Bollinger v. The United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Kiana Bollinger
Defendant: The United States of America, Atlantic Power Corporation and DOES
Case Number: 3:2016cv00820
Filed: April 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: The motion for summary judgment filed by Defendant United States of America is Granted. (ECF No. 26 ). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 02/23/2018. (ajs)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: The Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (ECF No. 34 ) is Granted. The Court determines that the Settlement was made in good faith and approves the Settlement pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure § 877.6. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 12/20/2017. (ajs)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The motion to dismiss filed by the United States is denied. (Dkt # 7 ). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/13/2017. (mdc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bollinger v. The United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiana Bollinger
Represented By: Jeffrey E Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Represented By: U S Attorney CV(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Power Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?