Butler v. Montgomery et al
Petitioner: |
Darius Butler |
Respondent: |
W. L. Montgomery and Kamala D. Harris |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00039 |
Filed: |
January 7, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
Imperial |
Presiding Judge: |
Gonzalo P. Curiel |
Presiding Judge: |
Mitchell D. Dembin |
Nature of Suit: |
General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 12, 2017 |
Filing
22
ORDER Adopting 21 Report and Recommendation Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; and Denying Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/12/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
|
January 11, 2016 |
Filing
4
Notice of Opportunity to Consent to Magistrate Judge, and Order Requiring Response to Petition: The Clerk of this Court must promptly (a) serve a copy of the Petition and a copy of this Order on the Attorney General. Respondent must file a "No tice of Appearance" no later than January 25, 2016. Respondent must file a motion to dismiss no later than March 14, 2016. Petitioner shall file his opposition, if any, to the motion no later than April 14, 2016. OR Respondent must file and se rve an answer no later than March 14, 2016. Petitioner may file a traverse to matters raised in the answer no later than April 14, 2016. If Petitioner has consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Respondent must execute and ret urn either a "Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge and Order of Reference" or a "Notice of Intent to Proceed before District Judge" to the Clerk of Court on or before February 26, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 1/11/16.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)Attorney General served. (dlg)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?