United States of America et al v. County of San Diego
Case Number: 3:2015cv02674
Filed: December 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Presiding Judge: William V. Gallo
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3731 False Claims Act - Procedures
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Plaintiff does not sufficiently plead causes of action under the FCA. Accordingly, the Court grants Defendant's motion to dismiss. Given Plaintiff's prior opportunities to amend and the allegations contained in the TAC, the Court concludes amendment would be futile and dismisses the action in its entirety with prejudice as to Qui Tam Plaintiff Michael Durkin and without prejudice as to Plaintiff the United States of America.(rmc)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 32 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. The Court grants Defendant's motion to dismiss, and dismisses this action in its entirety without prejudice, and with leave to amend. Plaintiff may file a Third Amended Complaint that cures the deficiencies described above on or before 2/1/2018. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 1/11/2018. (rmc)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting Defendant's 20 Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants Defendant's motion to dismiss, and dismisses all of Plaintiff's causes of action. Within 21 days of this Order, Plaintiff may file a Second Amended Complaint that cures the deficiencies. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 8/2/2017. (ag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. County of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?