Interlabservice, OOO v. Illumina, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Interlabservice, OOO
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, Illumina, Inc., Illumina Netherlands, BV and Nick Bates
Cross Defendant: Roes 1 through 10
Case Number: 3:2015cv02171
Filed: September 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Karen S Crawford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 bc
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #63 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 11/27/2017. (dsn) (jao).
October 13, 2017 Filing 63 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Illumina's Counterclaims by Illumina, Inc.. (Connaughton, E) (knb).
September 29, 2017 Filing 62 The parties' Joint Motion to Continue the Final Pre-Trial Conference is granted. Based on the current status of the case, the final Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/6/17 has been VACATED. [Doc. No. 59.] Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 9/29/17. (no document attached) (plh)
September 29, 2017 Filing 61 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: The final Pre-Trial Conference has been taken off calendar based on the current status of the case.(no document attached) (plh)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: Granting Defendant's #44 Motion to Dismiss; and Granting Defendant's #53 Motion for Terminating Sanctions. The final Pretrial Conference scheduled for October 6, 2017 is vacated. No later than November 3, 2017 defendant shall either file a dispositive motion on the counterclaims, seek dismissal of the remainder of the case, or submit a status report setting forth a proposed timetable for further proceedings and trial on the counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 9/26/2017. (knb)
September 25, 2017 Filing 59 Joint MOTION to Continue Final Pretrial Conference by Illumina, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Joseph Connaughton in Support, #2 Proof of Service)(Connaughton, E) (knb).
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Denying Defendant's #45 Motion to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 9/19/2017. (knb)
May 19, 2017 Filing 57 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Based on the status of the case, the Mandatory Settlement Conference scheduled for 5/25/17 has been taken off calendar and will be re-set if necessary after pending motions are resolved.(no document attached) (plh)
May 4, 2017 Filing 56 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: The hearing on the Motion for Sanctions [Doc. No. 53] set for 5/12/2017 at 11:00 a.m. has been VACATED and the matter has been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.2(d)(1).(no document attached) (plh)
May 4, 2017 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to Motion re #53 MOTION for Sanctions [Terminating Sanctions] filed by Illumina, Inc. (Connaughton, E) (knb).
April 28, 2017 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re #53 MOTION for Sanctions [Terminating Sanctions] filed by Interlabservice, OOO. (Swarovski, Evgeny) (dxj).
March 28, 2017 Filing 53 MOTION for Sanctions [Terminating Sanctions] by Illumina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of E. Joseph Connaughton, #3 Proof of Service)(Connaughton, E) (dxj).
March 22, 2017 Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: The hearing on the Motion to Amend the Cross-Complaint set for 3/24/2017 at 11:30 a.m. has been VACATED and the matter has been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.2(d)(1).(no document attached) (plh)
March 16, 2017 Filing 51 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 MOTION to Amend/Correct its Cross-Complaint filed by Illumina, Inc.. (Connaughton, E) (dxj).
March 6, 2017 Filing 50 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Illumina, Inc.. Amendment to #45 MOTION to Amend/Correct its Cross-Complaint [Amended Document is Exhibit C 055-064 to Connaughton Dec. filed 02/02/17]. (Attachments: #1 Redline compare (Doc. 2 to Amended Exh. C), #2 Redline compare (Doc. 45-3 to Amended Exh. C), #3 Proof of Service)(Connaughton, E) Accepted per Chambers (dxj).
March 4, 2017 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION to Amend/Correct its Cross-Complaint filed by Interlabservice, OOO. (Swarovski, Evgeny) (knb).
February 22, 2017 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Hearing set for 2/24/2017 at 11:30 a.m. on Motion to Dismiss [Doc. No. 44] has been vacated. Written order to follow.(no document attached) (plh)
February 15, 2017 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Action for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply With a Court Order Pursuant to FRCP 41(b) filed by Illumina, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Connaughton, E) (knb).
February 2, 2017 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Action for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply With a Court Order Pursuant to FRCP 41(b) filed by Interlabservice, OOO. (Swarovski, Evgeny) (knb).
February 1, 2017 Filing 45 MOTION to Amend/Correct its Cross-Complaint by Illumina, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of E. Joseph Connaughton (Part 1), #3 Declaration of E. Joseph Connaughton (Part 2), #4 Declaration of E. Joseph Connaughton (Part 3), #5 Proof of Service)(Connaughton, E) (knb).
January 24, 2017 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Action for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply With a Court Order Pursuant to FRCP 41(b) by Illumina, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of E. Joseph Connaughton, #3 Proof of Service)(Connaughton, E) (knb).
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Denying #38 Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 10/17/2016. (knb)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER Granting #36 Joint Motion for Discovery. (See doc. #42 ) (no document attached) (knb)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re #36 Joint Motion Concerning Depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 10/4/2016.(knb)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting #35 Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Cut-Off and Other Related Dates; Amended Scheduling Order. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2017 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 5/25/2017 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 10/4/2016. (knb)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting Defendant's #30 Motion Posting of a Bond pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure Section 1030. Plaintiff is ordered to post a bond in the amount $58,422.50 within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 10/3/2016. (knb) (jao).
June 27, 2016 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Illumina, Inc. re #38 Joint MOTION for Discovery Re: Responses of Illumina to Plaintiff's RFPs, Set One (Jedreski, Matthew) (knb).
June 27, 2016 Filing 38 Joint MOTION for Discovery Re: Responses of Illumina to Plaintiff's RFPs, Set One by Illumina, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Evgeny Swarovski with Exhibit List and Exhibits A and B)(Jedreski, Matthew)Attorney Matthew R. Jedreski added to party Illumina, Inc.(pty:crc) (knb).
June 27, 2016 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Illumina, Inc. re #36 Joint MOTION for Discovery Re Depositions (Jedreski, Matthew) (knb).
June 27, 2016 Filing 36 Joint MOTION for Discovery Re Depositions by Illumina, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew R. Jedreski with Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Jedreski, Matthew) (knb)
June 1, 2016 Filing 35 Joint MOTION for Discovery to Extend Discovery Cut-Off and Other Related Dates by Illumina, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew R. Jedreski, #2 Proof of Service)(Jedreski, Matthew) (knb).
April 25, 2016 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION Posting of a Bond Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure Section 1030 Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Posting of a Bond Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure Section 1030 filed by Illumina, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Objections to Evidence Submitted by Plaintiff in Support of Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Posing of a Bond Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure Section 1030)(Jedreski, Matthew)(knb).
April 18, 2016 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re #30 MOTION Posting of a Bond Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure Section 1030 filed by Interlabservice, OOO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Dmitry Veryutin)(Swarovski, Evgeny) Modified on 4/18/2016-QC mailer sent re incorrect judge in caption; document not signed with s/ (aef).
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re Briefing on Motion for Posting of a Bond (re Doc. No. #30 ). Plaintiff or any other non-moving party may file an opposition on or before 4/18/2016. A reply, if any, may be filed no later than 4/25/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 4/4/2016.(dls)
March 29, 2016 Filing 31 Notice, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. The new case number is 15cv2171-KSC. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/29/2016.(knb)
March 23, 2016 Filing 30 MOTION Posting of a Bond Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure Section 1030 by Illumina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Posting of a Bond Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure Section 1030, #2 Declaration of Matthew R. Jedreski, #3 Declaration of Nick Bates, #4 Declaration of Stephane Garcia Part 1, #5 Declaration of Stephane Garcia Part 2, #6 Declaration of Andrey Lomonosov, #7 Certificate of Service)(Jedreski, Matthew) (dls).
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PROTECTIVE ORDER re #27 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 2/22/2016. (dls)
February 17, 2016 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Illumina, Inc. (Jedreski, Matthew) (dls).
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings: A Mandatory Settlement Conference shall be conducted on November 14, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Pretrial Disclosures shall be prepared, served and lodged with the assigned District Judge on or before April 14, 2017. The final Pretrial Conference is scheduled on the calendar of Judge Battaglia on April 21, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 2/11/16.(dlg)
February 5, 2016 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: A telephonic Case Management Conference was held on 2/5/2016.(no document attached) (plh)
January 21, 2016 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2016 has been continued. A telephonic Case Management Conference has been continued to 2/5/2016 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the telephonic conference by calling Judge Crawford's chambers at the appointed time with all counsel on the line.(no document attached) (plh)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order Following Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, Setting Rule 26 Compliance, and Notice of Telephonic Case Management Conference. On 11/24/2015, the Court convened an Early Neutral Evaluation Conference in this aciton. Counsel shall appear telephonically on 1/22/2016 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. A Joint Discovery Plan shall be lodged with Magistrate Judge Crawford on or before 1/8/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 12/2/2015.(dls)
November 23, 2015 Filing 23 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint,, by Illumina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Connaughton, E) (dlg).
November 5, 2015 Filing 22 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Interlabservice, OOO (Swarovski, Evgeny) (dlg).
November 5, 2015 Filing 21 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Interlabservice, OOO . (Swarovski, Evgeny) No LNO prepared. No related case (dlg).
November 5, 2015 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Illumina, Inc., filed by Interlabservice, OOO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1. 2011-2012 Agreement Part 1, #2 Exhibit Ex 2. 2011-2012 Agreement Part 2, #3 Exhibit Ex 3. Extension of 2011 Agreement, #4 Exhibit Ex 4. 2013 Agreement, #5 Exhibit Ex 5. 2014 Agreement Part 1, #6 Exhibit Ex 6. 2014 Agreement Part 2, #7 Exhibit Ex 7. Agreements with Illumina B.V., #8 Exhibit Ex 8. Illumina's Terms and Conditions) (Swarovski, Evgeny) (dlg).
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Denying #9 Motion to Dismiss and #10 Motion to Strike as Moot and Granting Plaintiff Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Upon consideration of Illumina's motions, and in light of Plaintiff's non-opposition, Illumina's motion to dismiss and motion to strike are denied as moot, and without prejudice. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint, and must do so by 11/11/2015. Failure to do so will lead to dismissal of the entire action. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/30/2015. (dls)
October 29, 2015 Filing 18 REPLY - Other re #10 MOTION to Strike Notice of Plaintiff's Non Opposition to Motion to Strike filed by Illumina, Inc.. (Karanjia, Freyaan) (dls).
October 29, 2015 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, for More Definite Pleadings filed by Illumina, Inc. (Karanjia, Freyaan) (dls).
October 22, 2015 Filing 16 NON Opposition re #10 MOTION to Strike filed by Interlabservice, OOO. (Swarovski, Evgeny) (dls).
October 22, 2015 Filing 15 NON Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, for More Definite Pleadings filed by Interlabservice, OOO. (Swarovski, Evgeny)(dls).
October 21, 2015 Filing 14 ANSWER to Crossclaim re #2 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim by Interlabservice, OOO.(Swarovski, Evgeny) (Modified on 10/21/2015 to edit docket text) (dls).
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Battaglia, Set briefing schedule as to #10 MOTION to Strike , #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, for More Definite Pleadings. Oppositions due by 10/22/2015, Replies due by 10/29/2015, no sur-replies will be filed. Motion hearing scheduled for 12/10/15 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 3B.(no document attached) (sc)
October 6, 2015 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Illumina, Inc. re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, for More Definite Pleadings (Amended Proof of Service) (Karanjia, Freyaan) (dls).
October 6, 2015 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Illumina, Inc. re #10 MOTION to Strike (Amended Proof of Service) (Karanjia, Freyaan) (dls).
October 6, 2015 Filing 10 MOTION to Strike by Illumina, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Karanjia, Freyaan) (dls).
October 6, 2015 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, for More Definite Pleadings by Illumina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Karanjia, Freyaan) (dls).
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation will be held on 11/24/2015 at 2:30 PM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 10/5/2015.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dls)
September 30, 2015 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Illumina, Inc. re #5 Notice of Appearance, (Connaughton, E) (dls).
September 30, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. Jedreski on behalf of Illumina, Inc. (Jedreski, Matthew)Attorney Matthew R. Jedreski added to party Illumina, Inc.(pty:dft) (dls).
September 30, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by E Joseph Connaughton, III on behalf of Illumina, Inc. (Connaughton, E)Attorney E Joseph Connaughton, III added to party Illumina, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney E Joseph Connaughton, III added to party Illumina, Inc.(pty:crc) (dls).
September 29, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Illumina, Inc. of case(s) No Related Case. Proposed Low Number Order not prepared - No Related Case. (nbp)(jrd)
September 29, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Illumina, Inc. (nbp)(jrd)
September 29, 2015 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against Interlabservice, OOO, Roes 1 through 10 by Illumina, Inc. (nbp)(jrd)
September 29, 2015 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand From Superior Court, County of San Diego, Central Division, case number 37-2015-00014358-CT-BC-CTL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-8453449.), filed by Illumina, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)The new case number is 3:15-cv-02171-AJB-KSC. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Karanjia, Freyaan)[ATTY MAINT](nbp)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Interlabservice, OOO v. Illumina, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interlabservice, OOO
Represented By: Evgeny Swarovski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Roes 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illumina, Inc.
Represented By: E Joseph Connaughton, III
Represented By: Matthew R. Jedreski
Represented By: Freyaan Y. Karanjia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illumina Netherlands, BV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?