Arellano, Jr. v. Dean et al
Plaintiff: |
Raul Arellano, Jr. |
Defendant: |
K. Dean, S. Pasha, S. Roberts, M. Glynn, J. Lewis and California Correctional Health Care Services |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv02247 |
Filed: |
October 6, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
Roger T. Benitez |
Presiding Judge: |
Jill L. Burkhardt |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 pr Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 7, 2022 |
Filing
134
ORDER OF TRANSFER: This case is transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Janis L. Sammartino to the calendar of the Honorable Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. All dates currently set before Judge Sammartino remain as scheduled before Judge Montenegro. Dates before the Magistrate Judge are unaffected by this Order. The new case number is 15-cv-02247-RBM-JLB. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/7/2022. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (tcf)
|
April 20, 2020 |
Filing
120
ORDER denying 119 Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/20/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
|
March 10, 2020 |
Filing
115
ORDER (1) Granting 110 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, and (2) Granting in part and denying in part 77 Defendants' motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/10/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
|
August 6, 2019 |
Filing
107
ORDER: (1) Denying Plaintiff's motion for appointment of an expert; (2) Denying Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to oppose summary judgment; and (3) Granting Defendants' motion for summary judgment. (ECF Nos. 77 , 93 , 103 ).Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/06/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
|
August 20, 2018 |
Filing
69
ORDER:(1) Denying 67 Motion to Reconsider or Appeal; (2) Denying as Moot 65 Motion for Extension of Time and (3) Granting Extension of Time. Plaintiff may file an amended Complaint on or before 9/17/2018. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/20/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
|
June 22, 2018 |
Filing
62
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 55 Motion for Appointment of Counsel and for Extension of Time. The Court 1) DENIES Plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel; and 2) GRANTS Plaintiff's request for an extension of time to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff's amended complaint, should he elect to file one, must be filed no later than 7/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 6/22/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
|
March 12, 2018 |
Filing
52
ORDER: (1) Sustaining in Part and Overruling in Part Plaintiff's Objections; (2) Adopting in Part 46 Report and Recommendation; and (3) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants 23 32 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/12/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
|
January 31, 2018 |
Filing
49
ORDER Denying 43 , 48 Motion to Unite State Case With Federal Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 1/31/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
|
January 17, 2018 |
Filing
46
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 23 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and 32 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Objections to R&R are due by 2/6/2018 and Replies are due by 2/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 1/17/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
|
September 14, 2016 |
Filing
8
ORDER DISMISSING First Amended Complaint for Failing to State a Claim and for Seeking Damages Against Immune Defendants. Plaintiff is granted forty-five (45) days leave from the date of this Order in which to file a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/13/2016.(Sent § 1983 form to Plaintiff) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?