Na v. Simmons et al
Plaintiff: |
Saith Na |
Defendant: |
Simmons, Hvizdzak, Aliyev, B. I. Myers, Talamante, L. A. Garcia, McHenry and Maul |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00592 |
Filed: |
March 7, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
Del Norte |
Presiding Judge: |
William V. Gallo |
Presiding Judge: |
William Q. Hayes |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 8, 2018 |
Filing
54
ORDER: The Report and Recommendation issued by the Magistrate Judge (ECF No. 51 ) is not adopted. The motion for summary judgment filed by Defendants is Granted in its entirety.(ECF No. 38 ). The motions for appointment of counsel filed by Plaintiff are Denied (ECF No. 37 , 44 ). The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment for Defendants and against Plaintiff and close this case. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 03/08/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
|
October 17, 2017 |
Filing
51
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (Re Dkt #s 37 , 38 , 44 ): Objections to R&R due by 11/3/2017. Replies due by 12/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/17/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
|
May 17, 2016 |
Filing
4
ORDER Granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. US Marshal shall effect service of complaint. The Secretary CDCR, or his designee, is ordered to collect from prison trust account the $350 balance of the filing fee owed in th is case by collecting monthly payments from the trust account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month income credited to the account and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b)(2). (Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR) ; Denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/17/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (Certified Copy to USM) (dlg)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?