Thomas v. County of San Diego et al
Plaintiff: Dave Thomas and Jonathan Thomas
Defendant: County of San Diego, William D. Gore, Alfred Joshua and Does 1-100
Case Number: 3:2015cv02232
Filed: October 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER: (1) Granting Dr. Naranjo's Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No. 107 ]; (2) Granting Dr. Malaguti's Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No. 108 ]; (3) Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [ECF No. 109 ]; and (4 ) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants County of San Diego and Remaining Individual Defendants [ECF No. 112]]. Plaintiff's § 1983 claims grounded in the County's lack of or inadequatepolicies a nd a failure to train against the Defendant County of San Diegoremain to the extent the claim is not based on conditions of Thomas' confinement. Conversely, Plaintiff's § 1983 and negligence claims againstindividual Defendants are dismissed. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/2/2019. (ECF No. 111 terminated per order) (lrf)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying 78 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/27/2017. (sjt)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The first cause of action is dismissed as to Magana. The fifth cause of action may proceed against Magana. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/19/2017. (sjt)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying 46 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/6/2017. (sjt)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 25 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/20/2017. (fth)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. County of San Diego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Thomas
Represented By: Christopher S Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Thomas
Represented By: Christopher S Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Diego
Represented By: Ricky R Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Gore
Represented By: Ricky R Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Joshua
Represented By: Ricky R Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?