Lindsey v. Elsevier Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Duncan Lindsey
Defendant: Elsevier Inc., Elsevier B.V., Elsevier, LTD. and Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2016cv00959
Filed: April 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: David H. Bartick
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 46 Joint Motion to File Documents Under Seal; granting as modified Plaintiff's 51 Motion to Compel Elsevier to Produce Financial Data; granting in part and denying in part Elsevier's 53 Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Pr oduce Tax Returns; granting 56 Motion to File Documents Under Seal; granting Elsevier's 59 Motion for Leave to File Submission re: Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Tax Returns; granting 60 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Compl ete Discovery. Court modifies the Scheduling Order: All pretrial motions, including those addressing Daubert issues related to dispostive motions must be filed by 3/26/2018. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 6/13/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick. Pursuant to Judge Curiel's Civil Pretrial & Trial Procedures, the parties are excused from the requirement of Local Rule 16.1(f)(2)(a); no Memoranda of Law or Contentions of Fact are to be filed. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/20/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/27/2018 01:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 10/10/2017. (jah)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting Defendants' 41 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Counterclaim. The amended answer and counterclaim shall be filed within three (3) days of the filed date of the Court's order. The hearing set for August 18, 2017 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/15/2017. (knb)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Joint 39 Motion Re Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings. A Mandatory Settlement Conference shall be conducted on February 7, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in the chambers of Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 5/22/17. (dlg)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Following Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 1/27/17.(dlg)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Following Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Notice of Telephonic Case Management Conference. A Case Management Conference will be held on September 14, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Bartick. The Case Management Conference shall be telephonic, with attorneys only. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 8/1/16.(dlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsey v. Elsevier Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duncan Lindsey
Represented By: Susan Laura Klein
Represented By: Jennifer Laser
Represented By: Jeffrey B Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elsevier Inc.
Represented By: Andrew M. Gold
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Jonak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elsevier B.V.
Represented By: Andrew M. Gold
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Jonak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elsevier, LTD.
Represented By: Andrew M. Gold
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Jonak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?