TV Ears, Inc. v. SYK Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: TV Ears, Inc.
Defendant: SYK Group, LLC, Liberty Health Supply, LLC, TrueDio, LLC and Sam Y. Kim
Case Number: 3:2016cv00867
Filed: April 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Presiding Judge: William V. Gallo
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Joint 49 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. A Settlement Conference shall be conducted on March 30, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. in the chambers of Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/22/17. (dlg)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 34 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. The proposed amended complaint shall be filed within five days of the filing of the Court's order. The hearing set on January 6, 2017 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/19/16. (dlg)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting Defendants Sky Group, LLC and Sam Y. Kim's 15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Denying Motion to Dismiss for Failing to State a Claim as Moot. The hearing set on October 28, 2016 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/26/16. (dlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TV Ears, Inc. v. SYK Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TV Ears, Inc.
Represented By: Adrianos Matthew Facchetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYK Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Health Supply, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TrueDio, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Y. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?