Duran v. Mandujano et al

Plaintiff: David B. Duran
Defendant: Omar Mandujano and Alfredo Hernandez
Case Number: 3:2015cv02745
Filed: December 7, 2015
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Riverside
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2017 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Adopting 104 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation and (2) Granting 91 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. This Court, having reviewed de novo the Magistrate Judges R&R and the objections thereto, adopts the Mag istrate Judge's recommendation and GRANTS the Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Court finds no basis for a certificate of appealability. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/11/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
August 31, 2017 104 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for Order Granting 91 Motion to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. It is RECOMMENDED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED and Plaintiff's FAC be DISMISSED with PREJUDICE. No later than September 29, 2 017, any party to this action may file written objections with the Court and serve a copy on all parties. No replies to objections will be accepted, and the motion will be deemed taken under submission on September 29, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/31/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
August 22, 2017 102 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for Order Granting Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. It is RECOMMENDED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED and that defendants Mandujano, A. Hernandez, L. Hernandez, and Seaman be DISMISSED with prejudice. No later than September 20, 2017, any party to this action may file written objections with the Court and serve a copy on all parties. No replies to objections will be accepted. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/22/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
March 2, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Adopting Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation and (2) Granting 41 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. This Court, having reviewed de novo the Magistrate Judge's R&R and the objections thereto, adopts the Magistrate Judge 's recommendation and grants Defendant's motion to dismiss. Plaintiff is granted leave to file a Second Amended Complaint ("SAC") that cures the pleading deficiencies identified in the R&R. The SAC shall be filed on or before March 31, 2017. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/1/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
July 27, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 30 Motion to Appoint Counsel without Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/27/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duran v. Mandujano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David B. Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Mandujano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfredo Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?