Ewing v. K2 Property Development, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Anton Ewing |
Defendant: |
K2 Property Development, LLC, Daniel Klein, DOES 1 through 100, ABC Corporations 1-100 and XYZ, LLC's 1-100 |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00678 |
Filed: |
March 21, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
Ruben B. Brooks |
Presiding Judge: |
Larry Alan Burns |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
18 U.S.C. § 1964 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 21, 2019 |
Filing
178
ORDER Denying Motion for Sanctions (Dkt. 171 ); Denying Motion to Hold Defendant in Contempt (Dkt. 173 ); Granting Motion to Strike (Dkt. 176 ). The hearing currently scheduled for 2/25/2019 is vacated. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 2/20/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/21/2019: # 1 Stricken Document) (jdt).
|
October 25, 2018 |
Filing
163
ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/25/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
|
October 4, 2018 |
Filing
161
ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's Objection to Denial of Ex Parte Motions (Dkt. 145 ). The Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motions (Dkt. 131 ) is modified such that Ewing shall pay the $2,214.00 to the Revolve L aw Group Attorney Trust Account. Ewing is ordered, by 10/19/2018, to either: (1) pay the $2,214.00 to the Revolve Law Group Attorney Trust Account and file a notice with the Court to that effect, or (2) notify the Court that he intends to submit to a debtors exam. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/4/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt)
|
August 22, 2018 |
Filing
155
Order Striking Plaintiff's Opposition; Order Vacating Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; and Order Revoking Authorization for Plaintiff to File Documents Electronically. The Court orders Ewing's opposition (Docket no. 152 ) i s stricken. The hearing currently on calendar for 8/27/2018 at 11:30 a.m. is vacated. Ewing may file a new opposition by 9/5/2018. Klein may file an amended reply brief by 9/12/2018. Ewing is ordered to comply with the civility requirements of Civil Local Rule 83.4, and with Fed. R. Civ. P. 11. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 8/22/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2018: # 1 Stricken Document) (jdt).
|
July 17, 2018 |
Filing
131
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motions (ECF Nos. 91 and 122 ) and Order to Show Cause. Ewing must pay $2,214.00 to Wright for reasonable fees and costs in litigating these motions within two weeks of the date of this order or by 7/29 /2018. In addition, Ewing is ordered to appear on 7/19/2018 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Clinton Averitte to show cause why this Court should not impose sanctions under Rule 11(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Clinton Averitte on 7/17/2018. (jdt) (Main Document 131 replaced on 7/17/2018) (yeb).
|
December 7, 2017 |
Filing
47
ORDER granting 42 Motion to Withdraw. Attorney David Robert Socher terminated. Daniel Klein can represent himself pro se, but a legal entity like K2 Property can't proceed in court without an attorney. K2 Property must obtain a new attorney by 12/28/2017. If K2 Property fails to obtain counsel, it will face default judgment. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 12/6/2017. (Defendants Daniel Klein and K2 Property Development served via U.S. Mail Service.) (jdt)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?