Cavner et al v. Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Beth Cavner and Steve Cavner
Defendant: DOES 1 through 20, Hunter Defense Technologies, Inc., Pioneer Aerospace Corporation, Aerostar International, Inc. and Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02656
Filed: November 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442aaf
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER of Dismissal (ECF No. #120 ). The Court grants the parties' joint motion to dismiss the action and all remaining claims against Airborne with prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/8/2017. (rlu) (sjt).
June 8, 2017 Filing 122 NOTICE of Vacated Settlement Disposition Conference: Pursuant to the Court's Order Scheduling Settlement Disposition Conference (ECF No. 117), the parties have filed a Joint Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 120). Accordingly, the Telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference set for Friday, June 9, 2017 at at 10:00 AM IS HEREBY VACATED. (no document attached) (ad1)
June 5, 2017 Filing 121 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc. re #118 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc. filed by Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc. and Plaintiffs Steve Cavner and Beth Cavner. (Aubert, Garth) (lrf).
June 2, 2017 Filing 120 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc. by Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc.. (Aubert, Garth) QC mail RE: second request (lrf).
June 1, 2017 Filing 119 MINUTE ORDER. "Any stipulation for dismissal presuming the Court will retain jurisdiction will be rejected unless" it's "signed by all parties" as well as counsel. Standing Order 3.(lrf)
May 30, 2017 Filing 118 ***WITHDRAWN PER ECF. #121 *** Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc. by Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc. (Aubert, Garth) (lrf). Modified on 6/5/2017 to withdraw document (lrf).
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Order Scheduling Settlement Disposition Conference. Joint Motion for Dismissal due: 6/5/2017. If a Joint Motion for Dismissal and Proposed Order for Dismissal are not submitted by 6/5/2017, then a Settlement Disposition Conference shall be held. The Settlement Disposition Conference is set for 6/9/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. The conference shall be telephonic, with attorneys only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 5/16/2017.(lrf)
May 4, 2017 Filing 116 JOINT NOTICE of Settlement Between Plaintiffs Steve Cavner and Beth Cavner and Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc. by Beth Cavner, Steve Cavner (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Levine, Adam) (lrf)
May 2, 2017 Filing 115 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Beth Cavner, Steve Cavner re #99 Response in Opposition to Motion,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Adam Levine Re: Plaintiffs' Supplement to their Response in Opposition to Defendant Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Proof of Service)(Levine, Adam) (fth).
May 1, 2017 Filing 114 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Larry Alan Burns:Motion Hearing held on 5/1/2017. Matter submitted #86 MOTION for Summary Judgment or In the Alternative,MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter/ECR Cynthia Ott). (Plaintiff Attorney Robert Francavilla; Adam Levine).(Defendant Attorney Garth Aubert; Mark Irvine). (no document attached) (tlw)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER denying Airborne's #78 Motion for Relief Arising from Violation of the Protective Order, and granting the April 11, 2017 Stipulation Regarding Additional Discovery Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 4/28/17. (kas)
April 27, 2017 Filing 112 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that defendant Aerostar International, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment is granted. This represents a partial judgment in the case, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b).(kas)
April 27, 2017 Filing 111 OBJECTION by Beth Cavner, Steve Cavner re #106 Reply to Response to Motion, Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections To The Declaration Of Ryan Tiaden, Dated April 24, 2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Adam B. Levine In Support Of Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections To The Declaration Of Ryan Tiaden, Dated April 24, 2017, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Adam B. Levine, #3 Proof of Service)(Levine, Adam)(kas).
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting Aerostar's #85 Motion for Summary Judgment, granting Airborne's #104 Motion to File Documents Under Seal, granting Cavner's request for oral argument on Airborne's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court reschedules the hearing from 11:30 am to 3:00 pm on Monday, May 1, 2017, in Courtroom 14a. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/27/17. (kas)
April 27, 2017 Filing 108 Minute Entry by Chambers of Judge Larry Alan Burns: Airborne's counsel called Chambers to ask about the summary judgment hearing scheduled for Monday, May 1, 2017. The Court anticipates granting oral argument and moving the hearing from 11:30 am to 3 pm. The Court will issue an order addressing the hearing, motion to seal, and Aerostar's motion for summary judgment later today. (Court Reporter/ECR N/A). (Plaintiff Attorney No appearance). (Defendant Attorney No appearance). (kas)
April 25, 2017 Filing 107 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc. re #104 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Irvine, Mark) (fth).
April 24, 2017 Filing 106 REPLY to Response to Motion re #86 MOTION for Summary Judgment or In the Alternative,MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan Tiaden, #2 Declaration of Mark R. Irvine, #3 Proof of Service)(Irvine, Mark) (fth).
April 24, 2017 Filing 105 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 4/27/2017*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #104 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Irvine, Mark) (aef)
April 24, 2017 Filing 104 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Irvine, Mark) QC mailer sent re missing certificate of service (aef)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #97 Motion to Seal Exhibits to Cavner's opposition. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/20/17. (kas)
April 17, 2017 Filing 101 Joint Statement of Undisputed Material Facts by Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc., re #86 MOTION for Summary Judgment or In the Alternative,MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . (Irvine, Mark) (acc).
April 17, 2017 Filing 100 NON Opposition re #85 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Adjudication filed by Beth Cavner, Steve Cavner. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Levine, Adam) (acc).
April 17, 2017 Filing 99 RESPONSE in Opposition re #86 MOTION for Summary Judgment or In the Alternative,MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Beth Cavner, Steve Cavner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam B. Levine In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Airborne's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit to Declaration of Adam B. Levine, #3 Declaration of John B. Sherman in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Airborne's Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Declaration of Ryan Tiaden, #5 Proof of Service)(Levine, Adam)(acc).
April 17, 2017 Filing 98 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 4/20/2017*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #97 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Levine, Adam) (aef)
April 17, 2017 Filing 97 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Levine, Adam) (aef).
April 11, 2017 Filing 96 Joint MOTION re Discovery Dispute, -- Stipulation re Discovery Dispute by Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc. (Irvine, Mark)(kas).
April 7, 2017 Filing 95 Minute Entry for proceedings held with chambers of Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on April 7, 2017. At Court's request, counsel jointly contacted the Court. Counsel was advised of the Court's assessment of the dispute and that an order regarding briefing, should Airborne elect to file a motion, would be forthcoming. (Plaintiff Attorney Adam Levine). (Defendant Attorney Mark Irvine). (no document attached) (rxa)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #82 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/5/17. (kas)
April 5, 2017 Filing 93 Minute Entry for proceedings held with chambers of Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendant Airborne contacted chambers regarding a discovery dispute.(Plaintiff Attorney Adam Bruce Levine). (Defendant Attorney Mark Irvine). (no document attached) (rxa)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting plaintiffs' #89 Ex Parte Motion to Continue. The Court reschedules the summary judgment hearing to May 1, 2017. Plaintiffs' opposition is due April 17, 2017. Defendants' replies are due April 24, 2017. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/20/17. (kas)
March 17, 2017 Filing 90 RESPONSE in Opposition re #89 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Hearings and Briefing Schedules on Airborne's and Aerostar's Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Aerostar International, Inc., Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc.. (Irvine, Mark) (kas).
March 16, 2017 Filing 89 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Hearings and Briefing Schedules on Airborne's and Aerostar's Motions for Summary Judgment by Beth Cavner, Steve Cavner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Levine re: Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearings and Briefing Schedule on Airborne's and Aerostar's Motions for Summary Judgment, #2 Proof of Service)(Francavilla, Robert) (kas).
March 16, 2017 Filing 88 Minute Entry by Chambers of Judge Larry Alan Burns: The Cavner's counsel, Adam Levine, left a message with Chambers on March 15, 2017, requesting the Court contact him to discuss a continuance for the summary judgment hearing and potential issues with discovery cutoff deadlines. Judge Burns' Standing Order addresses, in detail, the procedure for continuances 10 and communicating with Chambers 14. Unless counsel is calling specifically to obtain a hearing date, all other questions or requests for relief should be filed in the docket like any other motion. (Court Reporter/ECR N/A). (Plaintiff Attorney No appearance). (Defendant Attorney No appearance). (kas)
March 13, 2017 Filing 87 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc. re #86 MOTION for Summary Judgment or In the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment (Irvine, Mark) (kas).
March 13, 2017 Filing 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment or In the Alternative, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jean C. Berland, #2 Exhibit A-H to Berland Declaration, #3 Declaration Mark R. Irvine, #4 Exhibit A-E to Irvine Declaration)(Irvine, Mark). Added MOTION for Summary Adjudication on 3/14/2017 (kas). qc mail sent re motion parts (kas).
March 13, 2017 Filing 85 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, MOTION Summary Adjudication by Aerostar International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Mark West, #3 Declaration of Michael P. Bowblis, #4 Exhibit A - L to Declaration of Michael P. Bowblis, #5 Exhibit M to Declaration of Michael P. Bowblis, #6 Proof of Service)(Ready, Marty). Added MOTION for Summary Adjudication on 3/14/2017 (kas). qc mail sent re motion parts, s/signature should be same atty logged in cm/ecf (kas).
March 13, 2017 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc. re #82 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Irvine, Mark) (kas).
March 11, 2017 Filing 83 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 4/6/2017*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #82 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Irvine, Mark) (aef)
March 11, 2017 Filing 82 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Irvine, Mark) Modified on 3/13/2017-QC mailer sent re document not signed; missing certificate of service (aef).
March 1, 2017 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy K. Robinson on behalf of Beth Cavner, Steve Cavner (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Robinson, Jeremy)Attorney Jeremy K. Robinson added to party Beth Cavner(pty:pla), Attorney Jeremy K. Robinson added to party Steve Cavner(pty:pla) (fth).
February 28, 2017 Filing 80 RESPONSE in Opposition re #78 MOTION for Relief Arising from Violation of Protective Order filed by Beth Cavner, Steve Cavner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam B. Levine re: Protective Order, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Adam B. Levine, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Adam B. Levine, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Adam B. Levine, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Adam B. Levine, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Adam B. Levine, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Adam B. Levine, #8 Declaration of John B. Sherman, #9 Declaration of William N. Nelson, #10 Declaration of Nancy LaRiviere, #11 Declaration Timothy Michael Patterson, #12 Declaration of Suzie Basse, #13 Exhibit A to Declaration of Suzie Basse, #14 Proof of Service)(Robinson, Jeremy) QC EMAIL - attorney not associated with party (fth).
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER of Dismissal. The Court granted Pioneer's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, but offered Plaintiffs the opportunity to amend. The Court ordered Plaintiffs to file an amended complaint by February 20, 2017, or, to file a short statement that they didn't intend to amend. Plaintiffs did neither. All claims against Pioneer Aerospace Corporation are dismissed. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 2/27/17.(kas)
February 21, 2017 Filing 78 MOTION for Relief Arising from Violation of Protective Order by Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Berland, #2 Declaration Aubert, #3 Request for Judicial Notice)(Irvine, Mark) (kas).
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Airborne may file a motion addressing the possible violation of the Protective Order by February 21, 2017. Plaintiffs may file a response to the motion on or before February 28, 2017. The Motion will be considered on the briefing without oral argument unless the Court orders otherwise. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 2/15/17.(kas)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying without prejudice #75 Renewed Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 2/13/17. (kas)
February 8, 2017 Filing 75 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (fact) and Prerial Motion Deadlines (newed) by Aerostar International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marty B. Ready, #2 Proof of Service via CM/ECF)(Ready, Marty) (kas).
February 6, 2017 Filing 74 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal:Discovery Conference held on 2/6/2017. The parties contacted the Court regarding a possible violation of the Protective Order. Court to issue briefing schedule (Plaintiff Attorney Adam Levine, Thomas Penfield, Jeremy Robinson).(Defendant Attorney Robert Harrison, Marty Ready, Mark Irvine). (no document attached) (rxa)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #72 Motion for Clarification. If plaintiffs believe they can fix the issues identified in the previous order, they must file an amended complaint on or before 2/20/2017. If not, the plaintiffs shall file a short statement indicating they don't intend to amend, and the claims against Pioneer will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 2/3/17. (kas)
January 27, 2017 Filing 72 MOTION for Leave to File Application for Leave to File Motion for Clarification of Order Granting Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Reconsideration; Declaration of Alfred Shaumyan by Pioneer Aerospace Corporation. (Shaumyan, Alfred) (kas).
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying without prejudice #70 Joint Motion to Continue Fact Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 1/27/17. (kas)
January 26, 2017 Filing 70 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fact Discovery and Pretrial Motion Deadlines by Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc.. (Irvine, Mark) (kas).
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting in part #67 Renewed Motion to Continue Deadline for Fact Discovery and Later Deadlines. The Court extends the fact discovery deadline to April 10, 2017, but only for the discovery identified in the Renewed Motion. The deadline remains February 8, 2017 for all other fact discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 1/20/2017. (kas)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting #45 Motion to Dismiss. Pioneer's motion to dismiss with leave to amend is granted. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/13/2017. (ag) (sjt).
January 13, 2017 Filing 67 MOTION to Continue Deadline for Fact Discovery and Later Deadlines (Renewed) by Beth Cavner, Steve Cavner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (supplemental) of David S. Casey, Jr. re: Motion to Continue Deadline for Fact Discovery and Later Deadlines, #2 Declaration of Plaintiffs' Retained Expert John B. Sherman re: Motion to Continue Deadline for Fact Discovery and Later Deadlines, #3 Proof of Service)(Levine, Adam) (kas).
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying without prejudice #65 Joint Motion to Continue Deadline for Fact Discovery and Later Deadlines. The parties may renew this motion, but only after complying with the requirements of due diligence as set for in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 1/10/17. (kas)
December 28, 2016 Filing 65 Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline for Fact Discovery and Later Deadlines by Beth Cavner, Steve Cavner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Levine re: Joint Motion to Continue Deadline for Fact Discovery and Later Deadlines, #2 Proof of Service)(Levine, Adam) (kas).
November 15, 2016 Filing 64 NOTICE of Party with Financial Interest by Aerostar International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ready, Marty) (kas).
November 14, 2016 Filing 63 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Beth Cavner, Steve Cavner re #56 Response in Opposition to Motion,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Proof of Service)(Levine, Adam) (kas).
November 10, 2016 Filing 62 NOTICE Regarding Supplemental Briefing in Response to Court's Order Denying Joint Motion to File Under Seal by Pioneer Aerospace Corporation re #61 Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal (Shaumyan, Alfred) (kas).
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying #54 Joint Motion to File Exhibit Under Seal. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/3/16. (kas)
November 2, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance and Withdrawal of Counsel by Mark R Irvine on behalf of Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc. (Irvine, Mark) Attorney Mark R Irvine added to party Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc.(pty:dft)(kas).
October 5, 2016 Filing 59 Minute Entry by the Chambers of Judge Larry Alan Burns: Currently on calendar for October 11, 2016 at 11:30 a.m. is a hearing on Pioneer Aerospace Corporation's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. (Docket no. 45). Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1), the Court finds the motion suitable for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing on this motion is taken off calendar and this matter is taken under submission. No appearances will be required for this matter on October 11 (Court Reporter/ECR N/A). (Plaintiff Attorney No appearance). (Defendant Attorney No appearance). (kas)
October 4, 2016 Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Pioneer Aerospace Corporation. (Shaumyan, Alfred) (kas).
September 30, 2016 Filing 57 NOTICE: The parties contacted the Court on September 30, 2016 to request a tolling of the 30-day deadline to bring a discovery dispute. The Court will allow a brief tolling. If the parties cannot resolve the dispute themselves, they must contact the Court by October 13, 2016 or the issue with be waived. (no document attached) (reh)
September 27, 2016 Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Beth Cavner, Steve Cavner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam B. Levine in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Pioneer Aerospace Corporation's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Proof of Service)(Levine, Adam) (kas).
September 27, 2016 Filing 55 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #54 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Levine, Adam) (dls).
September 27, 2016 Filing 54 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Levine, Adam) (dls).
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 Joint Motion to Continue Hearing on Pioneer Aerospace Corporation's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. The hearing is cont to 10/11/2016 11:30 AM before Judge Larry Alan Burns. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 8/26/16. (kas)
August 22, 2016 Filing 52 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Pioneer Aerospace Corporation's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Beth Cavner, Steve Cavner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Levine re: Joint Motion to Continue Hearing on Pioneer Aerospace Corporation's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Proof of Service)(Levine, Adam) (kas).
August 18, 2016 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Marty B. Ready on behalf of Aerostar International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service via CM/ECF)(Ready, Marty)Attorney Marty B. Ready added to party Aerostar International, Inc.(pty:dft) (kas).
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 Joint Motion and Stipulation for Supplemental Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 8/15/16. (kas)
August 12, 2016 Filing 49 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion and Stipulation for Supplemental Stipulated Protective Order by Pioneer Aerospace Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion and Stipulation for Supplemental Stipulated Protective Order)(Shaumyan, Alfred) (kas).
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying #34 Motion for Order Directing the U.S. Secretary of the Navy to Produce Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 8/1/16. (kas)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Joint Motion to Continue. The hearing on the hearing date for Pioneer Aerospace's motion to dismiss (Docket no. 45) is moved to September 19, 2016, at 11:30 a.m.. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/14/16. (kas)
July 13, 2016 Filing 46 Joint MOTION to Continue Joint Motion and Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Specially Appearing Defendant Pioneer Aerospace Corporation's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Pioneer Aerospace Corporation. (Shaumyan, Alfred) (kas).
July 7, 2016 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Pioneer Aerospace Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Smith in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint)(Shaumyan, Alfred) (jpp).
July 6, 2016 Filing 44 NOTICE of Vacated Hearing: The hearing on Defendant's motion to produce government documents, which is currently scheduled for July 15, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Skomal, is HEREBY VACATED. See Local Civil Rule 7.1(d)(1). (no document attached) (mw)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 Joint Motion to Continue and Issuing First Amended Scheduling Order. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2017 11:45 AM before Judge Larry Alan Burns. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 7/24/2017 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 6/23/16. (kas)
June 22, 2016 Filing 42 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Later Deadlines by Beth Cavner, Steve Cavner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Levine re: Joint Motion to Continue Deadline for Fact Discovery and Later Deadlines, #2 Proof of Service)(Levine, Adam) (kas).
June 9, 2016 Filing 41 NOTICE of Filing Proof of Service by Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc. re 40 Notice of Hearing,, (Vagle, Jennifer) (kas).
June 9, 2016 Filing 40 NOTICE of Hearing: Miscellaneous Hearing set for 7/15/2016 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. On June 6, 2016, the District Court referred Defendant Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc.'s motion for order directing non-party, the U.S. Secretary of the Navy, to produce documents. [ECF Nos. 34 and 38.] The Court sets a hearing date of July 15, 2016 for the motion. Any briefing in opposition and in reply shall be in accordance with Local Civil Rule 7.1(e). Defendant Airborne is ORDERED to serve a copy of this Notice on the Secretary of the Navy in accordance with the Federal Rules. (no document attached) (mw)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #36 Pioneer Aerospace Corporation's ex parte application for an order granting a 30-day extension to respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. Pioneer shall have until July 7, 2016 to respond. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/06/2016. (jpp)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER referring motion for order to produce documents to Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/06/2016.(jpp)
June 6, 2016 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pioneer Aerospace Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Zodiac Aerospace for Pioneer Aerospace Corporation.. (Shaumyan, Alfred)(kas).
June 6, 2016 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pioneer Aerospace Corporation's Ex Parte Application for an Order Granting it a 30-Day Extension to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint; Declaration of Alfred Shaumyan in Support Thereof by Pioneer Aerospace Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A for Ex Parte Application)(Shaumyan, Alfred) Attorney Alfred Shaumyan added to party Pioneer Aerospace Corporation (pty:dft) (kas).
June 3, 2016 Filing 35 ANSWER to #28 Second Amended Complaint by Aerostar International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service via CM/ECF) (Harrison, Robert) Attorney Robert W Harrison added to party Aerostar International, Inc.(pty:dft)(kas).
June 3, 2016 Filing 34 MOTION for Order Directing U.S. Secretary of the Navy to Produce Government Documents by Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Jennifer M. Vagle, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Certificate of Service)(Vagle, Jennifer) (kas).
June 1, 2016 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steve Cavner, Beth Cavner. Aerostar International, Inc. served. (Levine, Adam)(kas).
May 26, 2016 Filing 32 ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint by Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc..(Aubert, Garth) (kas).
May 26, 2016 Filing 31 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME by Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc. (Aubert, Garth) (kas).
May 24, 2016 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steve Cavner, Beth Cavner. Pioneer Aerospace Corporation served. (Levine, Adam)(kas).
May 10, 2016 Filing 29 Summons Issued as to the Second Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (kas)
May 10, 2016 Filing 28 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc., DOES 1 through 20, Pioneer Aerospace Corporation, Aerostar International, Inc., filed by Steve Cavner, Beth Cavner. (kas)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, submitted with their application, is deemed filed. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/9/16. (kas)
May 6, 2016 Filing 26 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Beth Cavner, Steve Cavner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Levine re: Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proof of Service)(Levine, Adam) (cxl).
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Joint Motion to Dismiss Hunter Technologies, Inc.. The parties shall each bear their own costs and attorney's fees as to the claims dismissed against Hunter. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/2/16. (kas)
April 29, 2016 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Hunter Defense Technologies, Inc. dba HDTGLOBAL by Beth Cavner, Steve Cavner. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Levine, Adam) (kas).
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Joint Motion to Continue Deadline to Join Parties. Good cause appearing, the deadline to join parties, amend pleadings or file additional pleadings is hereby CONTINUED to May 12, 2016. All other dates and deadlines provided in the Court's February 12, 2016 Scheduling Order remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 4/11/16. (no document attached) (mw)
April 8, 2016 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline to Join Parties, Amend Pleadings, or File Additional Pleadings by Beth Cavner, Steve Cavner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Levine re: Joint Motion to Continue Deadline to Join Parties, Amend Pleadings, or File Additional Pleadings, #2 Proof of Service)(Levine, Adam) (kas).
February 12, 2016 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 2/12/2016.(Plaintiff Attorney Scott Cummins, Adam Levine). (Defendant Attorney Garth Aubert, Jennifer Vagle for Airborne Sys.). (Stephen Brunk - Defendant Hunter Defense Tech).(no document attached) (mw)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting Joint Request to Enter Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 2/12/16.(kas)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings: A Mandatory Settlement Conference shall be conducted on January 25, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Pretrial Disclosures shall be prepared, served and lodged with the assigned district judge by February 27, 2017. The final Pretrial Conference is scheduled on the calendar of the Honorable Larry Alan Burns on March 6, 2017 at 11:45 a.m.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 2/12/16(dlg)
February 2, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE: The Court has reviewed the parties' Early Neutral Evaluation ("ENE") Statements and HEREBY CONVERTS the in-person ENE conference to a TELEPHONIC, ATTORNEYS-ONLY proceeding. No in-person appearances permitted. Plaintiffs' counsel is ordered to arrange and initiate a joint call with all opposing counsel to the Court at (619) 557-2993 on February 12, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. (no document attached) (mw)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Joint Motion to Excuse Appearance of Client Representative for Hunter Defense Technologies ("(HDT") at Early Neutral Evaluation Conference ("ENE"). Good cause appearing, the Joint Motion is GRANTED. HDT's representative is excused from personal appearance at the ENE on January 12, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 2/2/16. (no document attached) (mw)
January 29, 2016 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Bruce Levine on behalf of Beth Cavner, Steve Cavner (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Levine, Adam)Attorney Adam Bruce Levine added to party Beth Cavner(pty:pla), Attorney Adam Bruce Levine added to party Steve Cavner(pty:pla)(kas).
January 29, 2016 Filing 15 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Beth Cavner, Steve Cavner (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proof of Service)(Cummins, Scott) (kas).
January 20, 2016 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Excuse Appearance of Representative of Defendant Hunter Defense Technologies, Inc. at Early Neutral Evaluation Conference by Hunter Defense Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen K. Brunk in Support of Joint Motion to Excuse Representative of Defendant Hunter Defense Technologies, Inc. from Personal Attendance at Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, #2 Proof of Service)(Brunk, Stephen) (kas).
January 20, 2016 Filing 13 NOTICE by Hunter Defense Technologies, Inc. to Withdraw Document 12 (Brunk, Stephen) (kas).
January 20, 2016 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT #14 *** Joint MOTION to Excuse Appearance of Personal Representative of Defendant Hunter Defense Technologies, Inc. at Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, by Hunter Defense Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen K. Brunk in Support of Joint Motion to Excuse Representative of Defendant Hunter Defense Technologies, Inc. from Personal Appearance at Early Neutral EvaluationConference, #2 Proof of Service)(Brunk, Stephen) Modified on 1/20/2016 to withdraw document (kas).
December 16, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J Francavilla on behalf of Beth Cavner, Steve Cavner (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Francavilla, Robert)Attorney Robert J Francavilla added to party Beth Cavner(pty:pla), Attorney Robert J Francavilla added to party Steve Cavner(pty:pla) (kas).
December 16, 2015 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott C Cummins on behalf of Beth Cavner, Steve Cavner (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Cummins, Scott) (kas).
December 16, 2015 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas D Penfield on behalf of Beth Cavner, Steve Cavner (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Penfield, Thomas)Attorney Thomas D Penfield added to party Beth Cavner(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas D Penfield added to party Steve Cavner(pty:pla) (kas).
December 2, 2015 Filing 8 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Hunter Defense Technologies, Inc. (Brunk, Stephen) (kas).
December 2, 2015 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hunter Defense Technologies, Inc..(Brunk, Stephen)Attorney Stephen K Brunk added to party Hunter Defense Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft) (kas).
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/12/2016 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. In the event the case does not settle at the ENE, a Case Management Conference, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) will be held at the conclusion of the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 12/1/15.(kas)
November 25, 2015 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Michael M. Anello is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Larry Alan Burns for all further proceedings. The new case number is 15cv2656-LAB(BGS) (no document attached) (tel)
November 25, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc. (acc)(jrd)
November 25, 2015 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent TransDigm Group Incorporated for Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc. (acc)(jrd)
November 25, 2015 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc. (acc)(jrd)
November 25, 2015 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand From Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2015-00023605-CU-PL-CTL. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-8602522.), filed by Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A: Superior Court Complaint, #3 Answer to Superior Court Complaint)The new case number is 3:15-cv-02656-MMA-BGS. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Aubert, Garth)(acc)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cavner et al v. Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Cavner
Represented By: Jeremy K. Robinson
Represented By: Adam Bruce Levine
Represented By: Robert J Francavilla
Represented By: Thomas D Penfield
Represented By: David S Casey, Jr.
Represented By: Scott C Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Cavner
Represented By: Jeremy K. Robinson
Represented By: Adam Bruce Levine
Represented By: Robert J Francavilla
Represented By: Thomas D Penfield
Represented By: David S Casey, Jr.
Represented By: Scott C Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Defense Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen K. Brunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Aerospace Corporation
Represented By: Alfred Shaumyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerostar International, Inc.
Represented By: Marty B. Ready
Represented By: Robert W Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc.
Represented By: Garth W Aubert
Represented By: Jennifer M. Vagle
Represented By: Mark R Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?