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 07/13/2020. (no document attached) (mxa)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 442 Joint MOTION Proposing Briefing Schedule with Respect to Plaintiff's Motion for Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (ECF No. 376) by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (mme).
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 441 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery as to Defendant Alon USA Energy, Inc. by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (mme).
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 440 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #439 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Lichtman, Joshua) (anh).
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 439 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Lichtman, Joshua) (anh).
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 438 RESPONSE in Opposition re #435 MOTION Regarding Defendant Phillips 66's Request to Claw Back Document filed by Phillips 66. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua Lichtman in Support, #2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Joshua Lichtman, #3 Declaration of John DeGeeter in Support)(Lichtman, Joshua) (mme).
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 437 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #436 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (anh).
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 436 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (anh).
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 435 MOTION Regarding Defendant Phillips 66's Request to Claw Back Document by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities [Redacted], #2 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support thereof [Redacted], #3 Exhibit 1-6 to Bernay Declaration [Filed Under Seal], #4 Exhibit 7 to Bernay Declaration, #5 Exhibit 8-9 to Bernay Declaration [Filed Under Seal], #6 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (mme).
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 434 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Supplemental Responses to Defendant ExxonMobil's Interrogatories, Set Two and Requests for Admission, Set One by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Wofford, Robin)(mme).
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 433 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion and Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Motions to Compel re: (1) Plaintiffs Supplemental Responses to Defendants Joint Interrogatories and Requests for Admission and (2) Plaintiffs Supplemental Responses to Chevron USA Inc.s Second and Third Sets of Interrogatories by Phillips 66. (Lichtman, Joshua) (mme).
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion for an extension (ECF No. #431 ) is granted. Any discovery motion arising from the identified privilege log is now due August 31, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 06/30/2020. (no document attached) (mxa)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 431 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel re Shell's Revised Privilege Log by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hartley, Jason) (mme).
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion for issuance of a remote deposition protocol (ECF No. #429 ) is granted. The Court issues the agreed-to protocol outlined in the parties' motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 06/15/2020. (no document attached) (mxa)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 429 Joint MOTION for Issuance of Remote Deposition Protocol by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (aef).
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion for an extension (ECF No. #427 ) is granted. Any discovery motion arising from the identified privilege log is now due July 31, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 06/10/2020. (no document attached) (mxa)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 427 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File [Joint Motion to Further Extend Deadline for Plaintiffs to File Motion to Compel Re: Shell's Revised Privilege Log] by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (aef).
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 426 RESPONSE re #414 Notice of Related Case, Interested Party Response to Notice of Related Cases filed by BB&B Business Group, Larry George Rightmyer, II. (Street, Whitney)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER (AGS): The motion for an extension (ECF No. #424 ) is granted. Any discovery motion arising from the identified privilege log is now due June 15, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 06/02/2020. (no document attached) (mxa)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 424 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File [Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Plaintiffs to File Motion to Compel re: Shell's Revised Privilege Log] by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (aef).
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 423 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/28/2020 before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cynthia R. Ott. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 6/19/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/29/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/27/2020. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:15-cv-01749-DMS-AGS and 3:18-cv-01374-DMS-AGS.) (akr)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 422 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on May 28, 2020 by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Bernay, Alexandra) (aef).
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 419 MINUTE ENTRY and ORDER (AGS): On May 28, 2020, the Court held a motion hearing. For the reasons and to the extent set out on the record, the motion for sanctions (ECF No. #406 ) is granted in part and denied in part. By June 4, 2020, plaintiff must supplement its responses. The motions to seal (ECF Nos. #407 & #412 ) are granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 05/28/2020. (CD# 5/28/2020 AGS 4:00-4:40). (no document attached) (mxa)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER Setting Video Conference. On May 28, 2020, at 4:00 p.m., the Court will hold a motion hearing. At the parties' request, the Court will conduct the hearing over the Zoom teleconference program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 5/26/2020.(aef)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 417 REPLY to Response to Motion re #406 Joint MOTION to Preclude Evidence and Payment of Fees and Costs filed by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Shields, Rasha)(aef).
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 416 RESPONSE re #414 Notice of Related Case, filed by Fricke-Parks Press, Inc., Justin Lardinois, Vincent Cendejas. (Grzenczyk, Scott) (aef).
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 415 RESPONSE re #414 Notice of Related Case, Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Related Cases by Interested Party, Pacific Wine Distributors, Inc. filed by Pacific Wine Distributors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proof of Service)(Lebsock, Christopher) (aef).
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 414 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Persian Gulf Inc. of case(s) People of the State of Cal. v. Vitol Inc., et al. (Cal. Super Ct. San Francisco Cty.); No. 3:20-CV-03131 (N.D. Cal.); No. 3:20-CV-03148 (N.D. Cal.); No. 5:20-CV-03217 (N.D. Cal.); No. 2:20-CV-4266 (C.D. Cal.); No. 4:20-CV-03238 (N.D. Cal.); No. 2:20-CV-4312 (C.D. Cal.); No. 3:20-CV-03267 (N.D. Cal.); No. 3:20-CV-00893 (S.D. Cal.) . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (aef).
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 413 **Docketed under seal as doc no 421 on 5/29/2020**SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #412 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Aguilar, George) (anh). (Main Document 413 replaced on 5/29/2020) (anh). Modified on 5/29/2020 (anh).
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 412 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Aguilar, George)(anh).
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 411 RESPONSE in Opposition re #406 Joint MOTION to Preclude Evidence and Payment of Fees and Costs filed by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George C. Aguilar, #2 Table of Exhibits to Aguilar Declaration, #3 Ex. 1 - Bernay Declaration, #4 Certificate of Service)(Aguilar, George) (aef).
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER Denying #282 Alon USA Energy, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions under Rule 11 and 28 U.S.C. 1927. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/7/2020. (aef)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 409 DECLARATION re #407 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal by Defendant Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Shields, Rasha) (aef).
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 408 **Docketed under seal as doc no 420 on 5/29/2020** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #407 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (anh). (Main Document 408 replaced on 5/29/2020) (anh). Modified on 5/29/2020 (anh).
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 407 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (anh).
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 406 Joint MOTION to Preclude Evidence and Payment of Fees and Costs by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Rasha Gerges Shields, #3 Appendix of Exhibits to Shields Declaration, #4 Exhibit A to Shields Declaration, #5 Exhibit B to Shields Declaration, #6 Exhibit C to Shields Declaration, #7 Exhibit D to Shields Declaration, #8 Exhibit E to Shields Declaration, #9 Exhibit F to Shields Declaration [Redacted], #10 Exhibit G to Shields Declaration [Redacted], #11 Exhibit H to Shields Declaration [Redacted], #12 Exhibit I to Shields Declaration [Redacted], #13 Exhibit J to Shields Declaration, #14 Exhibit K to Shields Declaration, #15 Exhibit L to Shields Declaration, #16 Declaration of Kent M. Roger, #17 Exhibit A to Roger Declaration, #18 Exhibit B to Roger Declaration, #19 Exhibit C to Roger Declaration [Redacted], #20 Exhibit D to Roger Declaration [Redacted], #21 Exhibit E to Roger Declaration, #22 Exhibit F to Roger Declaration)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (aef).
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 405 NOTICE Requesting Oral Argument in Connection with Motion for Sanctions by Alon USA Energy, Inc. (Hittinger, Carl) Modified on 4/27/2020 QC mailer sent re improper format (aef).
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 404 NOTICE of Joinder by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi re #403 Response in Opposition to Motion,, (Aguilar, George) (aef).
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 403 RESPONSE in Opposition re #397 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Alons Motion for Sanctions (Dkt. 282) [Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Alon USA Energy, Inc.'s Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Sanctions Under Rule 11 and 28 U.S.C. 1927] filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in support thereof, #2 Supplemental Declaration of Robert F. McCullough with Ex. 1 thereto, #3 Certificate of Service)(Forge, Jason) (aef).
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 402 NOTICE of Appearance of Danielle R. Leneck for Defendant Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC by Danielle Rebecca Leneck on behalf of Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC (Leneck, Danielle)Attorney Danielle Rebecca Leneck added to party Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC(pty:dft)(aef).
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER Granting #400 Second Joint Motion to Extend Certain Case Deadlines. The Mandatory Settlement Conference is set for 12/16/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Plaintiffs' Motion for Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, the briefing schedule and hearing date are hereby VACATED. The parties shall propose a new briefing schedule and hearing date within 14 days of Rick Pluimer's deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 4/13/2020. (aef)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 400 Joint MOTION [Second Joint Motion and Stipulation to Extend Certain Case Deadlines Due to Coronavirus Pandemic] re #396 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1), by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (aef).
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER Denying #353 Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company's Motion for Sanctions Under Rule 11. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/6/2020. (aef)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER Granting #397 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing. The Court hereby GRANTS Alon's motion for leave to file a supplemental brief on its pending motion for sanctions. If Plaintiffs wish to file a response to Alon's supplemental brief, they shall do so on or before April 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/3/2020. (aef)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 397 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Alons Motion for Sanctions (Dkt. 282) by Alon USA Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Supplement Brief, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3)(Hittinger, Carl) (aef).
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER Granting Joint Motion and Stipulation to Extend Certain Deadlines (ECF NO. #395 ). Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/9/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Responses due by 5/25/2020, Replies due by 6/1/2020, Jury Trial set for 5/21/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 3/26/2020. (sxa) (rmc).
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 395 Joint MOTION and Stipulation to Extend Certain Case Deadlines Due to the Coronavirus Pandemic by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (aef).
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 394 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/17/2020 before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ellen L. Simone. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/8/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2020. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:15-cv-01749-DMS-AGS and 3:18-cv-01374-DMS-AGS.) (akr)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER (AGS): Due to the national COVID-19 emergency, the Court converts the April 8, 2020 Motion Hearing to a telephonic hearing. Plaintiff is responsible for initiating a joint call to chambers with counsel for all parties on the line. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 03/18/2020.(no document attached) (mxa)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 392 MINUTE ENTRY and ORDER (AGS): On March 17, 2020, the Court held a motion hearing. As set out on the record, defendant Tesoro's motion to compel (ECF No. #363 ) is granted in part and denied in part. No sanctions were imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 03/17/2020. (CD# 3/17/2020 AGS 4:00-4:27). (Plaintiff Attorney George Aguilar, Alexandra Bernay, Lonnie Browne, Carmen Medici).(Defendant Attorney Rishi P. Satia, Kent M. Roger, Cheryl O'Connor, Dawn Sestito, Robbin Wofford, Josh D. Lichtman, DIane L. MGimsey, Gerald E. Hawhurst,). (no document attached) (yeb)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER Granting #389 Joint Motion and Stipulation to Strike Portions of the First Amended Complaint [Docket #76 ] and the Consolidated Complaint [Docket #44 ]. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/16/2020. (aef)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER (AGS): Due to the national COVID-19 emergency, the Court converts the March 17, 2020 Motion Hearing to a telephonic hearing. Plaintiff is responsible for initiating a joint call to chambers with counsel for all parties on the line. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 03/13/2020.(no document attached) (mxa)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 389 Joint MOTION to Strike Portions of First Amended Complaint re #76 Amended Complaint, by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Sestito, Dawn) (aef).
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 388 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/3/2020 before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ellen L. Simone. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/1/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/9/2020. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:15-cv-01749-DMS-AGS and 3:18-cv-01374-DMS-AGS.) (akr)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 387 REPLY to Response to Motion re #363 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Admissions filed by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cheryl L. O'Connor in Support of Reply in Support of Motion to Compel, #2 Appendix of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit P to O'Connor Reply Declaration)(O'Connor, Cheryl) (aef).
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 386 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company (McGeady, Joseph) (aef).
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER (AGS): On March 3, 2020, the Court held a motion hearing. For the reasons and to the extent set out on the record, defendant Shells motion to compel (ECF No. #352 ) is granted, and plaintiffs motion to strike (ECF No. #360 ) is denied. No sanctions were imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 03/03/2020. (CD# 3/3/2020 AGS 20:4:00-4:35; 4:41-4:46). (Plaintiff Attorney Alexandra S. Bernay; Lonnie A. Browne; Jason Linder; Jason Hartley;).(Defendant Attorney Kent Roger; Rishi P. Satia; Joseph McGeady; Gerald E. Hawxhurst; Carl W. Wittenger; Tyson Herrold; Stephen Whitaker; Joshua Lichtman; Cheyl O'Connor; Dawn Sestito; Diane Lee Gimsey; Michael Nicou). (no document attached) (yeb) Modified on 3/4/2020 (yeb).
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 384 RESPONSE in Opposition re #363 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Admissions filed by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George C. Aguilar)(Aguilar, George) (aef).
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER (AGS): Defendant Alon's Motion For Sanctions and to Preclude (ECF No. #336 ) is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 03/02/2020. (mxa) (Main Document 383 replaced on 3/9/2020) (yeb).
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 382 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Substantive Responses to (1) Defendants' Joint Requests for Admission,Sets One and three, and Joint Interrogatories, Sets One, Two and Three; and (2) Various Individual Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Admission by Phillips 66. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Declaration of Joshua D. Lichtman, #3 Exhibit 1-10 to Lichtman Declaration, #4 Exhibit 11-20 to Lichtman Declaration, #5 Exhibit 21-28 to Lichtman Declaration, #6 Exhibit 29-39 to Lichtman Declaration, #7 Exhibit 40-50 to Lichtman Declaration, #8 Exhibit 51-58 to Lichtman Declaration, #9 Declaration Robert A. Sacks, #10 Declaration Kyle Foltyn-Smith, #11 Proof of Service)(Lichtman, Joshua) (aef). Modified on 6/3/2020 (yeb).
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER Re: Oral Argument. (ECF #353 ) Defendant Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company's motion for sanctions under Rule 11 is currently scheduled for hearing on March 6, 2020. The Court finds this matter suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Accordingly, the March 6, 2020 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/2/2020.(aef)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 380 NOTICE of Joinder by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi re #376 MOTION Seeking Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law as to Defendant Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Aguilar, George) (aef).
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 379 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi re #373 Notice of Joinder filed by Paul Lee, David Rinaldi, Joshua Ebright . (Aguilar, George) (aef).
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 378 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #377 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (aef).
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 377 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (aef).
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 376 MOTION Seeking Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law as to Defendant Chevron U.S.A. Inc. by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof [REDACTED], #2 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support thereof, #3 Exhibit 1-50 [REDACTED] to Bernay Declaration, #4 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (aef). Modified on 6/3/2020 (yeb). Modified on 6/3/2020 (yeb).
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 375 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Persian Gulf Inc. re #371 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal, #370 MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra)(aef).
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 374 REPLY to Response to Motion re #353 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 filed by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Kiernan, David) (aef).
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF #379 *** - NOTICE of Joinder by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi re #370 MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Aguilar, George) (aef). Modified on 3/2/2020 to withdraw document (aef).
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 372 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #371 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (aef).
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF #375 *** - MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (aef). Modified on 3/2/2020 to withdraw document; motion termed (aef).
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF #375 *** - MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant Chevron U.S.A. Inc. by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities [Redacted], #2 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in support thereof, #3 Exhibit 1-50 [Public] to Bernay Declaration, #4 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (aef). Modified on 3/2/2020 to withdraw document; motion termed (aef).
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 369 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph L. McGeady on behalf of ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company (McGeady, Joseph)Attorney Joseph L. McGeady added to party ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company (pty:dft) (aef).
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 368 REPLY to Response to Motion re #360 Ex Parte MOTION to Strike Document #352 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Responses to Interrogatories filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Jason Hartley, #2 Proof of Service)(Hartley, Jason) (aef).
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 367 REPLY to Response to Motion re #352 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Responses to Interrogatories filed by Equilon Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kent M. Roger in Support of Defendant Equilon Enterprises LLC's Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Responses to Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit A to Roger Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Roger Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Roger Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Roger Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Roger Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Roger Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Roger Declaration, #9 Exhibit H to Roger Declaration, #10 Exhibit I to Roger Declaration, #11 Exhibit J to Roger Declaration, #12 Exhibit K to Roger Declaration, #13 Exhibit L to Roger Declaration, #14 Exhibit M to Roger Declaration)(Roger, Kent) (aef).
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 366 RESPONSE in Opposition re #353 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 365 RESPONSE in Opposition re #360 Ex Parte MOTION to Strike Document #352 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Responses to Interrogatories filed by Equilon Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kent Roger in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Strike, #2 Exhibit A to Roger Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Roger Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Roger Declaration)(Roger, Kent) (aef).
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 364 RESPONSE in Opposition re #352 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Responses to Interrogatories filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Hartley, #2 Exhibit 1 to Hartley Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Hartley Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Hartley Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Hartley Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Hartley Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Hartley Declaration, #8 Declaration of George C. Aguilar, #9 Proof of Service)(Hartley, Jason) (aef).
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 363 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Admissions by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel, #2 Declaration of Cheryl L. O'Connor in Support of Motion to Compel, #3 Appendix of Exhibits to O'Connor Declaration, #4 Exhibit A to O'Connor Declaration, #5 Exhibit B to O'Connor Declaration, #6 Exhibit C to O'Connor Declaration, #7 Exhibit D to O'Connor Declaration, #8 Exhibit E to O'Connor Declaration, #9 Exhibit F to O'Connor Declaration, #10 Exhibit G to O'Connor Declaration, #11 Exhibit H to O'Connor Declaration, #12 Exhibit I to O'Connor Declaration, #13 Exhibit J to O'Connor Declaration, #14 Exhibit K to O'Connor Declaration, #15 Exhibit L to O'Connor Declaration, #16 Exhibit M to O'Connor Declaration, #17 Exhibit N to O'Connor Declaration, #18 Exhibit O to O'Connor Declaration)(O'Connor, Cheryl) (aef).
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER (AGS): Plaintiff's ex parte motion (ECF No. #360 ) is taken under advisement. By February 19, 2020, defendants must file any response. By February 26, 2020, plaintiff must file any reply. If the Court does not issue an order beforehand on the matter, the parties should be ready to discuss this issue at the March 3, 2020 hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 02/10/2020.(no document attached) (mxa)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 361 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Persian Gulf Inc. re #360 Ex Parte MOTION to Strike Document #352 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Responses to Interrogatories [Amended Proof of Service] (Hartley, Jason) (aef).
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 360 Ex Parte MOTION to Strike Document #352 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Responses to Interrogatories by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Hartley, #2 Exhibit 1 to Hartley Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Hartley Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Hartley Declaration, #5 Declaration of George C. Aguilar, #6 Proof of Service)(Hartley, Jason) (aef).
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 359 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/4/2020 before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Juliet Y. Eichenlaub. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 2/27/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/9/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2020. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:15-cv-01749-DMS-AGS and 3:18-cv-01374-DMS-AGS.) (akr)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 358 MINUTE ENTRY (AGS): On February 4, 2020, the Court held a motion hearing on defendant Alons motion for sanctions. That motion is taken under submission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 02/04/2020. (Plaintiff Attorney Alexandra S. Bernay; Lonnie A. Browne; Jason Hartley; Jason Forgel Jason Linder; George Aguilar).(Defendant Attorney Tyson Herrold; Carl W. Hittinger;Abiel Garcia; Kathryn F. Smith; Robert Smith; Cheryl L. O'Connor; Kent Michael Roger; Robin Assaf Wofford; Layne Kruse Joshua D. Lichtman;). (no document attached) (yeb)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Alyse F. Stach, re #356 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/3/2020.(rmc)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 356 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-13423997.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Stach, Alyse) (rmc).
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 355 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian O O'Mara on behalf of Persian Gulf Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(O'Mara, Brian)Attorney Brian O O'Mara added to party Persian Gulf Inc.(pty:pla) (aef).
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 354 REPLY to Response to Motion re #336 MOTION to Preclude Evidence and Payment of Fees and Costs filed by Alon USA Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B, #2 Proof of Service)(Hittinger, Carl) (aef).
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 353 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities ISO Motion for Sanctions, #2 Declaration of Cheryl O'Connor ISO Motion for Sanctions, #3 Appendix of Exhibits to Cheryl O'Connor's Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Cheryl O'Connor ISO Motion for Sanctions, #5 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Cheryl O'Connor ISO Motion for Sanctions)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (mme).
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 352 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Responses to Interrogatories by Equilon Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in support of Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Responses to Interrogatories, #2 Declaration of Kent M. Roger in support of Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Responses to Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit A through G to Roger Declaration, #4 Exhibit H through J to Roger Declaration, #5 Exhibit K through L to Roger Declaraion, #6 Declaration of Rishi P. Satia in support of Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Responses to Interrogatories, #7 Exhibit A to Satia Declaration, #8 Exhibit B through F to Satia Declaration, #9 Exhibit G through K to Satia Declaration, #10 Exhibit L through N to Satia Declaration, #11 Exhibit O to Satia Declaration, #12 Exhibit P through S to Satia Declaration, #13 Exhibit T to Satia Declaration, #14 Exhibit U through X to Satia Declaration, #15 Exhibit Y to Satia Declaration, #16 Exhibit Z to Satia Declaration, #17 Exhibit AA through AC to Satia Declaration)(Roger, Kent) (mme).
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 351 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Dana M. Sabraw for all further proceedings. The new case number is 15cv1749 DMS (AGS).(no document attached) (jcj)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 350 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel for all further proceedings. The new case number is 15cv1749 GPC (AGS).(no document attached) (jcj)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 349 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge M. James Lorenz is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns for all further proceedings. The new case number is 15cv1749-LAB-AGS.(no document attached) (jmr) (rmc).
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 348 RESPONSE in Opposition re #336 MOTION to Preclude Evidence and Payment of Fees and Costs filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1 to Bernay Declaration, #3 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (jpp).
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 347 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Mikolajczyk on behalf of Persian Gulf Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mikolajczyk, Eugene)Attorney Eugene Mikolajczyk added to party Persian Gulf Inc.(pty:pla) (jpp).
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER Granting #344 Joint Motion to Amend, Denying as Moot #332 Ex Parte Motion to Amend, and Granting #338 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 1/13/2020. (aef)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 344 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #257 Scheduling Order, [Joint Motion and Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order] by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (jpp).
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 343 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #342 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (dlg).
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 342 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (dlg).
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 341 REPLY to Response to Motion re #332 Ex Parte MOTION to Amend/Correct #257 Scheduling Order, filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1-2 to the Bernay Reply Declaration, #3 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (aef).
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 340 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC re #339 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (aef).
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 1/13/2020*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #338 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (dlg). Modified on 1/13/2020 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 338 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Mittelstaedt, Robert) = (dlg).
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 337 RESPONSE in Opposition re #332 Ex Parte MOTION to Amend/Correct #257 Scheduling Order, filed by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas York, #2 Table of Exhibits to York Declaration, #3 Exhibit A to York Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to York Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to York Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to York Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to York Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to York Declaration, #9 Declaration of Joshua Lichtman, #10 Declaration of Dawn Sestito, #11 Table of Exhibits to Sestito Declaration, #12 Exhibit A to Sestito Declaration, #13 Exhibit B to Sestito Declaration, #14 Declaration of Kent Roger, #15 Declaration of Jay Srinivasan, #16 Declaration of Kyle Foltyn-Smith, #17 Table of Exhibits to Foltyn-Smith Declaration, #18 Exhibit A to Foltyn-Smith Declaration, #19 Declaration of Diane McGimsey, #20 Proof of Service)(Mittelstaedt, Robert)(aef).
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 336 MOTION to Preclude Evidence and Payment of Fees and Costs by Alon USA Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A-B, #3 Proof of Service)(Hittinger, Carl)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER (AGS): Plaintiff's motion to shorten the briefing schedule (ECF No. #333 ) on its motion to amend is granted. Any response to the motion to amend (ECF No. #332 ) is due January 3, 2020. Any reply is due January 6, 2020. The Court does not anticipate holding a hearing on the matter, but may set a telephonic conference after reviewing the parties' briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 12/30/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion for an extension of time (ECF No. #331 ) is granted. Any discovery motion arising from Shell's first set of interrogatories is due January 27, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 12/30/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time re Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Amend the First Amended Scheduling Order #332 by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (jpp).
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 332 Ex Parte MOTION to Amend/Correct #257 Scheduling Order, by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1-2 to Bernay Declaration, #3 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (jpp).
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 331 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Responses to Shell's First Set of Interrogatories by Equilon Enterprises LLC. (Roger, Kent) (jpp).
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Cynthia E. Richman, re #328 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 12/17/2019.(rmc)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 329 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/9/2019 before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Amanda M. LeGore. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 1/6/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/16/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2020. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:15-cv-01749-L-AGS and 3:18-cv-01374-L-AGS.) (akr)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 328 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $206 receipt number 0974-13265246.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Richman, Cynthia) (rmc).
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 327 NOTICE of Appearance by Meera S. Bhaskar on behalf of Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Bhaskar, Meera) `(jpp).
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 326 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Christopher Whittaker on behalf of Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Whittaker, Stephen) (jpp).
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 325 NOTICE of Appearance by Jagannathan P. Srinivasan on behalf of Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (jpp).
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 324 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Grant Liversidge on behalf of Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Liversidge, Samuel) (jpp).
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 323 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Joseph Boutrous, Jr on behalf of Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Boutrous, Theodore) (jpp).
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 322 MINUTE ENTRY (AGS): On December 9, 2019, the Court held a motion hearing. Defendant Alon's motion to stay discovery is granted and discovery is stayed as to Defendant Alon. All other requests in the various briefs were denied. No sanctions were imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 12/09/2019. (CD# 12/9/2019 AGS 19:2:59-3:10). (Plaintiff Attorney Alexandra Bernay; Lonnie A. Browne, Patrick Coughlin, Carmen A. Medici, Jason Forge, Jenny L. Dixon).(Defendant Attorney Tydon Herrold, Carl H. Hittinger, Robin Assaf Wofford, Joshua Lichtman, Cheryl L. O'Connor). (no document attached) (yeb)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Julian David Perlman (Re: ECF No. #320 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 12/5/2019.(jrd)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 320 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-13210111.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Perlman, Julian)(jrd)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER (AGS): The parties joint motion to continue (ECF No. #318 ) is granted. The hearing is reset to December 9, 2019, at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 11/22/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 318 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendant Alon USA Energy, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Discovery as to Alon by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Medici, Carmen) (jpp).
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER (AGS): Due to a personal emergency, the hearing on the Motion to Stay (ECF No. #283 ) is reset to November 26, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 11/19/2019.(no document attached) (mxa)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 316 DECLARATION re #294 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, #311 Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal [Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Alon USA Energy, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions Under Rule 11 and 28 U.S.C. 1927] by Plaintiff Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A & B, #2 Exhibit C (Declaration of Robert F. McCullough), #3 Exhibits 16, 32, 33, 41, 43, 45, 46, 48, #4 Exhibits 49, 52, 53, 57, 59, #5 Exhibit 60, #6 Exhibits 62, 65, 66, 67, 68, 70, 71, 72, #7 Exhibit 73, #8 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (jpp).
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion to extend (ECF No. #313 ) is granted. Any discovery dispute arising from CUSA's discovery responses must be filed by December 12, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 11/13/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER (AGS): The parties joint motion to withdraw (ECF No. #312 ) is granted. Plaintiffs motion to compel additional discovery responses from Defendant Valero (ECF No. #301 ) is withdrawn and the hearing on that motion is vacated. This does not affect any hearings set on other motions for the same time and date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 11/12/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 313 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel Regarding CUSA's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra)(jpp).
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 312 Joint MOTION to Withdraw #301 MOTION to Compel Defendant Valero Marketing and Supply Company's Production of Documents by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi. (Dixon, Jenny) (jpp).
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER Denying #295 Application to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/5/2019. (aef)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 310 MINUTE ORDER by Judge M. James Lorenz: The Court finds as moot ECF #251 and #261 . Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Alexander R. Safyan (ECF No. #251 ) was previously filed and ruled on (see ECF No. #207 and #208 ). Counsel was instructed to withdraw motion. Motion to File Documents Under Seal (ECF No. #261 ) is related to a previously withdrawn motion (See ECF No. #260 ). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/4/2019. (no document attached) (lrf)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER Granting Withdrawal of Arya Towfighi [ECF No. #308 ]. Gerald E. Hawxhurst and Kyle Foltyn-Smith remain counsel of record for Defendant Valero Marketing and Supply Company in this action. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/1/2019. (Attorney Arya Towfighi terminated) (lrf)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 308 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Arya Towfighi by Valero Marketing and Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gerald E. Hawxhurst, #2 Proof of Service)(Hawxhurst, Gerald) (sjt).
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 307 NOTICE Concerning Entry of Appearance of Jason A. Forge by Alon USA Energy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hittinger, Carl) (sjt).
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 306 RESPONSE re #305 Response in Support of Motion, [Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Alon USA Energy, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Non-Opposition to Alon's Motion to Stay Discovery as to Alon] filed by Persian Gulf Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (sjt).
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 305 RESPONSE in Support re #283 MOTION to Stay Discovery as to Alon (Response to Plaintiffs' Non-Opposition to Alon's Motion to Stay) filed by Alon USA Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1-6, #3 Proof of Service)(Hittinger, Carl) (sjt).
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 304 REPLY to Response to Motion re #282 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 and 28 U.S.C. 1927 filed by Alon USA Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proof of Service)(Hittinger, Carl) (sjt).
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 303 NOTICE of Appearance for the Limited Purpose of ECF Nos. 282 and 294 by Jason A Forge on behalf of Persian Gulf Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Forge, Jason)Attorney Jason A Forge added to party Persian Gulf Inc.(pty:pla)(sjt).
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 302 NOTICE of Appearance of Cara Prentice Butterworth by Cara Prentice Butterworth on behalf of BP West Coast Products LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service (Certificate of Service))(Butterworth, Cara)Attorney Cara Prentice Butterworth added to party BP West Coast Products LLC(pty:dft) (sjt).
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 301 MOTION to Compel Defendant Valero Marketing and Supply Company's Production of Documents by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Jenny L. Dixon, #3 Exhibits 1-17)(Dixon, Jenny) (mme).
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 300 RESPONSE re #299 Notice (Other) [Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Alon USA Energy, Inc.'s Notice of Intent to Respond] filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (mme).
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 299 NOTICE of Intent to Respond to Plainiffs' Non-Opposition to Motion to Stay Discovery as to Alon by Alon USA Energy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hittinger, Carl) (sjt).
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of William DeVinney, re #289 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan for Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/21/2019.(rmc)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 297 NON Opposition re #283 MOTION to Stay Discovery as to Alon [Plaintiffs' Non-Opposition to Defendant Alon USA Energy, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Discovery as to Alon] filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (sjt).
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 296 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #295 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (dlg).
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 295 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Bernay, Alexandra) (dlg).
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 294 RESPONSE in Opposition re #282 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 and 28 U.S.C. 1927 filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [Redacted] in support thereof, #2 Exhibit B [Redacted] in support thereof, #3 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in support thereof, #4 Exhibit 1-26 to Bernay Declaration [Redacted], #5 Exhibit 27-33 to Bernay Declaration [Redacted], #6 Exhibit 34 part 1 to Bernay Declaration [Redacted], #7 Exhibit 34 part 2 - 43 to Bernay Declaration [Redacted], #8 Exhibit 44-50 to Bernay Declaration [Redacted], #9 Exhibit 51-58 to Bernay Declaration [Redacted], #10 Exhibit 59-63 to Bernay Declaration [Redacted], #11 Exhibit 64-73 to Bernay Declaration [Redacted], #12 Declaration of George C. Aguilar in support thereof, #13 Declaration of Robert F. McCullough [Redacted] with Exhibits 1-9 thereto, #14 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (sjt).
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Enlarge Page Limits for Briefing on Motion for Sanctions Under Rule 11 and 28 U.S.C. 1927 [Doc. #288 ]. Plaintiffs may file a consolidated opposition to Alon's motion for sanctions of up to thirty (30) pages. Alon may file a reply of up to fifteen (15) pages. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/21/2019. (lrf)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER (AGS): The parties joint motion to continue Defendant Alons motion to stay discovery (ECF No. #287 ) is granted. But the requested date is not available. So, the Court will hear the motion on November 21, 2019, at 4:00 p.m. This order does not alter the briefing schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 10/18/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 289 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-13069814.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (DeVinney, William) (dsn)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER Granting Withdrawal of Susan J. Welch as Counsel of Record for Defendant Equilon Enterprises LLC (D/B/A Shell Oil Products US) [Doc. #286 ]. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/17/2019. (Attorney Susan J Welch terminated) (lrf)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER Granting Withdrawal of Brian M. Hom as Counsel of Record for Defendant Equilon Enterprises LLC (D/B/A Shell Oil Products US) [Doc. #285 ]. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/17/2019. (Attorney Brian M. Hom terminated) (lrf)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 288 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Briefing on Motion for Sanctions by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi. (Aguilar, George) (sjt).
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 287 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendant Alon USA Energy, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Discovery as to Alon by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (sjt).
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 286 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Susan J. Welch by Equilon Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kent M. Roger)(Roger, Kent) (sjt).
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 285 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Brian M. Hom by Equilon Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kent M. Roger)(Roger, Kent) (sjt).
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 284 NOTICE of Name Change by Phillips 66 (Carter, Michelle) (sjt).
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MOTION to Stay Discovery as to Alon by Alon USA Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carl Hittinger, #2 Exhibit 1-3, #3 Memo of Points and Authorities, #4 Proof of Service)(Hittinger, Carl) (sjt).
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 and 28 U.S.C. 1927 by Alon USA Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carl Hittinger, #2 Exhibit 1-4, #3 Exhibit 5-7, #4 Exhibit 8-19, #5 Exhibit 20-32, #6 Exhibit 33-43, #7 Exhibit 44-60, #8 Memo of Points and Authorities, #9 Proof of Service)(Hittinger, Carl) (sjt).
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 281 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Persian Gulf Inc. re #260 MOTION to Compel Defendants Chevron U.S.A. Inc. and Phillips 66's Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pepich, Steven) (sjt).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Geraldine W. Young, re #277 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan, for Judge M. James Lorenz, on 9/26/2019. (mdc)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER granting #239 Plaintiff's Motion fro Reconsideration of Discovery Ruling. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/27/2019. (sjt)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 278 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi re #259 MOTION to Compel Defendant Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC's Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (Dixon, Jenny) (sjt).
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 277 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12977541.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Young, Geraldine) (dsn)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion for an extension of time (ECF No. #274 ) is granted. By October 7, 2019, the parties must file any discovery motion arising from the identified dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 09/23/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 275 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason S Hartley on behalf of Persian Gulf Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hartley, Jason)Attorney Jason S Hartley added to party Persian Gulf Inc.(pty:pla) (sjt).
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 274 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Any Motion Related to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Responses to Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s and Defendants' Requests for Admission by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Sletten, Steven) (sjt).
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion to continue next week's motion hearings (ECF No. #272 ) is granted. Those hearings are reset to October 11, 2019, at 4:00 p.m. Oppositions to the motions are now due September 27, 2019, and replies are due October 4, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 09/18/2019.(no document attached) (mxa)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 272 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel [ECF No. 259 and ECF No. 260] by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pepich, Steven) (sjt).
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 271 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Marie McCray on behalf of ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company (McCray, Katherine)(sjt).
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 270 PRO HAC APPROVED re #269 : Michelle Kaemmerling appearing for Defendant ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (no document attached) (mdc)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 269 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12940041.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Kaemmerling, Michelle) (mdc)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion to continue (ECF No. #267 ) is granted. The motion hearing on the motion to compel defendant Tesoro to provide supplemental responses is reset to October 1, 2019, at 4:00 p.m. No later than September 24, 2019, the parties must inform the Court of what issues remain to be resolved in the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 09/11/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Tesoro's Answers to Interrogatories by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi. (Dixon, Jenny) (sjt).
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 266 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC re #265 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (O'Connor, Cheryl) (jrm).
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 265 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #264 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(O'Connor, Cheryl)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 264 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (O'Connor, Cheryl)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 263 RESPONSE in Opposition re #259 MOTION to Compel Defendant Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC's Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories filed by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cheryl O'Connor in Support of Defendant Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit A (under seal), #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D (under seal), #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M (under seal), #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O)(O'Connor, Cheryl) (sjt).
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 262 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #261 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Pepich, Steven) (dlg).
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Pepich, Steven) (dlg).
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 260 **DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE #281 ** MOTION to Compel Defendants Chevron U.S.A. Inc. and Phillips 66's Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, #2 Declaration of Steven W. Pepich in Support thereof, #3 Exhibit 1-16 to Pepich Declaration [redacted], #4 Certificate of Service)(Pepich, Steven)(sjt). Modified to withdraw on 10/1/2019 (sjt).
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 259 **DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE #278 ** MOTION to Compel Defendant Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC's Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories by Richard Bartlett, Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi, Kristine Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Jenny L. Dixon, #3 Exhibits A-G)(Dixon, Jenny)Attorney Jenny L. Dixon added to party Richard Bartlett(pty:ip), Attorney Jenny L. Dixon added to party Joshua Ebright(pty:ip), Attorney Jenny L. Dixon added to party Paul Lee(pty:ip), Attorney Jenny L. Dixon added to party David Rinaldi(pty:ip), Attorney Jenny L. Dixon added to party Kristine Snyder(pty:ip) (tcf). Modified to withdraw on 9/25/2019 (sjt).
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 258 REPLY to Response to Motion re #239 MOTION Pursuant to Rule 72(a) to Object re 236 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,, Motion Hearing,,, [Plaintiff Persian Gulf Inc.'s Notice of Objection to July 3, 2019 Order on Plaintiff's Mo filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (sjt).
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER Granting Motion (ECF No. 248) and First Amended Scheduling Order. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 6/26/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/18/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/25/2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5B before Judge M. James Lorenz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 8/2/2019.(lrf)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 256 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/30/2019 before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cynthia R. Ott. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/23/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/3/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2019. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:15-cv-01749-L-AGS and 3:18-cv-01374-L-AGS.) (akr)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 RESPONSE in Opposition re #239 MOTION Pursuant to Rule 72(a) to Object re 236 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,, Motion Hearing,,, [Plaintiff Persian Gulf Inc.'s Notice of Objection to July 3, 2019 Order on Plaintiff's Mo (Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiff's Objection to July 3, 2019 Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Permit Disclosure) filed by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Sestito, Dawn) (sjt).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER Granting Withdrawal of Katherine M. McCray [ECF No. #250 ]. Katherine M. McCray is withdrawn as Exxon's counsel of record in this action. Frederick W. Kosmo, Hubert Kim and Robin A. Wofford remain Exxon's counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/31/2019. (Attorney Katherine Marie McCray terminated) (lrf)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MINUTE ENTRY and ORDER (AGS): On July 30, 2019, the Court held a motion hearing. For the reasons, and to the extent, set out on the record, Defendant Alon's motion to compel (ECF No. #219 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff must supplement its responses by August 21, 2019. No sanctions were imposed. Any motion to disqualify as a result of the disclosures made at the hearing is due August 16, 2019. Finally, the motion to amend the scheduling order (ECF No. #248 ) is taken under advisement. A separate order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 7/30/2019. (CD# 7/30/2019 AGS 19:4:52-:25; 5:31-5:45). (Plaintiff Attorney Alexandra S. Bernay; Lonnie Brown; Carmen Medici; George Aguilar).(Defendant Attorney Jeffrey William Duffy; Gerald E. Hawxhurst; Layne E. Kruse; Robert Charles Phelps; Dawm Sestito; Steven E. Sletten; Robon A. Wofford; Jay P. Srinivasan). (no document attached) (yeb)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 252 NOTICE of Errata by Valero Marketing and Supply Company re #251 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Alexander R. Safyan (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hawxhurst, Gerald) (QC mailer sent re: improperly-filed documents. Atty instructed to withdraw this and doc. 251) (sjt).
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Alexander R. Safyan by Valero Marketing and Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gerald E. Hawxhurst, #2 Proof of Service)(Hawxhurst, Gerald) (sjt).
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Katherine M. McCray as Counsel of Record for Defendant ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robin A. Wofford)(Wofford, Robin) (sjt).
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER (AGS): Defendants' unopposed motion to permit telephonic appearance of some defendants' counsel at the July 30, 2019 motion hearing (ECF No. #247 ) is granted. The mentioned counsel may appear by telephone, but primary argument must be handled for defendants--individually or as a group--by counsel present in person. Counsel appearing by telephone must jointly call Judge Schopler's chambers five minutes before the hearing's scheduled start time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 07/30/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #163 Scheduling Order, [Joint Motion and Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order] by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) 9 (sjt).
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MOTION to Excuse Appearance of Non-Arguing Counsel for Defendants in Person and To Permit Telephone Appearance at July 30, 2019, Hearing by Phillips 66. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua D. Lichtman in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Joshua D. Lichtman)(Lichtman, Joshua) (sjt). Modified on 10/22/2019 (yeb). Modified on 11/4/2019 (lrf).
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 REPLY to Response to Motion re #219 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Answer Interrogatories filed by Alon USA Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3)(Hittinger, Carl) (sjt).
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion for an extension of time to file discovery motions arising from the Tesoro interrogatory responses (ECF No. #241 ) is granted. Any motion arising from those responses is now due August 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 07/23/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER (AGS): Due to an unanticipated change to the Court's schedule, the hearing on Alon's motion to compel (ECF No. #219 ) is reset to July 30, 2019, at 4:00 p.m. The briefing schedule is not altered by this change. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 07/23/2019.(no document attached) (mxa)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 243 RESPONSE in Opposition re #219 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Answer Interrogatories filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration 1-10 to the Browne Declaration, #2 Exhibit 11-17 to the Browne Declaration, #3 Exhibit 18 to the Browne Declaration, #4 Exhibit 18 to the Browne Declaration, #5 Certificate of Service)(Browne, Lonnie) (sjt).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #239 MOTION Pursuant to Rule 72(a) to Object. It is ordered as follows: 1. No later than 7/31/2019, Defendants shall jointly file a response, if any. 2. No later than 8/5/2019, Plaintiff shall file a reply, if any. 3. Upon filing the foregoing, the Objection will be deemed submitted on the briefs. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/18/2019.(lrf)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Tesoro's Discovery Responses by Persian Gulf Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (sjt).
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER (AGS): Defendant Phillips 66 motion for an extension of time (ECF No. #238 ) is granted. Any discovery motion arising from Persian Gulf's responses to the second set of RFPs is due August 18, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 07/17/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MOTION Pursuant to Rule 72(a) to Object re 236 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,, Motion Hearing,,, [Plaintiff Persian Gulf Inc.'s Notice of Objection to July 3, 2019 Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Permit Disclosure] by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in support thereof, #2 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in support thereof, #3 Exhibit 1-2 to Bernay Declaration, #4 Declaration of Cody Rosenfield in support thereof, #5 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (sjt).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 238 MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Extend Deadline for Motion to Compel by Phillips 66. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua D. Lichtman in Support of Defendant Phillips 66's Motion to Extend Deadline for Motion to Compel)(Lichtman, Joshua) (sjt).
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 237 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/3/2019 before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Court Reporter/Transcriber: James C. Pence-Aviles. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/1/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2019. (akr)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MINUTE ENTRY (AGS): On July 3, 2019, the Court held a motion hearing on plaintiff's motion to permit disclosure (ECF No. #213 ) and defendant Chevron's motion to compel (ECF No. #216 ). For the reasons set out on the record, plaintiff's motion (ECF No. #213 ) is denied, and defendant Chevron's motion (ECF No. #216 ) is granted. By July 24, 2019, plaintiff must supplement its Request For Admission responses. No sanctions imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 07/03/2019. (CD# 7/3/2019 AGS 19:10:20-10:50, 10:56-11:06). (Plaintiff Attorney Alexandra S. Berney; Lonnie A. Brown, Carmen Medici; Steven Wayne Pepich, George C. Aguilar).(Defendant Attorney Jeffrey William Duffy; Gerald E. Hawxhurst; Layne E. Kruse; Robert Charles Phelps; Dawm Sestito; Steven E. Sletten; Robon A. Wofford; Jay P. Srinivasan). (no document attached) (yeb)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting #234 Withdrawal of Christina N. Daniele. Attorney Christina Noelle Daniele terminated. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/3/2019. (jrm)(jao).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Christina N. Daniele as Counsel of Record for Defendant Phillips 66 by Phillips 66. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua D. Lichtman in Support of Motion of Christina N. Daniele to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Phillips 66)(Lichtman, Joshua) (jrm).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge M. James Lorenz Rejecting re #231 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Christina N. Daniele as Counsel of Record for Defendant Phillips 66, from Defendant Phillips 66. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 83.3.f.3 - failure to fully comply with service requirements. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/2/2019.(lrf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2019: #1 Rejected Document 231) (lrf).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE of Appearance of Michelle L. Mello For Defendant Phillips 66 by Michelle L. Mello on behalf of Phillips 66 (Mello, Michelle)Attorney Michelle L. Mello added to party Phillips 66(pty:dft) (jrm).
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ***DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER #233 *** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Christina N. Daniele as Counsel of Record for Defendant Phillips 66 by Phillips 66. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joshua D. Lichtman in Support of Motion of Christina N. Daniele to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Phillips 66)(Lichtman, Joshua) (sjt). (Main Document 231 replaced on 7/2/2019) (lrf). Modified to strike on 7/2/2019 (lrf).
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER (AGS): Defendants' unopposed ex parte application for telephonic appearance at the July 3, 2019 hearing (ECF No. #229 ) is granted. Attorneys Hawxhurst and Sacks may appear at that hearing by telephone, but must call in five minutes prior to the start of the hearing and be prepared to participate throughout the proceeding. Additionally, the primary argument must be handled by an attorney representing defendants (individually or as a whole) who is present in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 06/28/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at July 3, 2019 Hearing on Behalf of Valero Marketing and Supply Company and BP West Coast Products LLC by Valero Marketing and Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gerald E. Hawxhurst, #2 Declaration of Robert A. Sacks, #3 Proof of Service)(Hawxhurst, Gerald) (sjt).
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion to extend deadlines (ECF No. #227 ) is granted. Any motion to compel additional responses for the discovery requests identified in the motion must be filed by August 23, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 06/24/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 227 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel Defendants' Discovery Responses by Richard Bartlett, Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi, Kristine Snyder. (Aguilar, George) (sjt).
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 226 REPLY to Response to Motion re #216 MOTION to Compel RFAs be Deemed Admitted or in the alternative to Compel Responses to RFAs filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sletten, Steven) (sjt).
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER (AGS): On July 3, 2019, at 10:00 a.m., the Court will also hear the defendant Chevron's Motion to Deem RFAs Admitted (ECF No. #216 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 06/20/2019.(no document attached) (mxa)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 224 REPLY to Response to Motion re #213 MOTION For an Order Permitting Disclosure of Highly Confidential Information to Plaintiff's Consultant filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1-3 to Bernay Reply Declaration, #3 Certificate of Service)(Medici, Carmen) (sjt).
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion for an extension of time to file discovery motions arising from the Tesoro interrogatory responses (ECF No. #221 ) is granted. Any motion arising from those responses is now due July 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 06/19/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER (AGS): Due to an unanticipated change in the Court's schedule, the motion hearing on plaintiff's motion for an order permitting disclosure (ECF No. #213 ) is reset to July 3, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 06/19/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel Tesoro's Discovery Responses by Richard Bartlett, Kristine Snyder, David Rinaldi, Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee. (Aguilar, George)Attorney George C Aguilar added to party Richard Bartlett(pty:ip), Attorney George C Aguilar added to party Kristine Snyder(pty:ip), Attorney George C Aguilar added to party David Rinaldi(pty:ip), Attorney George C Aguilar added to party Joshua Ebright(pty:ip), Attorney George C Aguilar added to party Paul Lee(pty:ip) (sjt).
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 RESPONSE in Opposition re #216 MOTION to Compel RFAs be Deemed Admitted or in the alternative to Compel Responses to RFAs filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lonnie A. Browne in support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1-8 to the Browne Declaration, #3 Exhibit 9-14 to the Browne Declaration, #4 Exhibit 15-20 to the Browne Declaration, #5 Exhibit 21-26 to the Browne Declaration, #6 Certificate of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (sjt).
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Answer Interrogatories by Alon USA Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Hittinger, Carl) (sjt).
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 218 RESPONSE in Opposition re #213 MOTION For an Order Permitting Disclosure of Highly Confidential Information to Plaintiff's Consultant (Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Permitting Disclosure of Highly Confidential Information to Plaintiff's Consultant) filed by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dawn Sestito in Support, #2 Exhibits A-M to Sestito Declaration, #3 Proof of Service)(Sestito, Dawn) (sjt).
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Sletten, Steven) (sjt).
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MOTION to Compel RFAs be Deemed Admitted or in the alternative to Compel Responses to RFAs by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Compel, #2 Declaration of Steven E. Sletten ISO Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibit 1-5 to Sletten Decl., #4 Exhibit 6-10 to Sletten Decl., #5 Exhibit 11-15 to Sletten Decl., #6 Exhibit 16-18 to Sletten Decl.)(Sletten, Steven) (sjt).
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion for an extension of time (ECF No. #214 ) is granted. By June 14, 2019. Alon may file any discovery motion arising from the December 19, 2018 discovery requests. Given the age of those requests, the Court will not be inclined to give any further extensions subject to a particularized showing of good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 06/04/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion And Stipulation To Extend Deadline For Alon USA Energy, Inc. To File Motion To Compel Plaintiffs Discovery Responses by Alon USA Energy, Inc.. (Hittinger, Carl) (sjt).
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MOTION For an Order Permitting Disclosure of Highly Confidential Information to Plaintiff's Consultant by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Proof of Service)(Medici, Carmen) (sjt).
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion for an extension of time (ECF No. #211 ) is granted. Any motion arising from the Tesoro discovery responses must be filed by June 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 05/21/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 211 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Tesoro's Discovery Responses by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Pepich, Steven) (sjt).
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion for an extension of time (ECF No. #209 ) is granted. Any motion arising from the discovery requests served on December 19, 2018, must be filed by May 31, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 05/10/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion And Stipulation To Extend Deadline For Alon USA Energy, Inc. To File Motion To Compel Plaintiffs Discovery Responses by Alon USA Energy, Inc.. (Hittinger, Carl) (tcf).
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER Granting Withdrawal of Alexander R. Safyan [ECF No. #207 ]. Attorney Alexander Robert Safyan terminated. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/6/2019. (lrf)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Alexander R. Safyan by Valero Marketing and Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hawxhurst, Gerald) (tcf).
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Valero Marketing and Supply Company re #204 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Alexander R. Safyan filed by Valero Marketing and Supply Company . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hawxhurst, Gerald) (tcf).
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 205 NOTICE of Appearance by Arya Towfighi on behalf of Valero Marketing and Supply Company (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Towfighi, Arya)Attorney Arya Towfighi added to party Valero Marketing and Supply Company(pty:dft) (tcf).
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ***Document Withdrawn per ECF No. #206 *** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Alexander R. Safyan by Valero Marketing and Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Safyan, Alexander) QC mailer sent re: incorrect s/signature and/or CM/ECF account used(tcf). Modified on 5/6/2019 (tcf).
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion for an extension of time (ECF No. #202 ) is granted. Any discovery request arising from the discovery requests served on December 19, 2018, must be filed by May 13, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 04/22/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion and Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Alon USA Energy, Inc. to File Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Discovery by Alon USA Energy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Matthias, Michael) (sjt).
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion for an extension of time (ECF No. #200 ) is granted. Any discovery request arising from the identified dispute involving the subpoena issued to McCullough Research must be filed by April 29, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 04/16/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File for Motions to Compel by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Electronic Service and Mail Service)(Sletten, Steven) (sjt).
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl L. O'Connor on behalf of Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(O'Connor, Cheryl)Attorney Cheryl L. O'Connor added to party Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC(pty:dft)(sjt).
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Patrick Enson on behalf of Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Enson, Eric)Attorney Eric Patrick Enson added to party Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC(pty:dft) (sjt).
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion for an extension of time (ECF No. #196 ) is granted. Any discovery motion arising from Alon's December 11, 2018 discovery requests is now due April 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 03/21/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Discovery Responses by Alon USA Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hittinger, Carl) (sjt).
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion for an extension of time (ECF No. #194 ) is granted. The deadlines set out in the parties' stipulation are incorporated by reference and the parties must adhere to them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 03/18/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Joint Interrogatories by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(McCray, Katherine) (sjt).
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 NOTICE of Appearance of Rishi P. Satia by Rishi Pankaj Satia on behalf of Equilon Enterprises LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Satia, Rishi)Attorney Rishi Pankaj Satia added to party Equilon Enterprises LLC(pty:dft) (sjt).
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 NOTICE of Appearance of Minna Lo Naranjo by Minna Lo Naranjo on behalf of Equilon Enterprises LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Naranjo, Minna)Attorney Minna Lo Naranjo added to party Equilon Enterprises LLC(pty:dft) (sjt).
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER (AGS): Defendants' unopposed motion (ECF No. #189 ) for relief from this Court's previous order (ECF No. 186) is granted. The February 22, 2019 deadline is vacated. Instead, the parties must comply with any and all rules of the Central District of California in bringing any dispute before the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 02/22/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. re #189 MOTION for Relief of Defendant's Unopposed Application from the Court's Discovery Order Signature Certification. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sletten, Steven)(sjt).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MOTION for Relief of Defendant's Unopposed Application from the Court's Discovery Order by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl. of Steve Sletten ISO Defendants' Unopposed Application for Relief from the Court's Discovery Order, #2 Proof of Service Certificate of Electronic Service)(Sletten, Steven) (sjt).
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion to extend the time to file a motion to compel plaintiffs' responses to interrogatories and requests for production (ECF No. #187 ) is granted. Any motion arising from the identified disputes must be filed by March 15, 2019. Given the complexity of this case and number of parties and attorneys involved, the Court will amend its normal chambers rules to require all discovery motions to be filed within 60 days of the dispute arising. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 02/11/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions To Compel Plaintiffs Responses To Interrogatories And Defendant Exxonmobils Responses To Requests For Production by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(McCray, Katherine) (sjt).
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER (AGS): Defendants' fourth motion for an extension of time (ECF No. #185 ) is granted. Any discovery motion arising from the Consumer Watchdog subpoena mentioned in defendants' motion must be filed by February 22, 2019. Given that this Court has already adjudicated the related motion to this subpoena, the Court will not provide any further extensions without good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 02/07/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel Consumer Watchdog Subpoena by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kim, Hubert) (sjt).
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER Granting Motion (ECF No. #183 ) and Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 2/4/2019. (lrf)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Joint MOTION for Protective Order [Joint Motion for Entry of Joint Proposed Stipulated Protective Order] by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Medici, Carmen) (sjt).
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Discovery Conference) held on 1/24/2019 before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cynthia R. Ott. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 2/21/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/1/2019. (akr)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MINUTE ENTRY (AGS): On January 24, 2019, the Court held a motion hearing on defendants' motion to compel (ECF No. #166 ). The Court reviewed the documents in camera. For the reasons set out on the record, the motion is granted. Costs are awarded to the moving defendants; the parties must meet and confer to determine the amount of those costs. The Court also resolved the parties' protective order dispute, as set out on the record. The parties must meet and confer and provide the Court with a proposed order by February 1, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 01/24/2019. (CD# 1/24/2019 AGS 19:3:54-4:02; 4:29-5:05; 5:19-5:30). (Plaintiff Attorney Alexandra S Bernay; George C Aguilar, David William Mitchell, Lonnie A. Browne, Patrick J Coughlin).(Defendant Attorney Jeffrey W. Duffy, Gerald E. Hawxhurst; Joshua D. Lichtman, Brian M. Humm, Dawn Sestito, Rasha Shields, Steven Sletten, Robin Wofford, Robert Smith, Jackson Trusman). (no document attached) (yeb)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE of Appearance by Jackson Samuel Trugman on behalf of BP West Coast Products LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Trugman, Jackson)Attorney Jackson Samuel Trugman added to party BP West Coast Products LLC(pty:dft) (sjt).
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. W. Smith on behalf of BP West Coast Products LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Smith, Robert)Attorney Robert M. W. Smith added to party BP West Coast Products LLC(pty:dft) (sjt).
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER (AGS): At the January 24, 2019 hearing, in addition to the motion scheduled to be heard that day, the parties should be prepared to address their respective positions as to the submitted blanket protective orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 01/18/2019.(no document attached) (mxa)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER (AGS): Plaintiffs' motion to extend the time to file a discovery motion related to plaintiffs' second request for production of documents (ECF No. #176 ) is granted. Any motion arising from those requests must be filed by March 4, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 01/18/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions to Compel Related to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendants by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Bernay, Alexandra) (sjt).
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER Regarding Expert Discovery. For good cause shown, the Joint Motion Regarding Expert Discovery is granted as outlined in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 1/10/2019. (lrf)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE of Change of Address by Katherine Marie McCray (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(McCray, Katherine) (QC mailer sent re: address not updated) (sjt).
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Joint MOTION for Discovery Order Regarding Expert Discovery by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Swanson, Daniel) (sjt).
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER (BLM): Defendants' third motion for an extension of time (ECF No. #171 ) is granted. Any discovery motion arising from the Consumer Watchdog subpoena mentioned in defendants' motion must be filed by February 7, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara L. Major on 01/09/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File / Motion to Extend Deadline for Motions to Compel Consumer Watchdog Subpoena by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sestito, Dawn) (sjt).
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name to Hawxhurst Harris LLP by Valero Marketing and Supply Company (Hawxhurst, Gerald) (sjt).
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 REPLY to Response to Motion re #166 Joint MOTION to Compel Documents and Information Responsive to Request for Production No. 7 and Interrogatory No. 6 from Plaintiff Persian Gulf, Inc. filed by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sestito, Dawn) (sjt).
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 RESPONSE in Opposition re #166 Joint MOTION to Compel Documents and Information Responsive to Request for Production No. 7 and Interrogatory No. 6 from Plaintiff Persian Gulf, Inc. filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Documents and Information Responsive to Request for Production No. 7 & and Interrogatory No. 6 from Plaintiff Persian Gulf, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Proof of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (jdt).
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER (MLG): Due to the Court's schedule, the motion hearing on defendant's motion to compel is reset to January 24, 2019, at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman on 12/14/2018.(no document attached) (mxa)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Joint MOTION to Compel Documents and Information Responsive to Request for Production No. 7 and Interrogatory No. 6 from Plaintiff Persian Gulf, Inc. by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Dawn Sestito in Support, #3 Declaration of Robin A. Wofford in Support, #4 Exhibits A-I to Declaration of Wofford, #5 Exhibits J-O to Declaration of Wofford, #6 Proof of Service)(Sestito, Dawn) (sjt).
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER (MLG): Defendant Exxon's motion for an extension (ECF No. #164 ) is granted. Any discovery motion arising from the Consumer Watchdog subpoena mentioned in defendant's motion must be filed by January 11, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman on 11/19/2018. (no document attached) (mxa)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel Consumer Watchdog Subpoena by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robin A. Wofford, #2 Proof of Service)(Wofford, Robin) (sjt).
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 SCHEDULING ORDER: Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 1/31/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/6/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5B before Judge M. James Lorenz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman on 11/15/2018.(lrf)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER Granting Joint Motion Regarding Production of Electronically Stored Information (ECF No. #160 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman on 11/14/2018. (lrf)
November 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Joint MOTION for Order Regarding Production of Electronically Stored Information by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Joint Motion for Order Regarding Production of Electronically Stored Information, #2 Exhibit B to Joint Motion for Order Regarding Production of Electronically Stored Information)(Sletten, Steven) (sjt).
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 AMENDED DOCUMENT by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. Amendment to #151 Supplemental Document Revised Joint Proposed Case Management Schedule And Discovery Limitations. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(McCray, Katherine) (sjt).
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MINUTE ENTRY (MLG): On November 8, 2018, the Court held a status conference. Order to follow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman on 11/13/2018. (CD# 11/8/2018 18 MLG 11:15-11:23). (Plaintiff Attorneys Armen Zohrabian; Alexandra S Bernay; George Aguilar). (Defendant Attorney Steven Eugene Sletten). (no document attached) (mxa)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Wayne Pepich on behalf of Persian Gulf Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service with ECF service list)(Pepich, Steven)Attorney Steven Wayne Pepich added to party Persian Gulf Inc.(pty:pla) (QC mailer sent re: improper signature) (sjt).
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER (MLG): Due to the Court's schedule, the telephonic, attorneys only follow-up status conference (see ECF No. 150 ) is reset to November 8, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiffs' counsel is responsible for initiating a joint call to chambers with counsel for each party on the line. Signed by Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman on 11/5/2018. (no document attached) (mjg)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Jeanne Michele Mariani, re #154 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/1/2018. (mdc)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER (MLG): The parties' joint motion for an extension (ECF No. #153 ) is granted. Any discovery motion arising from the Consumer Watchdog subpoena mentioned in the parties' motion must be filed by November 26, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman on 11/01/2018. (no document attached) (mxa)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11852026.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Mariani, Jeanne-Michele) (mdc)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File -Extend Deadline for Motions to Compel Consumer Watchdog Subpoena by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robin A. Wofford, #2 Proof of Service)(Wofford, Robin)(sjt).
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/1/2018 before Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cynthia R. Ott. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 10/31/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/8/2019. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:15-cv-01749-L-AGS and 3:18-cv-01374-L-AGS.) (akr)
October 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Persian Gulf Inc. re #146 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service with ECF service list)(Bernay, Alexandra) (anh).
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER (MLG): On October 1, 2018, the Court held a case management conference. The Court will hold a telephonic, attorneys only follow-up status conference on November 5, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiffs' counsel is responsible for initiating a joint call with counsel for each party on the line to chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman on 10/01/2018. (CD# 10/1/2018 MLG 18:1:58-3:45). (Plaintiff Attorney Alexandra S Bernay; David William Mitchell, Lonnie A. Browne, Patrick J Coughlin).(Defendant Attorney Michael P. Murtagh, Rasha Gerges Shields Diane Lee McGimsey, Robert A. Mittelstaedt, Robin Assaf Wofford, Joshua D Lichtman). (no document attached) (yeb)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting #148 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman on 10/1/2018. (sjt)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the Case Management Conference on October 1, 2018 by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven E. Sletten, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Steven E. Sletten, #3 Proof of Service)(Sletten, Steven) (sjt).
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance of Lonnie A. Browne by Lonnie A. Browne on behalf of Persian Gulf Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Browne, Lonnie)Attorney Lonnie A. Browne added to party Persian Gulf Inc.(pty:pla) (sjt).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Proposed Protective Order [with redline version following], #2 Exhibit Defendants" Proposed Protective Order [with redline version following], #3 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Medici, Carmen) (QC mailer sent re: proposed order, document not filed in lead case)) (sjt).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11647050.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Richman, Cynthia) 9/10/2018 - Per atty, request refiled in correct case 18cv1374-L-AGS (Dkt # 58). (mdc)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER (CEA): In light of Judge Lorenz's orders coordinating these related cases, the Court cancels the September 17, 2018 Early Neutral Evaluation in the Persian Gulf case (15-cv-1749-L-AGS). Instead, all attorneys from that case and the related cases must appear in person for a case management conference on October 1, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. By September 24, 2018, the parties must file a joint discovery plan which includes the position on case management of each party in all of the related cases. At that hearing, the parties must be prepared to discuss whether early global settlement discussions may prove fruitful or be an efficient use of resources. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte on 08/14/2018.(no document attached) (mxa)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER Coordinating Actions for Pre-Trial Proceedings. The Direct Purchaser Action and the Consumer Actions shall be coordinated for discovery and other pre-trial purposes to avoid unnecessary cost and delay. Coordinating the actions may entail discovery, case management and motion briefing, as appropriate. The parties shall forthwith contact the assigned Magistrate Judge to set a joint conference in furtherance of coordinating the actions. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/8/2018.(lrf)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 NON-OPPOSITION re #139 Response to Order to Show Cause Defendants' Notice of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Response to July 26, 2018 Order to Show Cause filed by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kim, Hubert)(sjt).
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Noelle Daniele on behalf of Phillips 66 (Daniele, Christina)Attorney Christina Noelle Daniele added to party Phillips 66(pty:dft) (sjt).
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Phillips 66 re #119 Notice of Appearance filed by Phillips 66 . (Lichtman, Joshua)(sjt).
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Persian Gulf Inc. re #135 Order to Show Cause,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 135, #2 Proof of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (sjt).
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER Granting #137 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Valero Marketing and Supply. The motion by Adam Friedenberg and Robert Charles Phelps to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendant Valero Marketing and Supply Company ("Valero") is granted. Gerald E. Hawxhurst, Alexander Robert Safayan and Kyle Foltyn-Smith remain as Valero's counsel of record. (Attorney Adam Friedenberg and Robert Charles Phelps terminated). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/30/2018. (lrf)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Valero Marketing and Supply Company (L.R. 83.3(f)(3)) by Valero Marketing and Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert C. Phelps, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service on Valero Marketing and Supply Company, #4 Proof of Service)(Phelps, Robert) (QC mailer sent re: proposed order attached) (sjt).
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER (CEA): The parties' joint motion to continue (ECF No. #133 ) is granted. The Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference are reset to September 17, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. The pre-hearing deadlines will be as agreed by the parties. All other provisions of this Court's July 18, 2018 Order remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clinton Averitte on 07/27/2018. (no document attached) (mxa)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Layne E. Kruse (Re: Doc. No. #130 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/26/2018.(jrd)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiffs are ordered to show cause why the Consumer Actions should not be coordinated with the Direct Purchaser Action for discovery and other pre-trial purposes to avoid unnecessary cost and delay. Coordinating the actions could entail joint discovery, case management and motion briefing, as appropriate.To comply with this Order to Show Cause, Plaintiffs shall file a response no later than 8/3/2018. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Order on all Defendants. No later than 8/10/2018, Defendants may, but are not required to, file a reply. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/26/2018.(lrf)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Joint MOTION to Continue / Reschedule Early Neutral Evaluation And Case Management Conference by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kim, Hubert) (sjt).
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 AMENDED ANSWER to update ECF filer to #76 Amended Complaint, by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sletten, Steven)(sjt).
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/10/2018 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Clinton Averitte. Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2018 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Clinton Averitte. Joint Discovery Plan due 9/3/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clinton Averitte on 7/18/2018.(sjt) (Main Document 131 replaced on 7/18/2018) (yeb).
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11458532.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Kruse, Layne)(jrd)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ANSWER to #76 Amended Complaint, by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Shields, Rasha) (sjt).
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Defendant ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company's ANSWER to #76 Amended Complaint, by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sestito, Dawn) (sjt).
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ANSWER to #76 Amended Complaint, by Equilon Enterprises LLC.(Roger, Kent) (sjt).
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ANSWER to #76 Amended Complaint, by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sacks, Robert) (sjt).
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ANSWER to #76 Amended Complaint, by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Garcia, Abiel) (QC mailer sent re: wrong signature)(sjt).
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Abiel Garcia on behalf of Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Garcia, Abiel)Attorney Abiel Garcia added to party Chevron U.S.A. Inc.(pty:dft) (sjt).
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Phillips 66 re #119 Notice of Appearance, #121 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Lichtman, Joshua) (sjt).
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Equilon Enterprises LLC (D/B/A Shell Oil Products US). Identifying Other Affiliate SOPC Holdings East LLC, Other Affiliate SOPC Holdings West LLC, Other Affiliate TMR Company for Equilon Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Roger, Kent)(sjt).
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Phillips 66. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Lichtman, Joshua) (sjt).
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ANSWER to #76 Amended Complaint, by Phillips 66.(Lichtman, Joshua) (sjt).
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 **DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE #140 ** NOTICE of Appearance of Christina N. Daniele by Joshua D Lichtman on behalf of Phillips 66 (Lichtman, Joshua) (QC mailer sent re: wrong account, attorney not added)(sjt). Modified to withdraw on 8/8/2018 (sjt).
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua D Lichtman on behalf of Phillips 66 (Lichtman, Joshua)Attorney Joshua D Lichtman added to party Phillips 66(pty:dft) (sjt).
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance of Brian M. Hom by Brian Ming Hom on behalf of Equilon Enterprises LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Hom, Brian)Attorney Brian Ming Hom added to party Equilon Enterprises LLC(pty:dft) (sjt).
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ANSWER to #76 Amended Complaint, by Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Phelps, Robert) (sjt).
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ANSWER to #76 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Alon USA Energy, Inc..(Hittinger, Carl) (sjt).
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ADAM FRIEDENBERG by Valero Marketing and Supply Company (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Friedenberg, Adam)Attorney Adam Friedenberg added to party Valero Marketing and Supply Company(pty:dft) (sjt).
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Valero Marketing and Supply Company . Identifying Corporate Parent Valero Energy Corporation for Valero Marketing and Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Phelps, Robert) (sjt).
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ROBERT C. PHELPS by Valero Marketing and Supply Company (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Phelps, Robert)Attorney Robert Charles Phelps added to party Valero Marketing and Supply Company(pty:dft) (sjt).
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Murtagh on behalf of BP West Coast Products LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Murtagh, Michael)Attorney Michael P. Murtagh added to party BP West Coast Products LLC(pty:dft) (sjt).
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Granting #108 Motion of Defendant Alon USA Energy, Inc. to Obtain Order of Withdrawal of Attorneys Erick L. Jackson, Michael De Leeuw and Amanda Lorenz and Substitute Counsel. Attorney Amanda M. Lorenz; Michael Birney De Leeuw and Erik L. Jackson terminated as to Alon USA Energy, Inc. Attorney Michael Matthias, Carl Hittinger, Jeffry Duffy, and Tyson Herrold added as to Alon USA Energy, Inc. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/16/2018. (lrf)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Foltyn-Smith on behalf of Valero Marketing and Supply Company (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Foltyn-Smith, Kyle)Attorney Kyle Foltyn-Smith added to party Valero Marketing and Supply Company(pty:dft) (sjt).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Alon USA Energy, Inc.. (Jackson, Erik) (QC amiler sent re: proposed order attached)(sjt).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Alon USA Energy, Inc. Defendant Alon USA Energy, Inc.s Amended Notice Of Party With Financial Interest. Identifying Other Affiliate Delek US Holdings, Inc. for Alon USA Energy, Inc.. (Matthias, Michael) (sjt).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by Hubert Kim on behalf of ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kim, Hubert)Attorney Hubert Kim added to party ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company (pty:dft) (sjt).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Granting #104 Joint Motion Regarding Substitution of Party. Good cause appearing, the Court grants the joint motion to substitute Phillips 66 as a defendant in place of ConocoPhillips in the Action. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/13/2018. (lrf)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party Phillips 66 as a Defendant in place of Defendant ConocoPhillips by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (sjt).
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Tyson Y. Herrold, re #97 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/12/2018. (mdc)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Carl W. Hittinger, re #95 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/10/2018. (mdc)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Jeffry W. Duffy, re #96 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/10/2018. (mdc)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alon USA Energy, Inc. re #94 Notice of Appearance (Matthias, Michael) (sjt).
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Robert Safyan on behalf of Valero Marketing and Supply Company (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Safyan, Alexander)Attorney Alexander Robert Safyan added to party Valero Marketing and Supply Company(pty:dft) (sjt).
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald E. Hawxhurst on behalf of Valero Marketing and Supply Company (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hawxhurst, Gerald)Attorney Gerald E. Hawxhurst added to party Valero Marketing and Supply Company(pty:dft) (sjt).
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11422705.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Herrold, Tyson) (mdc)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11422482.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Duffy, Jeffry)(jrd)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11422384.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Hittinger, Carl)(jrd)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R Matthias on behalf of Alon USA Energy, Inc. (Matthias, Michael)Attorney Michael R Matthias added to party Alon USA Energy, Inc.(pty:dft) (sjt).
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Marie McCray on behalf of ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(McCray, Katherine)Attorney Katherine Marie McCray added to party ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company (pty:dft) (sjt).
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Re Renewed Joint Motion and Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to File Answers to the Amended Complaint Pursuant to Local Rules 7.2 and 12.1. The parties' joint motion and stipulation to extend time for defendants to file answers to the amended complaint is granted. Defendants' answers to the amended complaint are due July 17, 2018. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/2/2018. (lrf)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Rasha Gerges Shields on behalf of Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Shields, Rasha)Attorney Rasha Gerges Shields added to party Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC(pty:dft) (sjt).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #89 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Wofford, Robin)(sjt).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying without Prejudice #88 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/29/2018. (sjt)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #76 Amended Complaint, by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Wofford, Robin) (sjt).
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER denying without Prejudice #45 Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/19/2018. (sjt)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying #81 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/19/2018. (sjt) (Main Document 86 replaced on 6/19/2018) (sjt).
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 REPLY to Response to Motion re #81 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sletten, Steven)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 TRANSFER ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Bernard G. Skomal to the calendar of the Honorable Andrew G. Schopler for all further proceedings. The new case number is 15cv1749 L (AGS). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 11/16/2016.(jcj)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge M. James Lorenz Accepting re #82 Response in Opposition to Motion,, from Plaintiff Persian Gulf Inc.. Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF 2(f): Filing attorney did not sign document. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is accepted despite the discrepancy noted above. Any further non-compliant documents may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/14/2016.(fth)
November 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 RESPONSE in Opposition re #81 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (Discrepancy pending) (sjt).
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Defs.' Joint Motion to Dismiss FAC, #2 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defs.' Joint Motion to Dismiss FAC, #3 Declaration in Support of RFJN in Support of Defs.' Joint Motion to Dismiss FAC, #4 Exhibit Table of Contents for Exhibits attached to Decl. in Support of RFJN, #5 Exhibit 1 to Decl. in Support of RFJN, #6 Exhibit 2 to Decl. in Support of RFJN, #7 Exhibit 3 to Decl. in Support of RFJN, #8 Exhibit 4 to Decl. in Support of RFJN, #9 Proof of Service)(Sletten, Steven) (sjt).
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #79 Amended Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Set Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Defendants joint motion to dismiss, if any, shall be filed and served no later than October 17, 2016. Plaintiffs opposition, if any, shall be filed and served no later than November 11, 2016. Defendants reply, if any, shall be filed and served no later than November 23, 2016. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/6/2016. (sjt)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Stipulation by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sletten, Steven) (sjt).
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #77 Joint Motion for a Continuance. Accordingly, as a courtesy, the time for filing and service of a response to the first amended complaint is extended to October 12, 2016. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/3/2016. (sjt)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Stipulation by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sletten, Steven) (sjt).
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand for Violations of the Sherman Act, California's Cartwright Act, and Unfair Competition Law against Alon USA Energy, Inc., BP West Coast Products LLC, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips, Does 1-25, Equilon Enterprises LLC, ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Bernay, Alexandra) (sjt).
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 PRO HAC APPROVED: Michael Birney De Leeuw appearing for Defendant Alon USA Energy, Inc. (no document attached) (aef)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-9361390.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (De Leeuw, Michael) (aef).
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying #68 Motion for Limited Discovery; granting #68 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. If Plaintiff wishes to file an amended complaint, it must do so no later than September 22, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 8/23/2016. (sjt)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik L. Jackson on behalf of Alon USA Energy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Jackson, Erik)Attorney Erik L. Jackson added to party Alon USA Energy, Inc.(pty:dft) (sjt).
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 REPLY to Response to Motion re #68 MOTION for Discovery (Limited) and for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Limited Discovery and Request for Extension of Time to File, #2 Exhibit 1 and 2, #3 Proof of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (sjt).
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 RESPONSE in Opposition re #68 MOTION for Discovery (Limited) and for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sletten, Steven) (sjt).
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance of Armen Zohrabian by Armen Zohrabian on behalf of Persian Gulf Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Zohrabian, Armen)Attorney Armen Zohrabian added to party Persian Gulf Inc.(pty:pla) (sjt).
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION for Discovery (Limited) and for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Limited Discovery and Request for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint, #2 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Limited Discovery and Request for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1-5 to the Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay, #4 Proof of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (sjt).
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery and Vacating Deadline for Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/26/2016.(sjt)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting with leave to Amend #47 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendants motion to dismiss is granted with leave to amend. If Plaintiff wishes to file an amended complaint, it must do so no later than August 11, 2016. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/14/2016. (sjt) (jao).
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Persian Gulf Inc. Withdrawal of Joint Motion and Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (sjt).
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 **DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE #65 ** Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Briefing Schedule by Persian Gulf Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) Modified on 5/5/2016 (sjt). Modified to withdraw on 5/9/2016 (sjt).
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion re #47 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) in Accordance with Special Briefing Schedule re- filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proof of Service)(Sletten, Steven) (sjt).
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge M. James Lorenz Rejecting re #61 Reply to Response to Motion,, from Defendant Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 7.1 or 47.1: Document is not timely. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/28/2016.(sjt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/28/2016: #1 Rejected Document) (sjt).
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 **DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER #62 ** REPLY to Response to Motion re #47 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Request for Judicial Notice, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, # 3 Proof of Service)(Sletten, Steven)(sjt). (Main Document 61 replaced on 4/28/2016) (sjt). Modified to Strike on 4/28/2016 (sjt).
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Termination of Party Kern Oil & Refining Co. re #59 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (no document attached) (sjt)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Persian Gulf Inc. as to Defendant Kern Oil and Refining Company (Without Prejudice) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service via ECF)(Bernay, Alexandra) (sjt).
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RESPONSE in Opposition re #47 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit C to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Proof of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (sjt).
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Joinder by Valero Marketing and Supply Company re #47 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Friedenberg, Adam) (sjt).
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Revised Pursuant to Order of the Court Dated March18, 2016 against Persian Gulf Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., BP West Coast Products LLC, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips, Does 1-25, Equilon Enterprises LLC, ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company, Kern Oil & Refining Co., Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Bernay, Alexandra) (sjt).
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge M. James Lorenz Accepting re #54 Reply to Response to Motion, from Plaintiff Persian Gulf Inc.. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is accepted despite the discrepancy noted above. Any further non-compliant documents may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/23/2016.(sjt)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP as Interim Lead Counsel filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (sjt).
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance of Carissa J. Dolan by Carissa J Dolan on behalf of Persian Gulf Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Dolan, Carissa)Attorney Carissa J Dolan added to party Persian Gulf Inc.(pty:pla) (rlu).
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP as Interim Lead Counsel (Joint Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Interim Lead Counsel ) filed by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Lifland, Charles)(rlu).
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting #50 Joint Motion Regarding Substitution of Party and Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant Valero Marketing and Supply Company shall be substituted in place of Defendant Valero Energy Company. All claims asserted against Valero Energy are dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a). No later than 3/25/2016, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint reflecting the substitution of Valero Energy. For good cause shown pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b), the time for Valero Marketing to respond to the complaint is extended until 4/20/2016. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/18/2016. (rlu)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party Valero Marketing in place of Valero Energy, Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra) (rlu).
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge M. James Lorenz Accepting re #48 Supplemental Briefing, from Defendant BP West Coast Products LLC. Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF 2(g)(2): Documents in Support must be filed as attachments. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is accepted despite the discrepancy noted above. Any further non-compliant documents may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/9/2016.(sjt)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendant BP West Coast Products LLC re #47 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sacks, Robert) (sjt).
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Defs.' Joint Motion to Dismiss, #2 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defs.' Joint Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Table of Contents for RFJN, #4 Exhibit A to RFJN, #5 Exhibit B to RFJN, #6 Exhibit C to RFJN, #7 Exhibit D to RFJN, #8 Exhibit E to RFJN, #9 Exhibit F to RFJN, #10 Proof of Service)(Sletten, Steven) (sjt).
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge M. James Lorenz Accepting re #45 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP as Interim Lead Counsel, from Plaintiff Persian Gulf Inc.. Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF 2(g)(2): Certificate of Service not filed as separate attachment. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is accepted despite the discrepancy noted above. Any further non-compliant documents may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/7/2016.(sjt)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP as Interim Lead Counsel by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Appoint Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP as Interim Lead Counsel, #2 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of Motion to Appoint Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP as Interim Lead Counsel, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay (RGRD Firm Resume))(Bernay, Alexandra) (sjt).
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Joint Motion to Withdraw #35 MOTION to Remand to State Court. In addition, Defendants motion to dismiss is due fourteen (14) days after this order is signed; the opposition is due thirty (30) days after the motion to dismiss is filed; and the reply is due twenty-one (21) days after the opposition. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/2/2016. (sjt)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Joint MOTION to Withdraw #35 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sletten, Steven) (QC mailer sent re: improper signature in proof of service) (sjt).
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Approving Pro Hac Vice as to Layne Kruse. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/29/2015.(vam)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #35 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Caringal, Jennifer) (sjt).
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Eugene Sletten on behalf of Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sletten, Steven)Attorney Steven Eugene Sletten added to party Chevron U.S.A. Inc.(pty:dft) (sjt).
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kruse, Layne) (vam).
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Remand to State Court /Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Lifland, Charles) (sjt).
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge M. James Lorenz Accepting re #35 MOTION to Remand to State Court , from Plaintiff Persian Gulf Inc.. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 7.1 or 47.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is accepted despite the discrepancy noted above. Any further non-compliant documents may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/28/2015.(sjt)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Andrew Sacks on behalf of BP West Coast Products LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sacks, Robert)Attorney Robert Andrew Sacks added to party BP West Coast Products LLC(pty:dft) (sjt).
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 **DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #44 ** MOTION to Remand to State Court by Persian Gulf Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Proof of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra)(sjt). Modified to Withdraw on 3/2/2016 (sjt).
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #32 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants' motions to dismiss are due fourteen (14) days after the entry of the order resolving Plaintiff's motion to remand; oppositions are due thirty (30) days after the motions to dismiss are filed; replies are due twenty-one (21) days after the oppositions. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/26/2015. (sjt)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance of Alexandra S. Bernay by Alexandra S Bernay on behalf of Persian Gulf Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bernay, Alexandra)Attorney Alexandra S Bernay added to party Persian Gulf Inc.(pty:pla)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Kiernan, David) (sjt).
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance of Jennifer N. Caringal by Jennifer N. Caringal on behalf of Persian Gulf Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caringal, Jennifer)Attorney Jennifer N. Caringal added to party Persian Gulf Inc.(pty:pla)(sjt).
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance of Carmen A. Medici by Carmen A. Medici on behalf of Persian Gulf Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Medici, Carmen)Attorney Carmen A. Medici added to party Persian Gulf Inc.(pty:pla) (sjt).
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance of David W. Mitchell by David William Mitchell on behalf of Persian Gulf Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Mitchell, David)Attorney David William Mitchell added to party Persian Gulf Inc.(pty:pla) (sjt).
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Alon USA Energy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Lorenz, Amanda) 8/25/2015 (sjt).
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda M. Lorenz on behalf of Alon USA Energy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Lorenz, Amanda)Attorney Amanda M. Lorenz added to party Alon USA Energy, Inc.(pty:dft) (sjt).
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by BP West Coast Products LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(McGimsey, Diane) (sjt).
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Lee McGimsey on behalf of BP West Coast Products LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(McGimsey, Diane)Attorney Diane Lee McGimsey added to party BP West Coast Products LLC(pty:dft) (sjt).
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge M. James Lorenz Rejecting re #23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , from Defendant Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF 2(f): Signatories for Persian Gulf Inc., BP West Coast Products LLC & Alon USA Energy, Inc. Have not appeared. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/24/2015.(sjt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2015: #1 Rejected Document) (sjt).
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 **DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER #24 ** Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Kiernan, David) (sjt). (Main Document 23 replaced on 8/24/2015) (sjt). Modified to strike on 8/24/2015 (sjt).
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by John Christopher Gray on behalf of ConocoPhillips (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Gray, John)Attorney John Christopher Gray added to party ConocoPhillips(pty:dft) (sjt).
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-8348601.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kruse, Layne) Modified on 8/21/2015-QC mailer sent to atty for missing signature (vam).
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick William Kosmo, JR on behalf of ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company (Kosmo, Frederick)Attorney Frederick William Kosmo, JR added to party ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company (pty:dft) (knb).
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Robin Assaf Wofford on behalf of ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company (Wofford, Robin)Attorney Robin Assaf Wofford added to party ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company (pty:dft) (knb).
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company (Sestito, Dawn) (rlu).
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn Sestito on behalf of ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company (Sestito, Dawn)Attorney Dawn Sestito added to party ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company (pty:dft) (rlu).
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew K Wegner on behalf of Kern Oil & Refining Co. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Wegner, Matthew)Attorney Matthew K Wegner added to party Kern Oil & Refining Co.(pty:dft) (rlu).
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua D Lichtman on behalf of ConocoPhillips (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Lichtman, Joshua)Attorney Joshua D Lichtman added to party ConocoPhillips(pty:dft) (kas).
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance SUSAN J. WELCH by Susan J Welch on behalf of Equilon Enterprises LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Welch, Susan)Attorney Susan J Welch added to party Equilon Enterprises LLC(pty:dft) (cxl).
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Michael Roger on behalf of Equilon Enterprises LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Roger, Kent). Modified on 8/13/2015 - Removed duplicate text and attachment description (jah).
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Equilon Enterprises LLC (D/B/A SHELL OIL PRODUCTS US) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(West, Colin) (jao).
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance OF COLIN C. WEST by Colin Charles West on behalf of Equilon Enterprises LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(West, Colin)Attorney Colin Charles West added to party Equilon Enterprises LLC(pty:dft) (jao).
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #8 Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. The Court Grants the joint motion and extends Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint until 8/27/2015. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan for Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/12/2015. (rlu)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge M. James Lorenz Accepting re #6 Notice of Party With Financial Interest, #8 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File and Stipulation, from Defendant Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF 2(g)(2) - Proof of service not filed as attachment. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is accepted despite the discrepancy noted above. Any further non-compliant documents may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/12/2015.(rlu)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Stipulation by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Kiernan, David)Attorney David Craig Kiernan added to party Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC(pty:dft) (discrepancy prepared) (rlu).
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Kern Oil & Refining Co. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Brown, Jr., William) (rlu).
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC (Kiernan, David) (discrepancy prepared) (rlu).
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Valero Energy Corporation (Phelps, Robert) qc email pos should have been an attachment on 8/11/2015 (rlu).
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Friedenberg on behalf of Valero Energy Corporation (Friedenberg, Adam)Attorney Adam Friedenberg added to party Valero Energy Corporation(pty:dft) qc email pos should have been an attachment on 8/11/2015 (rlu).
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by ConocoPhillips (Lichtman, Joshua) qc email pos should have been an attachment on 8/11/2015 (rlu).
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.(fth)(jrd)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand From Superior Court, San Diego County, Central Division, case number 37-2015-00022430-CU-AT-CTL. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-8310784.), filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of David S. Han, #3 Exhibit 1-15 to Declaration of David S. Han, #4 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:15-cv-01749-L-BGS. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Han, David)(fth)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Persian Gulf Inc. v. BP West Coast Products LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alon USA Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Carl W Hittinger
Represented By: William DeVinney
Represented By: Amanda M. Lorenz
Represented By: Jeanne-Michele Mariani
Represented By: Jeffry William Duffy
Represented By: Alyse F. Stach
Represented By: Julian David Perlman
Represented By: Michael Birney De Leeuw
Represented By: Michael R Matthias
Represented By: Erik L. Jackson
Represented By: Tyson Herrold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern Oil & Refining Co.
Represented By: William J. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew K Wegner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company
Represented By: Joseph L. McGeady
Represented By: Robin Assaf Wofford
Represented By: Hubert Kim
Represented By: Dawn Sestito
Represented By: Charles Coleman Lifland
Represented By: Michelle Kaemmerling
Represented By: Frederick William Kosmo, Jr.
Represented By: Katherine Marie McCray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips 66
Represented By: Layne E. Kruse
Represented By: Geraldine Young
Represented By: Michelle L. Carter
Represented By: Christina Noelle Daniele
Represented By: Joshua D Lichtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Energy Corporation
Represented By: Adam Friedenberg
Represented By: Robert Charles Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC
Represented By: Rasha Gerges Shields
Represented By: Robert A. Mittelstaedt
Represented By: Cheryl L. O'Connor
Represented By: David Craig Kiernan
Represented By: Danielle Rebecca Leneck
Represented By: Eric Patrick Enson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equilon Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Colin Charles West
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Represented By: Brian Ming Hom
Represented By: Minna Lo Naranjo
Represented By: Susan J Welch
Represented By: Rishi Pankaj Satia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips
Represented By: Peter H Mason
Represented By: Layne E. Kruse
Represented By: Joshua D Lichtman
Represented By: John Christopher Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: David S. Han
Represented By: Jagannathan P. Srinivasan
Represented By: Steven Eugene Sletten
Represented By: Abiel Garcia
Represented By: Stephen Christopher Whittaker
Represented By: Daniel Glen Swanson
Represented By: Cynthia E. Richman
Represented By: Samuel Grant Liversidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP West Coast Products LLC
Represented By: Jackson Samuel Trugman
Represented By: Diane Lee McGimsey
Represented By: Michael P. Murtagh
Represented By: Robert Andrew Sacks
Represented By: Robert M. W. Smith
Represented By: Cara Prentice Butterworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Marketing and Supply Company
Represented By: Alexander Robert Safyan
Represented By: Gerald E. Hawxhurst
Represented By: Kyle Foltyn-Smith
Represented By: Adam Friedenberg
Represented By: Arya Towfighi
Represented By: Robert Charles Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equilon Enterprises LLC doing business as Shell Oil Products US
Represented By: Colin Charles West
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Represented By: Brian Ming Hom
Represented By: Minna Lo Naranjo
Represented By: Susan J Welch
Represented By: Rishi Pankaj Satia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Persian Gulf Inc.
Represented By: Steven Wayne Pepich
Represented By: Brian O O'Mara
Represented By: Patrick J Coughlin
Represented By: Carmen A. Medici
Represented By: Jason A Forge
Represented By: Jennifer N. Caringal
Represented By: Eugene Mikolajczyk
Represented By: Carissa J Dolan
Represented By: David William Mitchell
Represented By: Lonnie A. Browne
Represented By: Armen Zohrabian
Represented By: Alexandra S Bernay
Represented By: Jason S Hartley
Represented By: Brian O. O'Mara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?