Erhart v. Bofi Holding Inc.
Plaintiff: Charles Matthew Erhart
Defendant: Bofi Holding Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02287
Filed: October 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Presiding Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1514
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 305 PROPOSED JURY VERDICT FORM. The Court includes a Proposed Final Jury Verdict Form attached to this Order. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 5/12/22. (BAS)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Order Conditionally Granting BOFI Holding, Inc.'s Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Seal and Continue (ECF No. 249 ). Provided the parties file this joint status report no later than 1/28/22, trial will be continued from 2/1/22 to 4/26/22 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/20/22. (time re: trial per Chambers) (jmo)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Order Granting in Part Motion in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Evidence of Any Damages That Require Computation (ECF No. 221 ). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/13/22. (jmo)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Order Denying BOFI's Motion in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Evidence of Conduct and Statements that are not Actionable (ECF No. 220 ). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/12/22. (jmo)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Order Granting in Part BOFI's Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence of Predicates of Alleged Wrongdoing that the Court has Already Rejected (ECF No. 218 ). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/11/22. (jmo)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 239 Order Granting in Part BOFI's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Inflammatory Evidence that is Untethered to Erhart's Claims (ECF Nos. 215 , 232 ). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/10/22. (jmo)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER Granting In Part Bofis Motion In Limine No. 1 To Exclude Incomplete Documents And Related Testimony (ECF No. 213 ). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/7/2022. (ddf)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 237 Order Denying Ex Parte Application to Remove Document from the Public Docket and File it Under Seal (ECF No. 236 ). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 8/18/21. (jmo)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 128 Charles Erhart's Motion to Exclude Experts. BofI fails to demonstrate that its non-retained expert CFO Micheletti's proposed testimony is admissible under Rule 702. Consequently, the Court grants Erhart's request to preclude Micheletti from testifying as an expert, but the Court recognizes that Micheletti may be able to provide lay opinion testimony on the Bank's lost profits under Rule 701. The Court grants in part and den ies in part Erhart's request to exclude BofI's retained expert van Drunen. The Court admits van Drunen's testimony regarding internal audit objectives, standards, and procedures. The Court reaches a mixed result as to van Drunen' ;s more specific opinions on Erhart's conduct. Some of these opinions are appropriate under Rule 702; other opinions either fail to meet Rule 702s requirements or are subject to exclusion under Rule 403. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 4/1/2020.
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 127 BofI Federal Bank's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 137 Charles Erhart's Motion for Summary Judgment. For the reasons set forth, the Court grants in part BofI's request to summarily adjudicate Erhart's Sarbanes-Oxley, Dodd-Frank, California Labor Code section 1102.5, and wrongful discharge causes of action. The Court otherwise denies BofI's motion. Further, the Court grants in part Er hart's request to summarily adjudicate BofI's claims for fraud, negligence, conversion, and breach of the duty of loyalty in light of California's Uniform Trade Secrets Act. The Court denies Erhart's request to dispose of the rem ainder of these claims because there are genuine issues for trial. The Court similarly denies Erhart's request for summary judgment on BofI's breach of contract, California Penal Code section 502, and Computer Fraud and Abuse Act claims. F inally, the Court grants Erhart's request for summary judgment on BofI's Unfair Competition Law claim. Subject to the Order of the Chief Judge No. 18, In re Suspension of Jury Trials and Other Proceedings During the Covid-19 Public Emergen cy (S.D. Cal. Mar. 17, 2020), the Court orders the parties to contact the Magistrate Judges chambers to reset their mandatory settlement conference. Upon conclusion of this conference, the parties shall coordinate with the Magistrate Judge to set new dates for a pretrial conference and trial. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 3/31/2020.
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER Granting In Part and Denying in Part the Parties' Motions Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal. The Court Directs the Clerk of the Court to complete the various sealing requests that are underlined throughout this order (ECF Nos. 125 ,[130[, 132 , 140 , 141 , 145 , 150 , 153 , 156 , 172 , 161 , 165 ). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 9/19/19. (dlg)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant BofI Holdings' 78 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying Plaintiff Charles Matthew Erhart's 96 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Court grants Defendant's request to dismiss Plaintiff's claims because he names the incorrect defendant. Plaintiff is granted leave to amend for the limited purpose of naming the correct entity defendant. Third Amended Complaint shall be filed by 5/3/2019. Court denies the remainder of Defendant's motion. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 4/30/2019. (jah)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER on Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute No. 6 97 . Court grants in part and denies in part Plaintiff's motion to compel regarding the requests. Unless otherwise specified, where the Court has ordered production, it must take place within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 11/15/2018. (jah)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re: 70 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute No. 4. Court grants in part and denies in part Plaintiff's motion to compel regarding the requests. Unless otherwise specified in this Order, where Court has ordered production, it must take place within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 9/4/2018. (jah)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting in part and denying in part BofI Holding, Inc.'s 35 Motion to Dismiss and 35 Motion to Strike Allegations from First Amended Complaint. Court denies BofI's request to dismiss Erhart's claims for whistleblower ret aliation under Sarbanes-Oxley, whistleblower retaliation under Dodd-Frank, and defamation. Court grants BofI's motion to dismiss Erhart's claims for violation of California Confidentiality of Medical Information Act, breach of covenant of g ood faith and fair dealing, and intentional infliction of emotional distress. Court dismisses these claims with leave to amend. Court denies BofI's motion to strike allegations from Erhart's pleading. If Erhart chooses to file a Second Amended Complaint, he must do so by 9/29/2017. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 9/11/2017. (jah)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting Motion to Quash BofI's Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 3/2/2017. (fth)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Bofl Federal Bank's Motion for Summary Adjudication of Charles Matthew Erhart's Twelfth Through Twenty-Fourth Affirmative Defenses. Erhart's 14th, 15th, 21st and 22nd Affirmative Defenses fail as a matter of law. Court summarily adjudicates these defenses in Bofl's favor. Court strikes Erhart's 17th and 18th Affirmative Defenses from his Answer because these defenses are redundant of Erhart's other defenses. Court denies Bofl's request for summary adjudication of Erhart's 12th, 13th, 16th, 19th, 20th, 23rd, and 24th Affirmative Defenses. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 2/14/2017. (Motion filed as ECF No. 45 in 15cv2353-BAS(NLS)) (jah)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying Bofl Federal Bank's 26 Motion to Clarify or Reconsideration of Order Denying Bofl's Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Court orders the parties to appear on 1/30/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Cynthia Ba shant for oral argument. The parties should be prepared to discuss Bofl's motion for summary adjudication of Erhart's 12th through 24th affirmative defenses. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 12/8/2016. (Motion for Summary Adjudication filed as ECF. 45 in 15cv2353) (jah)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Bofl Holding, Inc.'s 3 Motion to Dismiss and 3 Motion to Strike. Court grants Bofl's motion to dismiss Erhart's first and second claims and dismisses the claims with leave to a mend. Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Erhart's remaining claims and dismisses these claims without prejudice. Court denies Bofl's motion to strike. If Erhart chooses to file a First Amended Complaint, he must do so by 10/17/2016. Court orders the consolidation of Bofl's Countersuit, 15cv2353-BAS(NLS) with this whistleblower retaliation action. This action is designated as the lead case, and all further filings shall be in this action. Clerk shall file a copy of this Order in Bofl's Countersuit. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 9/26/2016. (jah)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying defendant BofI Holding, Inc.'s 12 Motion for Imposition of Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence Against Plaintiff Charles Matthew Erhart. The Court grants BofI's 15 Motion to Seal. The Court orders the Clerk of Court to accept and file under seal the requested documents (ECF No. 16 ). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 9/21/16. (kas)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erhart v. Bofi Holding Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Matthew Erhart
Represented By: Carol Gillam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bofi Holding Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?