Davis v. Paramo et al
Plaintiff: Doyle Wayne Davis
Defendant: Daniel Paramo, M. Glynn, S. Roberts, R. Walker, Rodriquez, Jason Silva, MD, Susan Pasha, RNP, David Clifton, D. Pool, S. Bedane, M. Stout, V. Sosa, B. Self, J. J. Jackson, Richard O. Butcher, M.D. and Fernando A. Zamudio
Case Number: 3:2016cv00689
Filed: March 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice (ECF No. 140 ) is Granted. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), this action is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 12/14/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Denying 126 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 07/23/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Denying 111 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Compliance With Subpoena as Moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 04/13/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER denying 86 Motion to Compel Discovery; denying 90 Motion to Appoint Counsel and Experts ; granting in part 92 Motion for Order to Issue Subpoenas Duces Tecum; denying 94 Motion for an Order for a Telephonic Conference Call Speaker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 12/27/2017. 6 signed subpoenas duces tecum and 6 USM 285 Forms mailed to Plaintiff. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The case continues against Defendants Silva and Pasha. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/10/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff;s Complaint [ECF Nos. 22 , 24 , 46 , 61 ). Objections to R&R due by 7/5/2017, Replies due by 7/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 6/13/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 54 Motion for Permission to File and Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/23/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (fth)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's (1) Motion to Compel Discovery and/or Waiver of Service and (2) Ex Parte Motion for Clarification of the Court's Record (ECF Nos. 42 , 44 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 12/15/2016. (Sent forms to Deputy Attorney General Findley)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: (1) Denying Plaintiff's 15 Motion for Reconsideration; and (2) Denying Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/30/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Paramo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doyle Wayne Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Paramo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Glynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodriquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Silva, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Pasha, RNP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Clifton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Pool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Bedane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Sosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Self
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. J. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard O. Butcher, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando A. Zamudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?