Golden v. BofI Holding, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Steven Golden
Defendant: BofI Holding, Inc., Gregory Garrabrants and Andrew J. Micheletti
Case Number: 3:2015cv02324
Filed: October 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Karen S. Crawford
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:0078
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER Granting 144 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice. The Court concludes that another opportunity to amend is not warranted. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/21/18. (dlg)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Granting Defendants' 123 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. The Court grants Plaintiff leave to amend the SAC to cure the deficiencies discussed above. Plaintiff may file a Third Amended Complaint within 21 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/1/17. (per dj chambers, don't close case)(dlg).
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER denying 100 Motion on Lead Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge Crawford's March 23, 2017 Order Regarding Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/21/2017. (fth)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Denying in Part and Granting in Part Defendants' 88 Motion to Dismiss Lead Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/23/17. (dlg)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 91 Motion to File Certain Portions of the Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute No. 2 Under Seal. Court permits Plaintiff to file a redacted version of Defendants' sections of the Joint Motion and sections of the Chitlock and Stigi Declarations containing the Former Employee's identifying information, and redacting the identifying information of the Former Employee in Exhibits B, I, K, L to the Stigi Declaration and the entirety of Exhibit M. and Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 3/22/2017. (jah)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER 52 Reversing in Part the Magistrate Judge's Order 49 Granting Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. The Court further denies as moot Plaintiff's ex parte motion for leave to file a sur-reply 75 . Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/30/16. (dlg)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Denying 53 Defendants' Ex Parte Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Defendants' Motion on Objections. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/28/16. (dlg)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: Denying in Part and Granting in Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 37 ; Granting Defendants' Motion to Seal 42 ; Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike 45 ; and Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal 46 . Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, is denied as to Defendant BofI and Defendant Gregory Garrabrants, and granted as to Defendants Andrew J. Micheletti, Paul J. Grinberg, Nicholas A. Mosich, and James S. Argalas with leave to amend. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/27/16 (Sealed clerk notified. dlg).
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 39 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 8/26/16. (dlg)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 9 , 12 , 17 Joint Motions to Consolidate Cases, Appoint Lead Plaintiff, and Approve Selection of Lead Counsel. The Court Appoints Houston Municipal Employees Pension System as Lead Plaintiff in the consolidated class actions. The Court Appoints Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP as Lead Counsel in the consolidated class actions. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/29/2016. (srm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden v. BofI Holding, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Golden
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BofI Holding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Garrabrants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew J. Micheletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?