Godinez v. Maleno Huerta et al
Plaintiff: Alma Rosa Godinez
Defendant: Jorge Maleno Huerta, Angela Lopez and Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2016cv00236
Filed: January 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Presiding Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting Plaintiff Alma Rosa Godinez's 82 Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying Plaintiff's 82 Motion to Reconsider Summary Judgment on Pre-Arrest Warrantless Entry Claim. Court grants Plaintiff's motion f or judgment as a matter of law on Count 2 of the Complaint for the post-arrest warrantless search of Plaintiff's home, in violation of the Fourth and Fourteenth Amendment to the U.S. Constitution. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in Plai ntiffs' favor on Court 2 and against Defendant Maleno. Court denies Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration of Court's decision on Count 1 in its summary judgment order.Based on the grant of judgment as a matter of law on Count 2, Court will consider at the Motion in Limine Hearing whether bifurcation of liability and damages is appropriate. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 8/24/2018. (jah)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 47 Motion in Limine to Exclude or Limit Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Roger Clark. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 5/1/2018. (mxn)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Summary Judgment for Defendant Lopez; and granting in part Summary Judgment for Defendant Malena Huerta. The Court HEREBY ORDERS that: 1. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 23) is GRANTED on behalf o f Deputy Lopez in its entirety and as to Count One with respect to Deputy Maleno. 2. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 23) is DENIED on behalf of Deputy Maleno as to all remaining counts. 3. Deputy Lopez is HEREBY DISMISSED from the case. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 11/16/2017. (acc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Godinez v. Maleno Huerta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Rosa Godinez
Represented By: Gabriel L. Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Maleno Huerta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?