Daimler AG v. A-Z Wheels LLC et al
Plaintiff: Daimler AG
Defendant: A-Z Wheels LLC, UsaRim.com, Eurotech Wheels, Galaxy Wheels & Tires, LLC, Infobahn International, Inc., Eurotech, Eurotech Luxury Wheels, UsaRim, Ryan Moalemi, Rasool Moalemi, Joshua Moalemi and Does 1-10 inclusive
Case Number: 3:2016cv00875
Filed: April 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D. Dembin
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Amended Scheduling Order Regulating Pre-Trial Proceedings [ECF No. 129 ]. A Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law is due by 6/24/2021. The Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 7/22/2021. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 7/29/2021 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 4D before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 4/26/2021. (tcf)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 120 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for statutory damages and attorney's fees and GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART Plaintiff's request for permanent injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/2/2020. (tcf)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER denying Without Prejudice Plaintiff Daimler AG's Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Joshua and Ryan Moalemi (ECF No. 109 ). The Parties shall contact Judge Dembin within 3 days of the electronic docketing of this Order to schedule a Mandatory Settlement Conference and so that Judge Dembin may issue a Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/10/2019. (jrm)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 58 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/13/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER on Plaintiff's 61 Motion for Attorney Fees. It is ordered, The Court grants Daimler's request for attorneys' fees and orders Defendants to pay $22,997 in fees and $4,459.22 in costs for a total of $27,456.22 with in 30 days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 4/23/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl) Modified to update docket text and replace document on 4/23/2018 (mpl). (Main Document 84 replaced on 4/23/2018) (mpl).
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER denying 78 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause. Plaintiffs Motion for an Order to Show Cause is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff may file this motion in the United States District Court for the Central District of California, the district where compliance was required. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 4/9/18. (Dembin, Mitchell)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting 74 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/27/2018. (mpl)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute presenting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel further discovery responses from Defendants. As explained in the attached Order, Plaintiffs motion to co mpel further responses and production is GRANTED as follows: 1. The Moalemi Defendants must provide full answers to the each of the identified interrogatories as required by Rule 33, Fed. R. Civ. P. 2. The Moalemi Defendants must produce document s within their possession, custody or control responsive to the identified requests for production. 3. Answers must be provided and responsive documents, if they exist, must be produced within 14 days of this Order. 4. No request for sanctions having been made, no sanctions will be imposed at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 09/07/17. (Dembin, Mitchell)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting Unopposed 30 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. It is ordered that the Court grants Plaintiff's Leave Motion. Plaintiff shall file a complete version of the Amended Complaint and corresponding Exhibits (see ECF Nos. 30-2, 30-4 to -84) within seven days of the date on which this Order is electronically docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/6/2017. (dxj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daimler AG v. A-Z Wheels LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daimler AG
Represented By: Joanna Lee Cohn
Represented By: Timothy William Johnson
Represented By: Michael J. St. Denis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-Z Wheels LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UsaRim.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eurotech Wheels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galaxy Wheels & Tires, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infobahn International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eurotech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eurotech Luxury Wheels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UsaRim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Moalemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasool Moalemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Moalemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?