The Scripps Research Institute v. Illumina, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Scripps Research Institute
Defendant: Illumina, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00661
Filed: March 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Presiding Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER on Claim Construction. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/10/2018.(mpl)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Denying Defendant's 30 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant does not appear to contest the sufficiency of plaintiff's allegations assuming the Court were to credit the plausibility of plaintiff's construction of parameter "a ." (See generally MTD, ECF No. 30-1; see also Reply 14, ECF No. 33 ("What's more, Scripp's infringement case fails if either part of Illumina's construction is adopted...." (emphasis removed)).) And plaintiff's F AC sets forth how the accused products allegedly meet each element of the asserted claims under its theory of infringement. (See FAC 20-23, ECF No. 27.) Thus, having found that plaintiff's construction of parameter "a" is plausible, it is ordered that the Court denies defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/14/2017. (dxj)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants in part and denies in part Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is not required to identify all of its asserted claims or Defendant's a llegedly infringing products at the pleading stage, but Plaintiff's claims are otherwise dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, if any, on or before December 12, 2016. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/21/2016. (kcm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Scripps Research Institute v. Illumina, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Scripps Research Institute
Represented By: Robert Winn Cutler
Represented By: Derek Tod Gilliland
Represented By: Herbert Jay Hammond, IV
Represented By: Vishal Hemant Patel
Represented By: Bruce Steven Sostek
Represented By: Bruce John Zabarauskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illumina, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?