Strong v. Johnson
Plaintiff: Matt Strong
Defendant: Diana E. Johnson
Case Number: 3:2016cv01289
Filed: May 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The consolidated action is dismissed without prejudice, but without leave to amend, for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/29/2017.(lrf)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Dismissing Complaint; Order Denying as Moot 13 Motion to Dismiss; and Order Requiring Plaintiffs to Seek Leave to Amend. If Plaintiffs believe they can successfully amend to state a claim that the court can exercise jurisdiction over, they should each seek leave to amend by filing an ex parte motion no later than 9/12/2017. If Plaintiffs seek leave to amend, Defendant will have 14 calendar days to file an opposition. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 8/17/2017. (lrf)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting Motion to Continue Stay; and Directions to Parties Regarding the Court's Expectations. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/7/2017.(lrf)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting in part 4 Motion to Dismiss. The complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, for failure to state a federal claim. By January 31, 2017, Strong may file an amended complaint that corrects the defects this order has identified. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/17/17. (kas)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strong v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Strong
Represented By: Scottlynn J Hubbard, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana E. Johnson
Represented By: William A Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?